MANRIQUE YARURO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: ANDREA MANRIQUE YARURO
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, LASALLE SOUTHEAST LLC, DAVID PAULK, AMBER HUGHES, UNNAMED ICDC OFFICERS ##1-5, HOWARD MCMAHAN, FNU BATTLE, FNU CHAPPELLE and FNU WATSON
Case Number: 7:2022cv00039
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Memorandum in Support filed by LASALLE SOUTHEAST LLC ). In the future, please remember that the Memorandum in Support should be an attachment to the motion. No need to refile.(sbd)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by LASALLE SOUTHEAST LLC re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint (IFP) : (ROUSE, JOHN)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint (IFP) : by LASALLE SOUTHEAST LLC filed by JOHN T ROUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Handbook, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Grievence Form)(ROUSE, JOHN)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JEREMY JONG (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (tam)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 EXHIBIT(S) Certificate of Good Standing for Jeremy Jong by ANDREA MANRIQUE YARURO re #5 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, (JONG, JEREMY)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ANDREA MANRIQUE YARURO Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4097320, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Shirley Zambrano 41429. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JONG, JEREMY)
May 26, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by ANDREA MANRIQUE YARURO ); Other (If you are not a member of the State Bar of Georgia and do not maintain an office in Georgia, you must obtain a Certificate of Good Standing from a US District Court where you are admitted to practice. (The Certificate must be issued within 30 days of petition for admission.).(tam)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FNU BATTLE, FNU CHAPPELLE, AMBER HUGHES, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, LASALLE SOUTHEAST LLC, HOWARD MCMAHAN, DAVID PAULK, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNNAMED ICDC OFFICERS #1-5, FNU WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons FNU Battle, #2 Summons FNU Chappelle, #3 Summons Amber Hughes, #4 Summons Lasalle Southeast LLC, #5 Summons Howard McMahan, #6 Summons David Paulk, #7 Summons USA - Attorney General, Civil Process Clerk, ICE, #8 Summons FNU Watson)(sbd)
May 5, 2022 Filing fee Paid: Filing Fee $402.00, Receipt No. AGAMDC-4073792. (sbd)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 4/25/2022. (sbd)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by ANDREA MANRIQUE YARURO filed by SHIRLEY CRISTINA ZAMBRANO. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summonses)(ZAMBRANO, SHIRLEY)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(ZAMBRANO, SHIRLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANRIQUE YARURO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA MANRIQUE YARURO
Represented By: SHIRLEY CRISTINA ZAMBRANO
Represented By: JEREMY JONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASALLE SOUTHEAST LLC
Represented By: JOHN T ROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PAULK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED ICDC OFFICERS ##1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD MCMAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU BATTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU CHAPPELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?