PRAJAPATI v. JADDOU
Plaintiff: SHAILESH KHODIDAS PRAJAPATI, DISHABEN SHAILESHBHAI PRAJAPATI, GOMATIBAHEN SHAILESHBHAI PRAJAPATI and JAYKUMAR SHAILESHBHAI PRAJAPATI
Defendant: UR JADDOU
Case Number: 7:2024cv00110
Filed: October 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs (CHAUDHARY, BHAVYA)
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ur Jaddou)(ksl) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/24/2024) (ksl). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/24/2024) (ksl).
October 24, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by SHAILESH KHODIDAS PRAJAPATI ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. File under Complaint IFP so you do not have to pay filing fee again. Only one plaintiff was added, you must add all other Plaintiffs. (ksl)
October 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4779070, $405 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Ur Jaddou, #3 Summons Summons for MDGA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A- I918 Receipt Shailesh, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B- I918A Receipt Gomatibahen, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B- I918A Receipt Jaykumar, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B- I918A Receipt Dishaben, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C- I765 Approval Shailesh, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C- EAD Card Shailesh, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D- USCIS Policy Manual, #11 Exhibit Exhibit E- Biometrics Notice Shailesh)(CHAUDHARY, BHAVYA) For future reference only ALL documents must be converted into a text searchable PDF format. Modified to add future reference on 10/24/2024 (ksl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRAJAPATI v. JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAILESH KHODIDAS PRAJAPATI
Represented By: BHAVYA CHAUDHARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISHABEN SHAILESHBHAI PRAJAPATI
Represented By: BHAVYA CHAUDHARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOMATIBAHEN SHAILESHBHAI PRAJAPATI
Represented By: BHAVYA CHAUDHARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYKUMAR SHAILESHBHAI PRAJAPATI
Represented By: BHAVYA CHAUDHARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?