LANDSTAR RANGER INC v. CENTURION CONTAINER LLC,et al.
Plaintiff: LANDSTAR RANGER INC
Defendant: CENTURION CONTAINER LLC, COLONIAL GROUP INC, COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC and CENTURION CONTAINER OF THE CAROLINAS LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00081
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against CENTURION CONTAINER LLC, COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (HALES, JUSTIN)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint by not later than September 2, 2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 8/26/2021. (aks)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Amended Complaint/Petition by LANDSTAR RANGER INC filed by JUSTIN B HALES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to M-Amd Amended Complaint)(HALES, JUSTIN)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC. as to COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC (HALES, JUSTIN)
August 19, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Docket text must include a description of the exhibit whereas it is of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. No need to refile. Entry has been corrected by case administrator. (sbd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian G. Pfeifer)(HALES, JUSTIN) Modified on 8/19/2021 (sbd).
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC. (sbd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 Summons (proposed) by LANDSTAR RANGER INC as to Colonial Chemical Solutions. (HALES, JUSTIN) Modified text on 8/19/2021 (sbd).
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 **REFILED AT #9** AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HALES, JUSTIN) Modified text on 8/19/2021 (sbd).
August 18, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); After the filing of the initial complaint, any proposed summons should be emailed to the Court for issuance. No need to email this time as summons has been issued.(sbd)
August 18, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit 1 or Exhibit A is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the Court. (sbd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to COLONIAL GROUP INC. (sbd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CENTURION CONTAINER LLC. (sbd)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Jurisdictional Statement by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (HALES, JUSTIN) Modified on 7/8/2021 (esl).
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO THE VALDOSTA DIVISION Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement.(mdm)
July 7, 2021 US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON added. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to case. (rlw)
July 7, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Also, a civil cover sheet should have been an attachment to your complaint. Please email a completed cover sheet to valdosta.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov to be attached to your complaint.(rlw)
July 7, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Notice to Counsel - JOSHUA C CANTON. Your address in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your address via PACER.(rlw)
July 7, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(rlw)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Landstart Ranger, Inc. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3836146, $402 filed by Landstart Ranger, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(HALES, JUSTIN) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (rlw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANDSTAR RANGER INC v. CENTURION CONTAINER LLC,et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANDSTAR RANGER INC
Represented By: JOSHUA C CANTON
Represented By: JUSTIN B HALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION CONTAINER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONIAL GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION CONTAINER OF THE CAROLINAS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?