SCOTTON v. WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER
Petitioner: ROGERIO CHAVES SCOTTON
Respondent: WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 7:2020cv00080
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus filed by WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5-20-20. (jdl)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus (HELMICK, AMELIA)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus by WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Supervisory Detention and Deportation Officer Alicia Ferra, #2 Exhibit A-Form I-123; B-Judgment in Case No. 12-60049; C-Final Administrative Removal Order dated 11-13-19; D-Notice of Intent to Issue a Final Administrative Removal Order; E-Final Administrative Removal Order; F-Order of the Immigration Judge; and G-EARM database printout for petitioner). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND MOTION to Amend Memorandum in Support re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed by ROGERIO CHAVES SCOTTON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(rlw)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION TO THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO RESPOND by ROGERIO CHAVES SCOTTON re #7 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Documents in Support of Objection, #2 Envelope)(rlw)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5-4-20. (jdl)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER (HELMICK, AMELIA)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by R.C.S. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-30-20. (jdl)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend Memorandum in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed by ROGIO CHAVES SCOTTON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(rlw)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ROGERIO CHAVES SCOTTON (rlw)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by ROGERIO CHAVES SCOTTON ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 42369.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Various Immigration documents, #3 Envelope)(rlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTTON v. WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROGERIO CHAVES SCOTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?