JONES v. EMMONS et al
Plaintiff: BRYAN L JONES
Defendant: SHAWN EMMONS, RALPH SHROPSHIRE and CHARLES MIMS
Case Number: 7:2021cv00016
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Referring Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Plaintiff to either pay the filing fee or File his Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy). Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 3/24/2021. (TQL)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00495. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
February 9, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bryan L. (Vizion) Jones re #4 Order. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court finds that venue is improper in this district and that it is in the interest of justice to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the Valdosta Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/9/2021. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bryan L. (Vizion) Jones re #3 Order. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Bryan L. (Vizion) Jones. (No Authorization Signature) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(eop) [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bryan L. (Vizion) Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 2/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. EMMONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN EMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH SHROPSHIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES MIMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN L JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?