Atlanta Independent School System v. S.F.
Plaintiff: Atlanta Independent School System
Defendant: S.F.
Counter Claimant: S.F.
Counter Defendant: Atlanta Independent School System
ThirdParty Plaintiff: M.F., C.F. and S.F.
ThirdParty Defendant: Gwendolyn Stokes and Sherri Jones
Case Number: 1:2009cv02166
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Story
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 171 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 233 Motion for Additional Evidence; and granting in part and denying in part 236 Motion for Admission of additional evidence under IDEA. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 03/31/2011. (rvb)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER denying 154 Defendants' Motion to Quash; denying 175 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply; granting in part and denying in part 178 Defendants' First Motion to Compel; denying as moot 200 Third-Party Defendant S tokes' Motion to Strike; denying 215 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims; denying 226 Third-Party Defendant Stokes' Motion for Protective Order; and denying 231 Third-Party Defendant Stokes' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/22/11. (cem)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER denying 192 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration; denying 205 AISS's Motion for Reconsideration; and denying 211 Third-Party Defendant Jones' Motion to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/23/10. (cem)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER: Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment 48 is GRANTED and Defendants Motion in Limine 130 is GRANTED. Third-Party Plaintiffs' First Motion for Order to Take Notice of Decision of Georgia OSAH on its Jurisdiction 150 is GR ANTED. Third-Party Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Complaint as Against Jones 117 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. To the extent S.F.'s parents seek to state a substantive due process claim for their violation of their liberty in terests, that attempt is futile and their Section 1983 claim based on this ground is DISMISSED. Third-Party Plaintiffs attempt to state a First Amendment violation as a basis for a claim under Section 1983 is also futile and such a claim is DISMISSED . Third-Party Plaintiff may proceed on the remaining claims in the Proposed Amended Complaint. Third-Party DefendantJones's Motion to Dismiss 92 is DENIED, as moot, and Third-Party Plaintiffs First Motion for Order to Take Notice of Decision o f Georgia OSAH on its Jurisdiction 150 is GRANTED. Third-Party Defendant Jones's Motion for Oral Argument 162 is DENIED. Third-Party Plaintiffs S.F. et al.s Motion to Amend the Complaint as Against Defendant Stokes 124 is GRANTED, in part , and DENIED, in part. Plaintiffs' claim against Stokes for intentional infliction of emotional distress may proceed. The other claims in Plaintiffs' Proposed AmendedComplaint 124 are futile and therefore are DISMISSED. Third-Party Defend ant Gwendolyn Stokes's Motion to Dismiss 64 is DENIED, as moot. Finally, the third-party claims are hereby SEVERED for purposes of trial. The discovery stay applicable to these claims is hereby lifted, and discovery may now proceed. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/16/2010. (pdw)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Amend, Defendants' 12 Motion to Strike is DENIED, and Defendants' 38 First Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/8/2010. (gar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlanta Independent School System v. S.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanta Independent School System
Represented By: Sherry Hall Culves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.F.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Zimring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: S.F.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Zimring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Atlanta Independent School System
Represented By: Wallace W. Plowden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: M.F.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Zimring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: C.F.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Zimring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: S.F.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Zimring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Gwendolyn Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Sherri Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?