IN RE: Androgel Antitrust Litigation (No. II)
Plaintiff: George Steven Legrand, Meijer Inc, Stephen L. LaFrance Holdings, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc. doing business as Brooks Pharmacy, Meijer Distribution Inc, Walgreen Co., Jabo's Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Stephen L. LaFrance Pharmacy, Inc. doing business as SAJ Distributors, Health Net, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Raymond Scurto, Federal Trade Commission, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Caremark L.L.C., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Fraternal Order of Police, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., American Sales Company, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc. and Giant Eagle, Inc.
Defendant: Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Perrigo Company, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Paddock Laboratories Inc, Abbott Products, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, AbbVie Products LLC and Actavis, Inc.
Petitioner: AmerisourceBergen Corp., McKesson Corp., Besins Healthcare, Inc., Murty Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Cardinal Health, Inc.
Respondent: King Drug Company of Florence, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., Prescription Supply, Inc., Value Drug Company, Capital Wholesale Drug Company, Dik Drug Co., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Burlington Drug Company and J.M. Smith Corp. d/b a Smith Drug Company
In Re: Androgel Antitrust Litigation (No. II)
Case Number: 1:2009md02084
Filed: October 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 1930 NOTICE by AbbVie Products LLC, Abbott Products, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc of Certificate of Consent to Withdraw (Singla, Rohit)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1929 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT the following motions: #1833 Motion to Strike ; #1848 Motion to Bifurcate; [1852, 1853, 1854, 1858, 1859, 1860, 1861, 1862, 1864 1865, 1868, 1869, 1870, 1871, 1873, 1876, 1877, 1879, 1890, 1891, 1893, 1894, 1895, 1897, 1898, 1899, 1900, 1901, 1906] Motions in Limine; [1857, 1872, 1880, 1882, 1883, 1885, 1892] Motions to Exclude; and #1887 Motion under Daubert, or in the alternative, Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts. The Court GRANTS [1838, 1839, 1840, 1911, 1912] Motions for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/16/2020. (rvb)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1928 NOTICE by AbbVie Products LLC, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc of Withdrawal of Appearance of Joshua S. Meltzer (Meltzer, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1927 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (kt)
February 4, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal as to claims against Actavis, Inc. and AbbVie Defendants APPROVING #1922 Stipulation of Dismissal, #1921 Stipulation of Dismissal, #1925 Stipulation of Dismissal, #1924 Stipulation of Dismissal, #1926 Stipulation of Dismissal, #1923 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (anc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1926 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Actavis, Inc. by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Chan, Elena)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1925 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Abbvie Defendants by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Chan, Elena)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1924 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Meijer's Claims Against AbbVie Defendants by Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc. (Germaine, David)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1923 STIPULATION of Dismissal Of Meijer's Claims Against Actavis, Inc. by Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc. (Germaine, David)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1922 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rochester Drug Co-Operative's Claims Against Actavis, Inc. by Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Sorensen, David)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1921 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Rochester Drug Co-Operative's Claims Against AbbVie Defendants by Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Sorensen, David)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1920 ORDER granting #1910 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/23/2020. (anc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1919 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 1/14/2020. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(anc)
January 9, 2020 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Call center information to be distributed by Ms. Chan. (cmd)
December 30, 2019 Submission of #1868 MOTION, #1879 MOTION in Limine, #1893 MOTION in Limine, #1876 MOTION in Limine, #1890 MOTION in Limine, #1912 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1855 Notice (Other), #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #1883 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. Daniel L. Rubinfeld, #1887 , #1877 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument That This Court "Approved" The Challenged Agreements, #1882 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Keith Leffler Concerning The Par/Paddock Agreements, #1860 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Evidence Related to Defendants' Good Character or Reputation, and Benefits of AndroGel, #1910 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #1887 MOTION under Daubert, or in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technic, #1894 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Irrelevant Matters Concerning The Pharmaceutical Industry And Consumer Harm Arguments, #1892 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux, Ph.D, #1865 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Reverse Payments Were Not "Large" Compared to Defendants' Revenue or Profits, #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #1864 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Defendants From Asserting Their Subjective Views Of The Patent Merits When They Blocked Discovery On Privilege Grounds, #1871 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents, #1859 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Past or Present Litigation Involving Plaintiffs or Their Counsel, #1853 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Suggestion that Retailer Plaintiffs are Unfairly Targeting Par/Paddock, #1869 MOTION in Limine [No. 1] To Preclude Evidence or Argument That Plaintiffs Are Not Entitled To The Full Amount of Their Overcharges, #1901 MOTION in Limine No. 10 To Exclude Testimony From Non-Party Witnesses FTC Investigational Hearing Transcripts, #1861 MOTION in Limine to Limit Live Testimony of Defense Witnesses Unavailable to Testify in Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief and to Preclude Defendants from Playing Deposition Clips During Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief, #1887 MOTION under Daubert, or in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts, #1899 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude PTX0646, #1900 MOTION in Limine No. 9 To Preclude Argument Or Evidence Based Upon Defendants Invocation Of Attorney-Client Privilege, #1857 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions of Guhan Subramanian, #1852 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Litigation Re Assignments in the First Phase of Trial, #1858 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants from Characterizing At-Risk Launches as Theft or Illegal, #1880 MOTION to Exclude in Part The Expert Testimony of Dr. Chad W.M. Ritenour, M.D., #1873 MOTION in Limine [No. 3] to Preclude Evidence that Sales of Androgel Generated Profits that Were (1) Used to Develop New Products or Otherwise Benefit Defendant or the Public; or (2) Allowed Solvay to Recoup Research and Development Costs, #1891 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Absence Of Defense Witnesses At Trial, #1911 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1855 Notice (Other),,,, #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #1883 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. Daniel L. Rubinfeld, #1887 , #1862 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Asserting "Business Reasons" as a Procompetitive Justification, #1872 MOTION to Exclude The Proposed Opinions Of Defendants' Expert Michael Moffitt, #1883 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. Daniel L. Rubinfeld, #1854 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Introduction of Hearsay Statements from FTC Investigational Hearings, #1897 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Evidence Denigrating The Patent System, Patent Examiners, Or The PTO, #1898 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Exclude Evidence That The Introduction Or Marketing Of Androgel 1.62% Was Improper Or Unlawful, #1895 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Product Liability Or "Off-Label" Marketing, #1906 MOTION in Limine to Preclude "Litigation Risk" or "Risk Aversion" or Purported "Early Entry" as Procompetitive Justifications, #1870 MOTION in Limine [No. 2] To Exclude Evidence and Argument That Plaintiffs Failed to Mitigate Their Damages, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jpa)
December 19, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1917 Stipulation of Dismissal, #1918 Stipulation of Dismissal, #1916 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Par and Paddock Defendants pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) ( Par and Paddock Termed in 1:09-cv-956, 1:09-cv-957, 1:09-cv-958 Civil actions termed: 1:09-cv-2776, 1:09-cv-3019, 1:10-cv-1024) (anc) Modified on 12/19/2019 in order to update docket text (anc). Modified on 12/30/2019 (anc).
