PARIS et al v. ETHICON ET AL
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PARIS and CHRISTIN PARIS
Defendant: ETHICON WOMENS HEALTH AND UROLOGY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ETHICON LLC, Gynecare and ETHICON INC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00186
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 54 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTIN PARIS, MICHAEL PARIS (rlw)
October 30, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a separate Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (rlw)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL CHRISTY D JONES, WILLIAM M GAGE, KARI L SUTHERLAND, DAVID B. THOMAS, Philip J. Combs, SUSAN M ROBINSON, Ashley Nader Stubbs, CHRISTOPHER S BERDY, Amy Sherry Fischer, HUNTER J SHKOLNIK - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (rlw)
October 30, 2019 US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON added. (rlw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 53 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-01759. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
October 29, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Statement for Inactive Case by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PRETRIAL ORDER #270 (ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS EXTENDING DISCOVERY) After a cursory review of many individual cases in the Ethicon MDL, the court notes that the parties have attempted to stipulate a change in the court's Docket Control Orders setting deadlines for discovery. The parties cannot extend court ordered discovery deadlines past the date set for completion of discovery without approval from the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 29(b); see Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16(b)(4). Here, the parties are repeatedly attempting to stipulate to delay the completion of discovery, which affects other deadlines in the Docket Control Orders, such as the deadline for filing dispositive motions and the deadline for filing Daubert motions. Under Local Rule 16.1(f)(3), the court is not required to, nor does it, recognize stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines past the close of discovery. See LR Civ. P. 16.1(f)(3). Therefore, all such stipulations filed in the Ethicon MDL which are inconsistent with Local Rule 16.1(f)(3) are INEFFECTUAL and VOID. Such stipulations undermine the policy goals of the MDL, including convenience of the parties, efficiency of the pretrial proceedings, and consistency on related issues. The parties are DIRECTED to cease filing such stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines contrary to Local Rule 16.1(f)(3). When the parties seek an extension of discovery deadlines past the date set for the completion of discovery in the Docket Control Order, they must do so by motion in the individual case. The Docket Control Orders are plain that the only discovery permitted after the close of discovery are depositions of the plaintiff's friends and family members, and only if such depositions are requested before the discovery deadline. Those orders remain unaffected. Modifications of the discovery schedule may be considered, for good cause shown. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see, e.g., PTO #251 at A.2.f. Good cause does not include mere agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/13/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL Panel; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 Cases) (crg) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 46 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Christin Paris. (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (Vacating Order Daubert Motion re: Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D.) It is directed that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D.) entered on 3/29/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases identified in Exhibit A attached to the 3/29/2017 Order) (hkl) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #45 ORDER ENTERED 4/10/2017: MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D.) The Motion by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D. is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (mek) (Modified on 4/11/2017 to note order has been vacated) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Larry T. Sirls, M.D.) The Motion by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Exclude the General Opinion Testimony of Larry T. Sirls, II, M.D. is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting the Motion by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Strike Dr. Shelby F. Thames' Supplemental Reports or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Daubert Motion Based on the Flawed Methodology Employed Therein filed in MDL 2327 at ECF No. 2882, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/28/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Barry Schlafstein, M.D.) re: Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Barry Schlafstein, M.D. for Wave 2 filed in MDL 2327 at ECF No. 2448; directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Barry Schlafstein, M.D.) filed in MDL 2327 at ECF No. 2684 entered 8/30/2016 is ADOPTED in this case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/1/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRETRIAL ORDER # 241 (Re: Order Dismissing Ethicon, LLC in Cases Listed on Exhibit A) dismissing without prejudice Ethicon, LLC from each case identified on Exhibit A, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/12/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 39 BRIEF by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Shari Paris on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Gregory Paris on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Domminick York on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of William James York on 08/10/16 at 10:00 a m (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kimberly Petty on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Shari Gaskins on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of David Osborne, Jr. on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of William York on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Michael Paris on 08/10/16 at 10:00 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 29, 2016 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
April 14, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of David B. Kay, M.D. on 04/28/16 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Pretrial Order #38)(Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 30, 2016 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson's First Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 30, 2016 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson's Second Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 30, 2016 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson's Second Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 4, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christin Paris on 03/09/16 at 9:30 am (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
March 2, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Hunter J. Shkolnik on behalf of Christin Paris, Michael Paris. (Shkolnik, Hunter) (Modified on 3/2/2016 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
February 10, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christin Paris on 03/04/16 at 9:30 a.m. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
January 20, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christopher S. Berdy on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Berdy, Christopher) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
January 19, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Ashley Nader Stubbs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Stubbs, Ashley) (Modified on 4/15/2016 to correct party filers) (rea). [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of David Kay, M.D. on 3/21/16 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 206 (Docket Control Order - Wave 2 Cases) With the selection of the cases on the attached Exhibit A (Wave 2 cases), it is ORDERED that the following deadlines shall apply in the Ethicon Wave 2 cases as set forth herein: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 1/19/2016; Defendant Fact Sheets due 2/19/2016; Deadline for written discovery requests due 4/05/2016; Expert Disclosure by Plaintiffs due 5/5/2016; Expert Disclosure by Defendants due 6/3/2016; Expert Disclosure for Rebuttal Purposes due 6/17/2016; Deposition Deadline and close of discovery due 7/01/2016; Filing of Dispositive Motions due 7/08/2016; Responses to Dispositive Motions due 7/25/2016; Reply to Response to Dispositive Motions due 8/04/2016; Filing of Daubert Motions due 7/21/2016; Responses to Daubert Motions due 8/08/2016; and Reply to Response to Daubert Motions due 8/18/2016. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: a consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/10/2016, any response is due 6/20/2016, and any reply is due 6/30/2016. By no later than 5/16/2016, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases ready for transfer, remand or trial, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 5/24/2016. Signed by Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/20/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A) (cc: Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 2 Cases) (mnm) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (all) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
December 12, 2012 Filing 12 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Christin Paris, Michael Paris against Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson,. (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Leslie Pascual on behalf of Christin Paris and Michael Paris of the Summons and Complaint upon Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon Women's Health and Urology and Ethicon, Inc. on 8/16/2012. (Shkolnik, Hunter) Modified on 12/18/2012 to add additional filer Michael Paris and to add text for clarity (arb). [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
June 1, 2012 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER #8 (Uniform Certificate of Service) entered on 05/31/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
May 31, 2012 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Christin Paris and Michael Paris for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for each defendant mailed to Hunter J. Shkolnik for service. (cbo) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]
May 30, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1858959. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cbo) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARIS et al v. ETHICON ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON WOMENS HEALTH AND UROLOGY
Represented By: Ashley Nader Stubbs
Represented By: WILLIAM M GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: S Eric Rumanek
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S BERDY
Represented By: SUSAN M ROBINSON
Represented By: CHRISTY D JONES
Represented By: DAVID B. THOMAS
Represented By: Ashley Nader Stubbs
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: WILLIAM M GAGE
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: KARI L SUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON LLC
Represented By: Ashley Nader Stubbs
Represented By: WILLIAM M GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare
Represented By: WILLIAM M GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON INC
Represented By: S Eric Rumanek
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S BERDY
Represented By: SUSAN M ROBINSON
Represented By: CHRISTY D JONES
Represented By: DAVID B. THOMAS
Represented By: Ashley Nader Stubbs
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: WILLIAM M GAGE
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: KARI L SUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PARIS
Represented By: HUNTER J SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIN PARIS
Represented By: HUNTER J SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?