PATEL et al v. AKBRUDIN
Plaintiff: KRISHNA PATEL and VIJAY PATEL
Defendant: DAVIS HARRIS, CHARLES M WALKER, VISHNU SUTARIA, JAMES A FREEMAN, WILLIAM GALLAGHER, ROGER CHINCHILLA, ROGER ZIEMS, SET HUNTER, HP RATHOD, DESAI P VINUBHAI, JEFF GABRIEL, MILIAN SARAIYA, CONSTANCE RHEINSCHELD, BOB JOHNSON, JAYNANT PATEL, A K SINGH, TARAL BHATT, RONAK MANSURI, PARIN SAGAR, DOUG BURCOMBE, ROJIYA, JK BHATT, SYED AKBARUDDIN, KATHY HUGHES, ERIC KING, JAPAN DAVE, DOUG HUGHES, YOGITA PAWAR, STEVEN L LEFKOVITZ, DONALD I N MCKENZIE, AKHIL PATEL, SYED AKBRUDIN, RAJNIKANT PATEL, SUNIL MAJMUDAR, PETRA ZIEMS, MICHAEL LISTER, DILLIP M PATEL, CHITRANJAN SINGH, YADUKANT K VYAS, STEPHEN J ZRALEK, RITA BURRELL, NATARAJAN RAM, RAJNATH SINGH, GAMEH, BRYAN E PIEPER and RIVER CITY BANK
Not Yet Classified: NARENDRA MODI and EVA M LAMEH
Case Number: 7:2019cv00188
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by JAMES A FREEMAN filed by JOHN A LOCKETT, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of James Freeman)(LOCKETT, JOHN)
January 8, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOHN A LOCKETT, III on behalf of JAMES A FREEMAN Attorney JOHN A LOCKETT, III added to party JAMES A FREEMAN(pty:dft) (LOCKETT, JOHN)
January 7, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RACHEL FRIEDMAN on behalf of DOUG BURCOMBE, ERIC KING Attorney RACHEL FRIEDMAN added to party DOUG BURCOMBE(pty:dft), Attorney RACHEL FRIEDMAN added to party ERIC KING(pty:dft) (FRIEDMAN, RACHEL)
January 7, 2020 Filing 45 Summons Reissued as to RAJNATH SINGH. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Vijay Rupani)(rlw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL as to DOUG BURCOMBE. (rlw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL as to ERIC KING. (rlw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL as to EVA M LAMEH. (rlw)
January 7, 2020 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JAMES A FREEMAN - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (rlw)
January 7, 2020 Plaintiffs Request for CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RITA BURRELL, DOUG HUGHES, CONSTANCE RHEINSCHELD is DECLINED - Responsive pleading filed on 1/6/2020. (rlw)
January 7, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by STEPHEN J ZRALEK, BRYAN E PIEPER, #41 Memorandum in Support filed by STEPHEN J ZRALEK, BRYAN E PIEPER ); A motion and any supporting documents filed concurrently with that motion (e.g., memorandum in support, statement of material facts, exhibits, affidavits) should be filed in a single docket entry. For example, a summary judgment motion docket entry should look as follows:[#] Motion for Summary Judgment Attachment 1 Memorandum In Support. NO NEED TO REFILE. (rlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by BRYAN E PIEPER, STEPHEN J ZRALEK re: #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (SHAW, HENRY)
January 6, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BRYAN E PIEPER, STEPHEN J ZRALEK filed by HENRY THOMAS SHAW.(SHAW, HENRY)
January 6, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by STEVEN L LEFKOVITZ filed by BLAKE H JOINER.(JOINER, BLAKE)
January 6, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CONSTANCE RHEINSCHELD. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by VIJAY PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(rlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DOUG HUGHES. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by VIJAY PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(rlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by RITA BURRELL. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by VIJAY PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(rlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL of Response by Rita Burrell to Complaint (rlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL of Response by Doug Hughes to Complaint. (rlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL of Response by Constance Rheinscheld to Complaint. (rlw)
January 3, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by DOUG BURCOMBE, ERIC KING (FRIEDMAN, RACHEL)
January 3, 2020 Filing 31 Copy of Letter from Defendant James A. Freeman, III to Plaintiffs requesting an extension of time to file an answer to the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against RITA BURRELL. (sbd)
January 3, 2020 Filing 29 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against CONSTANCE RHEINSCHELD. (sbd)
January 3, 2020 Filing 28 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against DOUG HUGHES. (sbd)
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 Summons Reissued as to BOB JOHNSON. (sbd)
January 2, 2020 Filing 26 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against JAMES A FREEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Letter to Plaintiffs from James A. Freeman III)(rlw)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #20 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer filed by RIVER CITY BANK. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/31/2019. (rlw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to ROGER CHINCHILLA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Navigator Tax Refund Processing, #2 Summons issued for Defendant In Rem, #3 Summons issued for Jeff Gabriel, #4 Summons issued for Seth Thunder, #5 Summons issued for David Harris, #6 Summons issued Dustin Hughes)(rlw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL as to STEVEN L LEFKOVITZ. (rlw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL as to STEPHEN J ZRALEK. (rlw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL as to BRYAN E PIEPER. (rlw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION extending time to answer of River City Bank to 1/30/2020 re #1 Complaint, by RIVER CITY BANK (MCDOWELL, AMANDA)