December 16, 2019 Filing 1918 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Retailer Plaintiffs Claims Against Par and Paddock Defendants by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1917 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Retailer Plaintiffs' Claims Against Par and Paddock Defendants by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1916 STIPULATION of Dismissal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Claims Against Par/Paddock Defendants by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Sorensen, David)
December 13, 2019 Submission of #1848 MOTION to Bifurcate , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (anc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1915 TRANSCRIPT of a telephone status conference held on 12/3/2019, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane Peede, Diane_Peede@GAND.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dcp)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1914 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2019. The Court held a telephone conference at the parties' request. After conferring with counsel, the Court postponed the status conference set for 12/4/2019 at 2:00 p.m. and stayed all pending briefing deadlines. (anc)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1913 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 12/4/2019 at 2:00 p.m. as to E. Chan, R. Chorush, P. Eckles, B. Gerstein, B. Hill, E. Noteware, R. Singla, and D. Sorensen. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (cmd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1912 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1855 Notice (Other),,,, #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #1883 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. Daniel L. Rubinfeld, #1887 MOTION under Daubert, or in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts, #1857 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions of Guhan Subramanian, #1871 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents, #1892 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux, Ph.D, #1882 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Keith Leffler Concerning The Par/Paddock Agreements by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yeager, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1911 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1855 Notice (Other),,,, #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #1883 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. Daniel L. Rubinfeld, #1887 MOTION under Daubert, or in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts, #1871 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents, #1892 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux, Ph.D by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1910 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #1887 MOTION under Daubert, or in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts, #1871 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents, #1892 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux, Ph.D Actavis Holdco's Motion to Seal in Connection with Motions In Limine by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1909 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1848 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1908 NOTICE of Filing Solvay and Watson's Submission Regarding Trial Structure re #1846 Statement and #1847 Statement by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) Modified on 11/20/2019 (sap).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1907 NOTICE of Filing Submission Regarding Trial Structure re #1846 Statement and #1847 Statement filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Yeager, Christopher) Modified on 11/20/2019 (sap).
November 18, 2019 Filing 1906 MOTION in Limine to Preclude "Litigation Risk" or "Risk Aversion" or Purported "Early Entry" as Procompetitive Justifications with Brief In Support by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Letter, Chris) Modified on 11/18/2019 to remove a(sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1905 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential In Support Of Defendants Motions In Limine by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1904 Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 7/17/2020 to remove provisionally (rvb).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1904 AFFIDAVIT re #1897 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Evidence Denigrating The Patent System, Patent Examiners, Or The PTO, #1901 MOTION in Limine No. 10 To Exclude Testimony From Non-Party Witnesses FTC Investigational Hearing Transcripts, #1895 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Product Liability Or "Off-Label" Marketing, #1898 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Exclude Evidence That The Introduction Or Marketing Of Androgel 1.62% Was Improper Or Unlawful, #1890 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence Pertaining To Prior Proceedings And Other Lawsuits And Settlements, #1899 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude PTX0646, #1891 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Absence Of Defense Witnesses At Trial, #1894 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Irrelevant Matters Concerning The Pharmaceutical Industry And Consumer Harm Arguments, #1900 MOTION in Limine No. 9 To Preclude Argument Or Evidence Based Upon Defendants Invocation Of Attorney-Client Privilege Declaration Of Rohit K. Singla In Support Of Defendants Motions In Limine by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1903 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1902 Proposed Pretrial Order by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Noteware, Ellen) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1902 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Noteware, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1901 MOTION in Limine No. 10 To Exclude Testimony From Non-Party Witnesses FTC Investigational Hearing Transcripts with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Motion In Limine No. 10, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1900 MOTION in Limine No. 9 To Preclude Argument Or Evidence Based Upon Defendants Invocation Of Attorney-Client Privilege with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 9, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1899 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude PTX0646 with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 8, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1898 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Exclude Evidence That The Introduction Or Marketing Of Androgel 1.62% Was Improper Or Unlawful with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 7, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1897 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Evidence Denigrating The Patent System, Patent Examiners, Or The PTO with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 6, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1896 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1892 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux, Ph.D by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Noteware, Ellen) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap). Modified on 2/4/2020 (anc).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1895 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Product Liability Or "Off-Label" Marketing with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 5, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1894 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Irrelevant Matters Concerning The Pharmaceutical Industry And Consumer Harm Arguments with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 4, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1893 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Reference To The Androgel Settlement, Defendants, Or The Pharmaceutical Industry Using Pejorative Terms with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 3 To Preclude Reference To The Androgel Settlement, Defendants, Or The Pharmaceutical Industry Using Pejorative Terms, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1892 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux, Ph.D by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1891 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Absence Of Defense Witnesses At Trial with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants' Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Absence Of Defense Witnesses At Trial, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1890 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence Pertaining To Prior Proceedings And Other Lawsuits And Settlements with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1889 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1883 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. Daniel L. Rubinfeld by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Noteware, Ellen) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1888 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1887 MOTION under Daubert, or in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Motion Under Daubert, or in the Alternative Motion in Limine No. 13, to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit 22)(Chorush, Russell) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap). Modified on 2/4/2020 (anc).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1887 MOTION under Daubert, or in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Motion Under Daubert, or in the Alternative Motion in Limine No. 13, to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of Plaintiffs Motion Under Daubert, or in the Alternative Motion in Limine No. 13, to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Technical Patent Experts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) . Added MOTION on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1886 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential re #1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions by AbbVie Products LLC, Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap). Modified on 2/4/2020 (anc).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1885 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' Improper Opinions, #2 Declaration of Ashley Kaplan, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1884 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential In Support Of Defendants Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Keith Leffler Concerning The Par/Paddock Agreements by AbbVie Products LLC, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1882 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Keith Leffler Concerning The Par/Paddock Agreements (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 7/17/2020 to remove provisionally (rvb).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1883 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. Daniel L. Rubinfeld by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1882 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Keith Leffler Concerning The Par/Paddock Agreements with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Their Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Keith Leffler Concerning The Par/Paddock Agreements, #2 Declaration of Justin Raphael, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1881 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1880 MOTION to Exclude in Part The Expert Testimony of Dr. Chad W.M. Ritenour, M.D. by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Urban, Nicholas) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1880 MOTION to Exclude in Part The Expert Testimony of Dr. Chad W.M. Ritenour, M.D. by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Nicholas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1879 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Mention Of The Availability Of Treble Damages, Attorneys' Fees, And Costs Under The Clayton Act with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 9 To Preclude Mention Of The Availability Of Treble Damages, Attorneys' Fees, And Costs Under The Clayton Act, #2 Affidavit Declaration Of Elena Chan In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 9 To Preclude Mention Of The Availability Of Treble Damages, Attorneys' Fees, Or Costs Under The Clayton Act, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1878 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential #1877 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument That This Court "Approved" The Challenged Agreements by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 10 To Preclude Argument That This Court "Approved" The Challenged Agreements)(Gerstein, Bruce) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap). Modified on 2/4/2020 (anc).