Selex Communications, Inc. v. Jajah, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Selex Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Jajah, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Jajah, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Selex Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00813
Filed: April 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas W. Thrash
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30
ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Deadlines re Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 10/2/07. (dr)
October 1, 2007 Filing 29
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines re: 26 Scheduling Order, 25 Proposed Consent Order by Jajah, Inc.. (Ichter, Cary)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 9/17/07. (dr)
September 14, 2007 Filing 27
PROPOSED ORDER - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Arena, Christopher)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26
SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 8/23/07. (dr)
August 22, 2007 Filing 25
Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. (Arena, Christopher) Modified on 8/23/2007 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ryc).
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24
ORDER granting 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Stefani Shanberg. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 8/10/07. (dr)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21
ORDER granting 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Erich Falke. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 8/7/07. (dr)
August 2, 2007 Filing 22
APPLICATION for Admission of Stefani E. Shanberg Pro Hac Viceby Jajah, Inc.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #567769. (dr)
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20
SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery ends on 3/17/2008, Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/7/2008, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2008. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 7/24/07. (dr)
July 23, 2007 Filing 17
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jajah, Inc..(Neyman, Jessica)
July 20, 2007 Filing 15
Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Selex Communications, Inc.. (Arena, Christopher)
July 19, 2007 Filing 19
APPLICATION for Admission of Erich M. Falke Pro Hac Viceby Selex Communications, Inc..Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #567328. (dr)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12
ORDER granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Dale Heist. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 7/11/07. (dr)
July 10, 2007 Filing 11
First ANSWER to Counterclaim by Selex Communications, Inc..(Arena, Christopher) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 29, 2007 Filing 10
APPLICATION for Admission of Dale M. Heist Pro Hac Viceby Selex Communications, Inc.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #566703. (dr)
June 28, 2007 Filing 9
Return of Service Executed by Selex Communications, Inc.. Jajah, Inc. served on 5/3/2007, answer due 6/22/2007. (Arena, Christopher)
June 20, 2007 Filing 8
First ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, First COUNTERCLAIM against Selex Communications, Inc. with Jury Demand by Jajah, Inc..Discovery ends on 3/17/2008.(Neyman, Jessica) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7
ORDER Granting 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James C. Yoon. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 6/07/2007. (cdg)
May 24, 2007 Filing 5
APPLICATION for Admission of James C. Yoon Pro Hac Viceby Jajah, Inc. (dr)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 Complaint; Jajah, Inc. Answer due 6/22/2007. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 5/23/07. (dr)
May 21, 2007 Filing 2
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Jajah, Inc.. (Neyman, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selex Communications, Inc. v. Jajah, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selex Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Heist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jajah, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jajah, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Selex Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Heist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?