HILL v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Plaintiff: Charniece Hill
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP and WAL-MART STORES EAST LP (DELAWARE)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00198
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TENNILLE HOOVER on behalf of WAL-MART STORES EAST LP (DELAWARE) Attorney TENNILLE HOOVER added to party WAL-MART STORES EAST LP (DELAWARE)(pty:dft) (HOOVER, TENNILLE)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARNIECE HILL. as to WAL-MART STORES EAST LP (DELAWARE) (SMITH, JAMES)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/25/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 01/09/2020. (gda)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHANDRA C DAVIS on behalf of WAL-MART STORES EAST LP (DELAWARE) Attorney CHANDRA C DAVIS added to party WAL-MART STORES EAST LP (DELAWARE)(pty:dft) (DAVIS, CHANDRA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHARNIECE HILL. (sbd)
November 20, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by CHARNIECE HILL ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Also, all exhibits should be made attachments to the complaint and include a description of exhibit(s). NO NEED TO REFILE. (sbd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3320281, $400 filed by Charniece Hill (SMITH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charniece Hill
Represented By: JAMES R SMITH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP (DELAWARE)
Represented By: TENNILLE HOOVER
Represented By: CHANDRA C DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?