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1877 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument That This Court "Approved" The Challenged Agreements by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 10 To Preclude Argument That This Court "Approved" The Challenged Agreements, #2 Affidavit Declaration Of Elena Chan In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 10 To Preclude Argument That This Court "Approved" The Challenged Agreements, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1876 MOTION in Limine [No. 4] To Preclude Defendants From Disparaging Generic Drugs or Touting Brand Drugs with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Supplement)(Noteware, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1875 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1871 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15)(Chorush, Russell) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap). Modified on 2/4/2020 (anc).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1874 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1872 MOTION to Exclude The Proposed Opinions Of Defendants' Expert Michael Moffitt by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude The Proposed Opinions Of Defendants' Expert Michael Moffitt, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Gerstein, Bruce) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1873 MOTION in Limine [No. 3] to Preclude Evidence that Sales of Androgel Generated Profits that Were (1) Used to Develop New Products or Otherwise Benefit Defendant or the Public; or (2) Allowed Solvay to Recoup Research and Development Costs with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1872 MOTION to Exclude The Proposed Opinions Of Defendants' Expert Michael Moffitt by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude The Proposed Opinions Of Defendants' Expert Michael Moffitt, #2 Affidavit Declaration Of Elena Chan In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude The Proposed Opinions Of Defendants' Expert Michael Moffitt, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1871 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Russell A. Chorush In Support of Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants from Relying Upon Patents Other than the 894 Patent or Licenses to Such Patents, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1870 MOTION in Limine [No. 2] To Exclude Evidence and Argument That Plaintiffs Failed to Mitigate Their Damages with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1869 MOTION in Limine [No. 1] To Preclude Evidence or Argument That Plaintiffs Are Not Entitled To The Full Amount of Their Overcharges with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Health Net, Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1868 MOTION in Limine No. 11 To Preclude Argument That The Reverse Payment Agreements Are Immune From Liability Because They Were Pre-Actavis with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 11 To Preclude Argument That The Reverse Payment Agreements Are Immune From Liability Because They Were Pre-Actavis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1867 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits re #1857 MOTION to Exclude The Opinions of Guhan Subramanian by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc (Letter, Chris) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1866 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1864 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Defendants From Asserting Their Subjective Views Of The Patent Merits When They Blocked Discovery On Privilege Grounds by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants From Asserting Their Subjective Views Of The Patent Merits When They Blocked Discovery On Privilege Grounds, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Gerstein, Bruce) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap). Modified on 7/17/2020 to remove provisionally(rvb).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1865 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Reverse Payments Were Not "Large" Compared to Defendants' Revenue or Profits with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1864 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Defendants From Asserting Their Subjective Views Of The Patent Merits When They Blocked Discovery On Privilege Grounds by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants From Asserting Their Subjective Views Of The Patent Merits When They Blocked Discovery On Privilege Grounds, #2 Affidavit Declaration Of Elena Chan In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants From Asserting Their Subjective Views Of The Patent Merits When They Blocked Discovery On Privilege Grounds, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1863 (DUPLICATE ENTRY OF #1861 ) MOTION in Limine to Limit Live Testimony of Defense Witnesses Unavailable to Testify in Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief and to Preclude Defendants from Playing Deposition Clips During Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief with Brief In Support by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Letter, Chris) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1862 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Asserting "Business Reasons" as a Procompetitive Justification with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1861 MOTION in Limine to Limit Live Testimony of Defense Witnesses Unavailable to Testify in Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief and to Preclude Defendants from Playing Deposition Clips During Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief with Brief In Support by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Letter, Chris) Modified on 11/18/2019 to correct motion text (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1860 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Evidence Related to Defendants' Good Character or Reputation, and Benefits of AndroGel with Brief In Support by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Letter, Chris)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1859 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Past or Present Litigation Involving Plaintiffs or Their Counsel with Brief In Support by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Letter, Chris)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1858 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants from Characterizing At-Risk Launches as Theft or Illegal with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1857 PROVISIONALLY SEALED MOTION to Exclude The Opinions of Guhan Subramanian with Brief In Support by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Letter, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Under Seal, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Letter, Chris) Modified on 11/15/2019 per the Attorney's request (sap).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1856 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Leslie Sandberg Orne by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1855 Notice (Other),,,, (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Leslie Sandberg Orne ( filed under seal), #2 Declaration of Barry L. Refsin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Leslie Sandberg Orne, #3 Ex. 1 ( filed under seal), #4 Ex. 2 ( filed under seal), #5 Ex. 3 ( filed under seal), #6 Ex. 4 ( filed under seal), #7 Ex. 5 ( filed under seal), #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Refsin, Barry) Modified on 7/17/2020 to remove provisionally(rvb).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1855 NOTICE by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. Notice of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Leslie Sandberg Orne (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Leslie Sandberg Orne, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Leslie Sandberg Orne (provisionally filed under seal), #3 Declaration of Barry L. Refsin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Leslie Sandberg Orne, #4 Ex. 1 (provisionally filed under seal), #5 Ex. 2 (provisionally filed under seal), #6 Ex. 3 (provisionally filed under seal), #7 Ex. 4 (provisionally filed under seal), #8 Ex. 5 (provisionally filed under seal), #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Refsin, Barry)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1854 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Introduction of Hearsay Statements from FTC Investigational Hearings with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 to Ravkind Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Ravkind Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ravkind, Lauren)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1853 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Suggestion that Retailer Plaintiffs are Unfairly Targeting Par/Paddock with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ravkind, Lauren)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1852 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Litigation Re Assignments in the First Phase of Trial with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ravkind, Lauren) Modified on 11/15/2019 to add filers Meijer Distribution Inc. and Meijer Inc. (per filing attorney's office phone request) (tmf).
November 15, 2019 Submission of #1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge, #1838 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal, #1839 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal, and #1840 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1851 REPLY BRIEF re #1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1850 NOTICE Of Filing Regarding the Courts Jurisdiction by Actavis, Inc. (Eckles, Paul)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1849 NOTICE Of Filing Regarding The Courts Jurisdiction by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc (Singla, Rohit) Filers modified on 11/13/2019 (sap).
November 8, 2019 Filing 1848 MOTION to Bifurcate with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1847 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Submission Concerning the Impact of the Retailer Plaintiffs' Settlements and the Pending Motion to Transfer the King Drug Case to this Court by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas Urban in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Urban, Nicholas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1846 STATEMENT re #1836 Status Conference by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1845 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. re #1836 Status Conference Plaintiffs' Consent to Trial in the Northern District of Georgia (Refsin, Barry)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1844 NOTICE of Filing Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Professor Einer Elhauge (provisionally filed under seal), #2 Declaration of Elena Chan in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (provisionally filed under seal))(Chan, Elena)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1843 PROVISIONALLY SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elena Chan in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Chan, Elena)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1842 NOTICE by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1836 Status Conference Certain Plaintiffs Consent to Trial in the Northern District of Georgia (Perwin, Scott)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1841 NOTICE of Filing Consent To The Court's Jurisdiction by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Urban, Nicholas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1840 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yeager, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1839 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1838 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge with Brief In Support by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Julia)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1837 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/22/19, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Penny Pritty Coudriet. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing) (ppc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1835 NOTICE of Appearance of Constance T. Forkner by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, and Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.) (sap)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1836 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 10/22/2019. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet) (sap)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1834 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by AbbVie Products LLC re #1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge Notice Of Filing Of Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential In Support Of Defendants Motion To Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 7/17/2020 to remove provisionally (rvb).
