DIXIT v. FAIRNOT et al
Plaintiff: AKASH DIXIT
Defendant: OFFICER ESPINAL, OFFICER HILL, OFFICER ESPERAN, VINCENT FAIRNOT, OFFICER FITZGIBBON, ALICIA FERRA, OFFICER CIPRAN and OFFICER KELLY
Case Number: 7:2019cv00194
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 RECAST #1 Complaint against All Defendants by AKASH DIXIT (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDMENT TO #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by AKASH DIXIT (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Letter from Board of Immigration Appeals and Decision of US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, #2 Envelope)(rlw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS by AKASH DIXIT to #6 Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff to Recast Complaint using the correct form, and granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 12/18/2019. (TQL)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AKASH DIXIT (rlw)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by AKASH DIXIT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by AKASH DIXIT. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by AKASH DIXIT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - ICE documents, #2 Exhibit 5 - Article Punished for Being a Father, #3 Envelope)(rlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXIT v. FAIRNOT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ESPINAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ESPERAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT FAIRNOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER FITZGIBBON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICIA FERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CIPRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKASH DIXIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?