HURST BOILER & WELDING CO INC v. CCI-KCE LLC
Plaintiff: HURST BOILER & WELDING CO INC
Defendant: CCI-KCE LLC
Case Number: 7:2024cv00053
Filed: May 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JAMIE CHRISTY on behalf of CCI-KCE LLC Attorney JAMIE CHRISTY added to party CCI-KCE LLC(pty:dft)(CHRISTY, JAMIE)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CCI-KCE LLC (CHRISTY, JAMIE)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by CCI-KCE LLC ); Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the filing. See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing. No need to refile, for future reference only.(ksl)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by CCI-KCE LLC filed by JOHN A CHRISTY.(CHRISTY, JOHN)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HURST BOILER & WELDING CO INC (KAUFMAN, ROBERT)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by HURST BOILER & WELDING CO INC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(ksl)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CCI-KCE LLC. (ksl)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CCI-KCE LLC Fee paid: Receipt # BGAMDC-4658799, $405 filed by HURST BOILER & WELDING CO INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BILL OF LADING, #2 Exhibit B - LETTER, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(KAUFMAN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HURST BOILER & WELDING CO INC v. CCI-KCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HURST BOILER & WELDING CO INC
Represented By: ROBERT J KAUFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCI-KCE LLC
Represented By: JAMIE CHRISTY
Represented By: JOHN A CHRISTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?