October 17, 2019 Filing 1833 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge with Brief In Support by AbbVie Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Justin P. Raphael In Support Of Defendants Motion To Strike Supplemental Expert Report Of Einer Elhauge, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Singla, Rohit)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1832 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Notice of Deposition of Keith Leffler by AbbVie Products LLC.(Meltzer, Joshua)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1831 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey Leitzinger by AbbVie Products LLC.(Meltzer, Joshua)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1830 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/8/2019. (sap)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1829 Redaction of #1826 Transcript,, (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dcp)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1828 ORDER granting #1827 Motion to Redact #1826 Transcript. The court reporter is directed to redact that portion from any publicly available version of the transcript. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/11/2019. (sap)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1827 Unopposed MOTION to Redact #1826 Transcript,, by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lawton, Adam)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Call center information to be distributed by Ms. Chan closer to date of conference. The parties are to submit a proposed agenda to Ms. Diggs by 10/21/2019 at 10 a.m. (cmd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1826 TRANSCRIPT of a telephone status conference hearing proceedings held on 8/21/2019, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane Peede, Diane_Peede@GAND.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dcp)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1825 NOTICE by Actavis, Inc. Withdrawal of Appearance of Timothy H. Grayson (Grayson, Timothy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1824 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/21/2019. (Court Reporter D) (sap)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The parties are to submit a proposed agenda to Ms. Diggs by 8/20/2019 at 10 a.m. (cmd)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of TELECONFERENCE re: Status Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Teleconference to be rescheduled for the week of August 19, 2019. (cmd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1823 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc of Withdrawal of Appearance of Miranda Jones (Chorush, Russell)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Ms. Chan will distribute call-in information closer to date of the conference. The parties are to submit a proposed agenda to Ms. Diggs by 8/8/2019 at 10 a.m. (cmd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1822 NOTICE of Appearance of Christopher A. Yeager by Paddock Laboratories Inc and Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc/Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.) (sap)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1821 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi K. Hubbard on behalf of Paddock Laboratories Inc and Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc/Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.) (sap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1820 NOTICE of Appearance of Samuel Bryant Davidoff by Paddock Laboratories Inc and Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc/Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.) (sap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1819 NOTICE of Appearance of Benjamin M. Greenblum by Paddock Laboratories Inc and Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc/Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.) (sap)
May 1, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (1817 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT), (534 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT), (532 in 1:09-cv-03019-TWT), (452 in 1:10-cv-01024-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc and Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii); and (1818 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT), (535 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT), (533 in 1:09-cv-03019-TWT, (453 in 1:10-cv-01024-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Actavis, Inc. with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-02776-TWT, 1:09-cv-03019-TWT, 1:10-cv-01024-TWT) (sap)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1818 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Retailer Plaintiffs Claims Against Actavis, Inc. by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1817 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Retailer Plaintiffs' Claims Against AbbVie Defendants by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1816 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on April 4, 2019, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane Peede, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1815 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/4/2019. (Court Reporter Diane Peede) (sap)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1814 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL AND OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 4/4/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/1/2019. (cmd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 1813 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc re #1804 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1799 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1798 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Prior Filings (Urban, Nicholas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 1812 NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1809 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A (Sealed), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Notice of Service for Confidential Documents, #9 Certificate of Service)(Acosta, Adam)
March 7, 2019 Filing 1811 NOTICE Of Filing Of Exhibits by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 13)(Singla, Rohit)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 ORDER in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (776) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (732) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1705) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1809 ORDER granting (740) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (769) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (725) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1698) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1808 ORDER granting (742) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (771) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (727) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1700) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1807 ORDER granting (744) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (773) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (729) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1702) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1806 ORDER granting (747) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (777) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (733) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1706) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1805 ORDER granting (746) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (775) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (731) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1704) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Defendants Solvay and Watson shall, within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this Order, file under seal those portions of their opposition brief and related papers that refer to, quote from, or cite to McKessons Highly Confidential information. The scope of this order extends to Defendants' opposition brief, all attachments and exhibits to supporting documents, and Defendants' motion for leave to file a supplemental expert report. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1804 ORDER granting (761) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (792) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (747) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1731) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs shall file under seal those portions of the reply, Exhibit 5, and Exhibit A that refer to, quote from, or cite to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp.'s Highly Confidential information within seven (7) calendar days of the date of the Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1803 ORDER granting (748) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (778) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (734) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1707) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1802 ORDER granting (745) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (774) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (730) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1703) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Defendants Solvay and Watson shall file under seal those portions of their Opposition, Attachments D, E, and F thereto, Exhibit 7 thereto, Exhibit 9 thereto, Exhibit 15 thereto, Exhibit 16 thereto, and Exhibit A of their Notice of Motion for Leave that refer to, quote from, or cite to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp.s Highly Confidential information within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1801 ORDER denying as moot (754) Motion for Oral Argument in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1800 ORDER denying as moot (799) Motion for Oral Argument in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT(ss)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1799 ORDER granting (766) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (797) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (752) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1734) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs shall, within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this Order, file under seal those portions of their reply papers that refer to, quote from, or cite to McKessons Highly Confidential information. The scope of this order extends to the reply brief, all attachments and exhibits to supporting documents, and Class Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a supplemental sur-rebuttal expert report. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1798 ORDER granting (764) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (795) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (751) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1736) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jdb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1797 ORDER denying as moot (768) Motion for Oral Argument in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT(ss)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. The following attorneys must appear in person, Ken Canfield and Rohit Singla, all other counsel may appear and or monitor by telephone. The Court would like Mr. Canfield or his office to make the call center arrangements and advise counsel and the Court. A Proposed agenda should be emailed to Ms. Sewell by 4/3/2019 2:00 p.m.(ss)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1796 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Egeland on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) (sap)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1795 ORDER GRANTING (732 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) Motion to Exclude Patent Evidence. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/8/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT and 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) (sap)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1794 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Androgel Antitrust Litigation (No. II), Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc (Vanek, Joseph)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1793 ORDER re (773 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) VACATING ORDER Staying Case as to the Plaintiffs participation in the Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 31, 2019. Failure of the Plaintiff to prepare for and participate in the Pretrial Conference may result in dismissal of this action for want of prosecution. Counsel for the Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission are ordered to confirm receipt of this Order with the Courts courtroom deputy clerk. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1792 NOTICE of Appearance for Emily C. Curran-Huberty by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc and Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) (sap)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1791 NOTICE of Appearance for Ashley D. Kaplan by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc and Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) (sap)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1790 NOTICE of Appearance of Matthew B. Weprin by Federal Trade Commission. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1789 NOTICE of Appearance of June Im by Federal Trade Commission. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1788 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith B. Leffler filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc (Acosta, Adam)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1787 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Seslee S. Smith replacing attorney Benjamin Julius Warlick. (Smith, Seslee)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL that the documents listed in #1785 Notice have been unsealed by the Court. (jkl)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1786 TRANSCRIPT of the Oral Argument Hearing Proceedings held on October 1, 2018, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1785 NOTICE to the Court of Docket Entries that May Be Unsealed and a Pending Motion to Seal by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1643 Notice of Filing, #1645 Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1784 NOTICE of Public Filing of Exhibits for Motion to Exclude Mr. Bruno by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L)(Acosta, Adam) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jkl).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1783 ORDER of Pretrial Schedule (see for details) with filing of joint proposed Pretrial Order, Daubert motions and Motions in limine by 12/21/2018, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law 1 week before trial, with tentative trial date of 2/25/2019 as to the FTC v Actavis, et al bench trial. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1782 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Motion hearing held terminating (1740) Motion for Oral Argument and DENYING (1745),(1746),(702) Motions for Reconsideration. There will be no written order to follow. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jkl)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1781 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Proposed Pretrial Schedule (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monahan, Kara)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1780 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 10/1/2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/27/2018. (ss)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1779 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/24/18 (Scheduling Conf), before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1778 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 9/24/2018 re #1773 & #1774 proposed pretrial schedules. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jkl)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1777 NOTICE Of Filing Public Versions Of Solvay's Summary Judgment Briefs, Supporting Documents And Exhibits Pursuant To Courts September 13, 2018 Sealing Order by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1578 Notice of Filing,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 48, #7 Exhibit 50, #8 Brief, #9 Statement of Material Facts, #10 Affidavit Hynd, #11 Brief, #12 Statement of Material Facts)(Singla, Rohit)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Regarding parties proposed pretrial schedules [1773 & 1774]. Hearing set for 9/24/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Counsel for FTC establishing call center for counsel. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1776 ORDER GRANTING (640)/(1577) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/13/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1775 ORDER GRANTING (619)/(1548) Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Gustafson and DENYING (636)/(1572)/(1574) Motion to Appoint Expert Former Watson Employee Paul Gustafson As A Non-Retained Expert Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2(C). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/13/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1774 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc of Proposed Pretrial Schedule (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A)(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1773 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Proposed Pretrial Schedule (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monahan, Kara)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1772 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on August 22, 2018, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1771 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Motion hearing and Status Conference held on 8/22/2018 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT/1:09-cv-00955-TWT GRANTING (1748)(703) FTC Motion for Order to Set a Trial Date and DENYING (1749) MOTION to Consolidate Cases. The FTC matter will be a bench trial in early 2019. Counsel to confer with Ms. Sewell about a date for oral argument on the Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and/Or to Certify Portions of Summary Judgment Order for Interlocutory Appeal and Par/Paddock's Motion to Reconsider in Part the 6/14/2018 Order or in the Alternative for Interlocutory Appeal. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jkl)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions (1745)/(702) MOTION for Reconsideration and/or MOTION To Certify Portions Of The Court's Summary Judgment (1739)(698) Order For Interlocutory Appeal & (1746) MOTION to Reconsider in Part re (1739) Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2018 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. The Court requests Mr. Canfield to establish a call center for those wishing to monitor the motions hearing. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
August 20, 2018 Submission of (1748 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Order to Set a Trial Date, (703 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION for Order to Set a Trial Date, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1770 NOTICE of Appearance of Nicholas A. Leefer by Federal Trade Commission. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1769 REPLY BRIEF re #1748 MOTION for Order to Set a Trial Date & Opposition to Defendants Solvay and Watson's Motion for Joint Trial filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Monahan, Kara)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 8/22/18 at 11:00 a.m., as to Brian Hill Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/17/2018. (ss)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1767 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 8/22/2018 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/16/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
August 15, 2018 Submission of (1745 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Reconsideration/MOTION To Certify Portions Of The Court's Summary Judgment (1739) Order For Interlocutory Appeal, (1746 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Reconsider in Part re (1739) Order, (1749 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Partial RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to FTC's (1738) Motion to Set a Trial Date, (702 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION for Reconsideration re (698) Order to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1766 REPLY BRIEF re #1746 MOTION to Reconsider in Part re #1739 Order for Reply Brief in Support of Defendants Par/Paddock's Motion to Reconsider In Part the Court's June 14, 2018 Order or in the Alternative for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Acosta, Adam)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1765 REPLY BRIEF re #1745 MOTION for ReconsiderationMOTION To Certify Portions Of The Court's Summary Judgment #1739 Order For Interlocutory Appeal filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1764 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1749 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Partial RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to FTC's #1738 Motion to Set a Trial Date filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1763 AFFIDAVIT re #1762 Response to Motion, in Support of Defendants Par/Paddock's Opposition to the Retailer Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Acosta, Adam)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1762 RESPONSE re #1749 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Partial RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to FTC's #1738 Motion to Set a Trial Date, #1748 MOTION for Order to Set a Trial Date and Defendants Par/Paddock's Opposition to the Retailer Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Acosta, Adam)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1761 RESPONSE re #1749 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Partial RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to FTC's #1738 Motion to Set a Trial Date, #1748 MOTION for Order to Set a Trial Date AND MOTION FOR JOINT TRIAL filed by Actavis, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rohit K. Singla, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1760 NOTICE Of Filing Documents Previously Filed Under Seal by Federal Trade Commission re #1755 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H)(Monahan, Kara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1759 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1749 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Partial RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to FTC's #1738 Motion to Set a Trial Date filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Monahan, Kara)
August 2, 2018 Submission of #1743 Unopposed MOTION for Order To Suspend Deadline for Submission of Consolidated Pretrial Orders, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkl)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1758 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Andrew Kobrin on behalf of Giant Eagle, Inc. (Kobrin, Joshua)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1757 RESPONSE re #1749 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Partial RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to FTC's Motion to Set a Trial Date, #1748 MOTION for Order to Set a Trial Date filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Chan, Elena)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1756 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential by AbbVie Defendants (Monahan, Kara)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1755 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1745 MOTION for ReconsiderationMOTION To Certify Portions Of The Court's Summary Judgment #1739 Order For Interlocutory Appeal filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kara Monahan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Monahan, Kara)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1754 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1745 MOTION for ReconsiderationMOTION To Certify Portions Of The Court's Summary Judgment #1739 Order For Interlocutory Appeal filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1753 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1746 MOTION to Reconsider in Part re #1739 Order Private Plaintiffs Opposition to Par/Paddocks Motion to Reconsider in Part the Courts June 14, 2018 Order or in the Alternative for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Chan, Elena)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1752 ORDER granting (704) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; granting (1750) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Defendants may file any responses to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions motion to set a trial date and the Retailers motion to consolidate within 7 days after the later of the following two events: (1) the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs inform Defendants whether they will file a Rule 23(f) petition for permission to appeal the denial of class certification or the time for such petition has lapsed, and (2) the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs file their responses to both the FTCs motion and the Retailers motion. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
July 24, 2018 Filing 1751 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1750 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Federal Trade Commission's Motion To Set A Trial Date And Retailers' Motion To Consolidate filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kara Monahan, #2 Exhibit A)(Monahan, Kara)
July 24, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/22/2018 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. The following attorneys to appear in person, at least one counsel for FTC, Ken Canfield and Rohit Singla, all other counsel may appear and or monitor by telephone. The Court would like Mr. Canfield or his office to make the call center arrangements and advise counsel.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
July 24, 2018 Filing 1750 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Federal Trade Commission's Motion To Set A Trial Date And Retailers' Motion To Consolidate by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1749 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Partial RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to FTC's #1748 Motion to Set a Trial Date with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perwin, Scott) Modified on 7/20/2018 (jkl).
July 16, 2018 Filing 1748 MOTION for Order to Set a Trial Date with Brief In Support by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monahan, Kara)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1747 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Motion to Certify Class (1652 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT)/(725 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT)/(754 1:09-cv-00957-TWT)/(710 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
July 12, 2018 Filing 1746 MOTION to Reconsider in Part re #1739 Order with Brief In Support by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam) Modified on 7/13/2018 (jkl).