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to CONSTANCE RHEINSCHELD. (sbd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to JAMES A FREEMAN. (sbd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to DOUG HUGHES. (sbd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ERIC KING. (sbd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to RITA BURRELL. (sbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #1 Sheriff's Affidavit) (sbd).
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Rule 60 by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Exh. E - Table of Contents)(sbd)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs are ordered to proceed with timely service of Defendants. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/5/19. (sbd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order, Order on Ex Parte Motion, Order on Motion for TRO Filed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 38 to 43)(rlw)
November 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CLERK'S DECISION RE: E-Filing for VIJAY PATEL. Request to E-File is DENIED. (dwb)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion for TRO. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/14/2019. (rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Rico Statement by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(sbd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendants continued)(rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT LIST by VIJAY PATEL re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 - Exhibit 1 to Exhibit 23, #2 Part 2 - Exhibit 24 to Exhibit 36)(rlw) Modified to correct filing date on 11/13/2019 (rlw).
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL.(sbd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (sbd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 65 AFFIDAVIT by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (sbd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 65(b) DECLARATION by VIJAY PATEL. (sbd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 65(b) DECLARATION by KRISHNA PATEL. (sbd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 42354, filed by VIJAY PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17, #17 Part 18, #18 Part 19, #19 Part 20, #20 Part 21, #21 Part 22, #22 List of Defendants, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATEL et al v. AKBRUDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES M WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISHNU SUTARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES A FREEMAN
Represented By: JOHN A LOCKETT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER CHINCHILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER ZIEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SET HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP RATHOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESAI P VINUBHAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF GABRIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILIAN SARAIYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTANCE RHEINSCHELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAYNANT PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A K SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARAL BHATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONAK MANSURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARIN SAGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG BURCOMBE
Represented By: RACHEL FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROJIYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JK BHATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYED AKBARUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC KING
Represented By: RACHEL FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAPAN DAVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOGITA PAWAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN L LEFKOVITZ
Represented By: BLAKE H JOINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD I N MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKHIL PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYED AKBRUDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJNIKANT PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNIL MAJMUDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETRA ZIEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DILLIP M PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHITRANJAN SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YADUKANT K VYAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN J ZRALEK
Represented By: Charles Herrick Morgan
Represented By: HENRY THOMAS SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITA BURRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATARAJAN RAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJNATH SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAMEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN E PIEPER
Represented By: Charles Herrick Morgan
Represented By: HENRY THOMAS SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVER CITY BANK
Represented By: AMANDA MCDOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NARENDRA MODI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EVA M LAMEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISHNA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIJAY PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?