July 12, 2018 Filing 1745 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or MOTION To Certify Portions Of The Court's Summary Judgment #1739 Order For Interlocutory Appeal with Brief In Support by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit) Added MOTION on 7/13/2018 (jkl).
July 10, 2018 Submission of (1740 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Oral Argument re (1652) MOTION to Certify Class (768 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) / (799 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) / (754 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1744 ORDER granting (700) Motion for Order to Suspend Deadline for Submission of Consolidated Pretrial Orders in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
July 5, 2018 Filing 1743 Unopposed MOTION for Order To Suspend Deadline for Submission of Consolidated Pretrial Orders with Brief In Support by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monahan, Kara)
July 5, 2018 Submission of (1734 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT)/(764 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT)/(795 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT)/(751 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal and MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal (1736 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT)/(766 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT)/(797 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT)/(752 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
June 26, 2018 Submission of (1731 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT)/(761 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT)/(792 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT)/(747 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal (Portions of the Reply In Support of Motion for Class Certification) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1742 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Withdrawal of Appearance of Hannah Lamb (Lamb, Hannah)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1741 REPLY BRIEF re #1737 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1730 Notice of Filing, REDACTED, filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Canfield, Kenneth)
June 18, 2018 Filing 1740 MOTION for Oral Argument re #1652 MOTION to Certify Class by Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1739 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Solvay's (620) Motion for Summary Judgment on the FTCs Claims; DENYING Solvays (1550) Motion for Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury Against the Private Plaintiffs; DENYING Solvay's (1551)/(621) Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Par/Paddock Settlement; GRANTING Solvay's (1552) Motion for Summary Judgment as to Retailer's Damages Claims on AndroGel 1.62% Purchases; DENYING Actavis, Inc. and Solvay's (1553)/(622) Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq.; DENYING Actavis and Actavis Holdcos (1556)/(625)Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Defendants Par and Paddocks (1559) Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Solvay, Par, and Paddocks (1562)/(630) Motion to Exclude in Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/14/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Class Certification and Accompanying Exhibits ( (765) in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; (796) in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; (750) in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; (1737) in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/13/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
June 14, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re (1737 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1730) Notice of Filing, . to add additional party names that are party to the motion. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1737 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1730 Notice of Filing, by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Meijer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 6/14/2018 to add additional parties to the motion(ss).
June 13, 2018 Filing 1736 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1728 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #1730 Notice of Filing, #1727 Notice of Filing, #1729 MOTION for Leave to Serve Supplemental Surrebuttal Expert Report [Motion of Absent Class Member Cardinal Health, Inc. to Seal Certain Portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, Certain Exhibits to Declaration in Support, and Portions of Supplemental Surrebuttal Expert Report of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, Ph.D.] by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Tucker, Robert)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1735 TERMINATED, DOCKETED IN ERROR APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1730 Notice of Filing, by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 6/14/2018 (jkl).
June 13, 2018 Filing 1734 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1730 Notice of Filing, #1727 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by McKesson Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winick, Steven)
June 12, 2018 Submission of MOTION to Certify Class (1652 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT)/(725 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT)/(754 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT)/(710 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1733 ORDER in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; granting (1729) Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Surrebuttal Expert Report in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/11/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(TWT)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1732 ORDER in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; granting (1693) Motion For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To DPP's Motion For Class Certificationin case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/11/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(TWT)
June 7, 2018 Filing 1731 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1727 Notice of Filing, [Motion of Absent Class Member AmerisourceBergen to Seal Portions of the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Reply In Support of Motion for Class Certification and Related Documents] by AmerisourceBergen Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schumacher, David)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1730 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Surrebuttal Expert Report by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc re #1729 MOTION for Leave to Serve (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Surrebuttal Expert Report)(Noteware, Ellen) Modified on 6/5/2018 (jkl).
June 4, 2018 Filing 1729 MOTION for Leave to Serve Supplemental Surrebuttal Expert Report by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Ellen) Modified on 6/5/2018 (jkl).
June 4, 2018 Filing 1728 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Reply Brief re #1652 MOTION to Certify Class Declaration of Ellen T. Noteware filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Appendix A)(Noteware, Ellen) Modified on 6/5/2018 (jkl).
June 4, 2018 Filing 1727 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Reply in Support of #1652 Motion for Class Certification by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit)(Noteware, Ellen) Modified on 6/5/2018 (jkl). Modified on 6/14/2018 (jkl).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 ORDER GRANTING (755) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; (785) in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; (741) in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; (1725) in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
May 31, 2018 Filing 1725 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Elena)
May 24, 2018 Filing 1724 TRANSCRIPT of the Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing Proceedings held on May 17, 2018, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2018. (kac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2018: #1 Notice) (dgs).
May 18, 2018 Filing 1723 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Mark G. Trigg by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Trigg, Mark) Modified on 5/21/2018 (jkl).
May 17, 2018 Filing 1722 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2018. The Court heard from counsel on motions for summary judgment and Daubert. The Court took the matter under advisement and will issue a written order as soon as possible. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(rjs)
May 16, 2018 Filing 1721 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 5/16/2018. The Court confirmed with counsel that he had reviewed the emails from various counsel for the parties sent to Ms. Sewell concerning the order of the proceeding to be held 5/17. The Court responded with the manner that counsel should be prepared to proceed with oral argument on 5/17. The court will call on defendants for opening arguments and the may argue all or part of their summary judgment or Daubert motions, the the Court will call on FTC and then private plaintiffs and they argue any response to anything the defendants counsel said or to any or all of their motions, then the Court will continue in this sequence until parties have exhausted their allotted time or advise the Court that they have finished argument. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(rjs)
May 16, 2018 Filing 1720 TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference Hearing Proceedings held on March 8, 2018, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
May 16, 2018 Filing 1719 NOTICE by Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc of Withdrawal of Counsel John P. Fry (Warlick, Benjamin)
May 14, 2018 Filing 1718 RESPONSE re #1714 Notice (Other) Response to FTCs Notice of Additional Materials and Authority Relevant for Summary Judgment filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1717 REPLY to Solvay's #1712 Response to the Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting Private Plaintiffs' Opposition to Solvay's Motion for Summary Judgment of Lack of Antitrust Injury filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Refsin, Barry)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1716 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 5/16 & 17/2018 at 3:00 pm on 5/16/2018 & 10:00 am on 5/17/2018 Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/11/2018. (ss)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1715 ORDER granting (751) in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (781) in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (737) in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1713) in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT to extend time through 6/4/2018 to file reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
May 10, 2018 Filing 1714 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Additional Materials and Authority Relevant for Summary Judgment (Weinsten, Randall)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1713 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply In Support Of Motion For Class Certification by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorensen, David)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1712 RESPONSE re #1709 Notice Of Supplemental Authority Supporting Private Plaintiffs' Opposition To Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit) Modified on 5/10/2018 to remove double wording. (adg).
May 7, 2018 Submission of 1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report and 1698, 1700, 1702, 1703, 1704, 1705, 1706, 1707 MOTIONS for Leave to File Matters Under Seal (735, 740, 742, 744, 745, 746, 747, 748 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT), (764, 769, 771, 773, 774, 775, 776, 777, 778, in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, (725, 727, 729, 730, 732, 733, 734, in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT
May 4, 2018 Submission of (1693 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification, (735 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT), (764 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT), (720 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1711 REPLY BRIEF re #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit)
April 30, 2018 Filing 1710 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1641 Notice of Filing, Notice Of Errata For Its Motion For Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement (Singla, Rohit)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1709 NOTICE by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1596 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting Private Plaintiffs' Opposition to Solvay's Motion for Summary Judgment of Lack of Antitrust Injury (Refsin, Barry)
April 23, 2018 Submission of (1698 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1691) Response in Opposition to Motion (740 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (734) Response in Opposition to Motion (769 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (763) Response in Opposition to Motion (725 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (719) Response in Opposition to Motion to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
April 20, 2018 Filing 1708 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Sorensen, David)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1707 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document,, #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1706 Watson Defendants' MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in Connection with Solvay and Watsons Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document with Brief In Support by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul) Text modified on 4/19/2018 (adg).
April 17, 2018 Filing 1705 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document,, #1696 Affidavit,, #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification, #1695 Notice (Other) by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Nicholas)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1704 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document,, #1696 Affidavit,, #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification with Brief In Support by McKesson Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winick, Steven)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1703 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document,, #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification by AmerisourceBergen Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schumacher, David)
April 16, 2018 Filing 1702 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document,, by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1701 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER In Re: Documents filed in the Court's CM/ECF system during malfunction on April 14-16, 2018. The party filing a document listed in Appendix A of this Order ( #1699 ) is ORDERED to refile the document(s) immediately. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/16/18. (aaq)
April 16, 2018 Filing 1700 #1699 ---REFILED --- pursuant to the Administrative Order #1701 - MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re Certain Portions of Defendants Solvay and Watson's Opposition to DPP's Motion for Class Certification re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification by Absent Class Member Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Tucker, Robert) Modified on 4/16/2018 to edit text. (aaq). Text modified on 4/19/2018 (adg).
April 14, 2018 Filing 1699 TO BE REFILED--MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1694 Special Permissions Sealed Document,, #1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification by AmerisourceBergen Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schumacher, David) Modified on 4/16/2018 (jdb).
April 9, 2018 Filing 1698 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1691 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Ellen)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1697 ORDER granting (1692) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Solvay and Watson's Opposition to DPPs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/9/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
April 6, 2018 Filing 1696 AFFIDAVIT Declaration Of Joshua S. Meltzer in support of Defendants Solvay and Actaviss Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Singla, Rohit)
April 6, 2018 Filing 1695 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc Notice of Filing of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential (Singla, Rohit)
April 6, 2018 Filing 1694 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re: #1652 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joshua S. Meltzer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit 22, #20 Exhibit 23, #21 Exhibit 24)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 4/11/2018 (jkl).
April 6, 2018 Filing 1693 SEALED MOTION For Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Report In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Dpp's Motion For Class Certification filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 4/11/2018 (jkl).
April 6, 2018 Filing 1692 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Solvay and Watson's Opposition to DPPs' Motion for Class Certification by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1691 PROVISIONALLY SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1652 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration, #7 Notice of Service For Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential, #8 Certificate of Service)(Acosta, Adam)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1690 ORDER in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (1689) Motion for Extension of Time through 4/6/18 for defendants to respond to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and through 5/21/2018 for any reply. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/27/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1689 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and Joint Stipulation to Modify Schedule by Actavis, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1688 ORDER GRANTING Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motions to Seal Portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class and Accompanying Memorandum of Law and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/22/2018. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
March 14, 2018 Submission of MOTIONS for Leave to File Matters Under Seal, Motions to Certify Class: (1679 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1653) Notice of Filing, (1682 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1653) Notice of Filing, (1680 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1653) Notice of Filing, (1678 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1653) Notice of Filing, (729 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (726) Notice of Filing, (725 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION to Certify Class DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, (731 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (726) Notice of Filing, (730 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (726) Notice of Filing, (760 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (755) Notice of Filing, (758 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (755) Notice of Filing, (759 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (755) Notice of Filing, (754 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION to Certify Class DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, (716 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (711) Notice of Filing, (715 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (711) Notice of Filing, (714 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (711) Notice of Filing, (710 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION to Certify Class, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
March 9, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. re: Summary Judgment & Daubert motions. The Court sets time limits of 1 hour for private plaintiffs, 1 hour for FTC and 2 hours for all defendants combined. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
March 8, 2018 Filing 1687 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 3/8/2018 Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2018 in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT, granting (1649) Motion for Oral Argument. Time limits were set and Ms. Sewell to contact counsel with the Court's available dates. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ss)
March 7, 2018 Submission of (1662 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Seal Portions of Direct Purchasers Plaintiffs'(1652) motion to certify class, (1663 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1653) Notice of Filing, (727 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (726) Notice of Filing (728 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION to Seal Portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' (725) Motion to Certify Class, (757 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION to Seal Portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' (754) Motion to Certify Class, (756 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (755) Notice of Filing, (713 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION to Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' (710) Motion to Certify Class, (712 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (711) Notice of Filing to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(jkl)
February 23, 2018 Filing 1686 Statement of Material Facts re #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, #1556 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Weinsten, Randall)
February 23, 2018 Filing 1685 Response to Statement of Material Facts re #1556 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Weinsten, Randall)
February 23, 2018 Filing 1684 Response to Statement of Material Facts re #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Weinsten, Randall)
February 23, 2018 Filing 1683 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #1556 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26 - redacted, #21 Exhibit 28, #22 Exhibit 29, #23 Exhibit 30, #24 Exhibit 31, #25 Exhibit 32, #26 Exhibit 33, #27 Exhibit 34, #28 Exhibit 35, #29 Exhibit 36, #30 Exhibit 37, #31 Exhibit 38, #32 Exhibit 39, #33 Exhibit 40, #34 Exhibit 42, #35 Exhibit 44, #36 Exhibit 46, #37 Exhibit 47, #38 Exhibit 48, #39 Exhibit 49, #40 Exhibit 50, #41 Exhibit 51, #42 Exhibit 52, #43 Exhibit 53, #44 Exhibit 54, #45 Exhibit 55, #46 Exhibit 56, #47 Exhibit 57, #48 Exhibit 58, #49 Exhibit 59, #50 Exhibit 60, #51 Exhibit 61, #52 Exhibit 62, #53 Exhibit 63, #54 Exhibit 64, #55 Exhibit 65, #56 Exhibit 66, #57 Exhibit 67, #58 Exhibit 68, #59 Exhibit 69, #60 Exhibit 70, #61 Exhibit 71, #62 Exhibit 72, #63 Exhibit 73, #64 Exhibit 74, #65 Exhibit 75, #66 Exhibit 76, #67 Exhibit 77, #68 Exhibit 78, #69 Exhibit 79, #70 Exhibit 80, #71 Exhibit 81, #72 Exhibit 82, #73 Exhibit 83, #74 Exhibit 84, #75 Exhibit 85, #76 Exhibit 86, #77 Exhibit 87, #78 Exhibit 88, #79 Exhibit 89, #80 Exhibit 90, #81 Exhibit 91, #82 Exhibit 92, #83 Exhibit 93, #84 Exhibit 94, #85 Exhibit 95, #86 Exhibit 96, #87 Exhibit 97, #88 Exhibit 98, #89 Exhibit 99, #90 Exhibit 100, #91 Exhibit 101, #92 Exhibit 103, #93 Exhibit 104, #94 Exhibit 105, #95 Exhibit 106, #96 Exhibit 107, #97 Exhibit 108, #98 Exhibit 109, #99 Exhibit 110, #100 Exhibit 111, #101 Exhibit 112, #102 Exhibit 113, #103 Exhibit 114, #104 Exhibit 115, #105 Exhibit 116, #106 Exhibit 117, #107 Exhibit 118, #108 Exhibit 120, #109 Exhibit 121, #110 Exhibit 122, #111 Exhibit 123, #112 Exhibit 124, #113 Exhibit 125, #114 Exhibit 126, #115 Exhibit 127, #116 Exhibit 128, #117 Exhibit 129, #118 Exhibit 130, #119 Exhibit 131, #120 Exhibit 132, #121 Exhibit 133, #122 Exhibit 134, #123 Exhibit 135, #124 Exhibit 136, #125 Exhibit 137, #126 Exhibit 138, #127 Exhibit 139, #128 Exhibit 141, #129 Exhibit 142, #130 Exhibit 143, #131 Exhibit 144, #132 Exhibit 145, #133 Exhibit 146, #134 Exhibit 147, #135 Exhibit 148, #136 Exhibit 149, #137 Exhibit 150, #138 Exhibit 151, #139 Exhibit 152, #140 Exhibit 153, #141 Exhibit 156, #142 Exhibit 157, #143 Exhibit 158, #144 Exhibit 159, #145 Exhibit 160, #146 Exhibit 161, #147 Exhibit 162, #148 Exhibit 164, #149 Exhibit 166, #150 Exhibit 167, #151 Exhibit 168, #152 Exhibit 171, #153 Exhibit 173, #154 Exhibit 174, #155 Exhibit 176, #156 Exhibit 177, #157 Exhibit 178, #158 Exhibit 179, #159 Exhibit 180, #160 Exhibit 181, #161 Exhibit 182, #162 Exhibit 183, #163 Exhibit 184, #164 Errata 187, #165 Exhibit 188, #166 Exhibit 189, #167 Exhibit 190, #168 Exhibit 191, #169 Exhibit 192, #170 Exhibit 194, #171 Exhibit 195, #172 Exhibit 196, #173 Exhibit 198, #174 Exhibit 200, #175 Exhibit 201, #176 Exhibit 202, #177 Exhibit 203, #178 Exhibit 204, #179 Exhibit 205)(Weinsten, Randall)
February 21, 2018 Filing 1682 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1653 Notice of Filing,,,, by McKesson Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorensen, David)
February 21, 2018 Filing 1681 NOTICE by Androgel Antitrust Litigation (No. II) Notice of Filing on Behalf of McKesson (Sorensen, David)
February 21, 2018 Filing 1680 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1653 Notice of Filing,,,, Watson Defendants Motion To Seal in Connection with Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification with Brief In Support by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul)
February 21, 2018 Filing 1679 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1653 Notice of Filing,,,, by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
February 21, 2018 Filing 1678 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1653 Notice of Filing,,,, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Portions of Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and Accompanying Exhibits Containing Confidential or Highly Confidential Information with Brief In Support by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Canfield, Kenneth)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1677 NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal of Public Versions Of Solvays Reply Briefs by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1661 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,, (Singla, Rohit)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1676 NOTICE Of Filing Retailer Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Redacted Copies of Certain "Provisionally Sealed" Documents and Removal of "Provisionally Sealed" Designation From Other Filings by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13)(Refsin, Barry)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1675 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases Retailer Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Material Facts Accompanying Retailer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Solvay's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Retailer Plaintiffs' Damages Claims on Androgel 1.62% Purchases - REDACTED per Order on 02/13/18 filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1674 NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal of Reply Brief by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases Redacted Per 2/13/2018 Order (Attachments: #1 Objections And Responses To Retailer Plaintiffs Statement Of Additional Material Facts Accompanying Retailer Plaintiffs Opposition To Solvays Motion For Summary Judgment As To Retailer Plaintiffs Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases)(Singla, Rohit)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1673 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases Retailer Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Solvay's Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Solvay's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Retailer Plaintiffs' Damages Claims on Androgel 1.62% Purchases - REDACTED per Order on 02/13/18 filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1672 NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal of Reply in Support of Par/Padock Settlement by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement Redacted Per 2/13/2018 Order (Attachments: #1 Solvay's Objections And Responses To Plaintiff FTC's Statement Of Additional Material Facts Accompanying Oppositions To Defendants Motions For Summary Judgment)(Singla, Rohit)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1671 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Private Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Redacted Copies of Certain "Provisionally Sealed" Documents and Removal of "Provisionally Sealed" Designation From Other Filings by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1660 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 109 (SEALED))(Refsin, Barry) Modified on 3/22/2018 (jkl).
February 20, 2018 Filing 1670 REPLY BRIEF re #1553 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq. filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1669 NOTICE Of Filing Private Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Redacted Copies of Certain "Provisionally Sealed" Documents and Removal of "Provisionally Sealed" Designation From Other Filings by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 95, #2 Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit 113, #4 Exhibit 114, #5 Exhibit 115, #6 Exhibit 116, #7 Exhibit 117, #8 Exhibit 137, #9 Exhibit 143, #10 Exhibit 146 (redacted), #11 Exhibit 150, #12 Exhibit 158)(Refsin, Barry)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1668 REPLY BRIEF re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs Redacted Per 2/13/2018 Order filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Objections and Responses to Statement of Additional Facts)(Singla, Rohit)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1667 RESPONSE re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs Private Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Facts in Opposition to Solvay's Motion for Summary Judgment of Lack of Antitrust Injury and Par/Paddock's Motion for Summary Judgment - REDACTED per Order on 02/13/18 filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1666 NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal of Exhibits to Justin Raphael Declaration by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1661 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,, #1639 Affidavit,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 91, #2 Exhibit 93, #3 Exhibit 95, #4 Exhibit 96)(Singla, Rohit)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1665 Notice of Court Ordered Sealed Filing of Exhibit 92 to the Supplemental Decl. of Justin Raphael by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re: #1661 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,, #1639 Affidavit,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92)(Singla, Rohit)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1664 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs Private Plaintiffs Response to Solvay's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Regarding its Motion for Summary Judgment - REDACTED per Order on 02/13/18 filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
February 15, 2018 Filing 1663 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1653 Notice of Filing by AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schumacher, David) Modified on 2/16/2018 (jkl).
February 15, 2018 Filing 1662 MOTION to Seal Portions of Direct Purchasers Plaintiffs' #1652 motion to certify class, including the attached memorandum of law and accompanying exhibits re #1653 Notice of Filing by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Tucker, Robert) Text modified on 2/15/2018 (jkl).
February 15, 2018 Submission of #1649 MOTION for Oral Argument re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1661 ORDER GRANTING (674) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; GRANTING (1657) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/12/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1660 ORDER GRANTNG (672) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; GRANTING (1655) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/12/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1659 ORDER GRANTING (671) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; GRANTING (1654) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. SO ORDERED by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/12/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Filing 1658 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Motion To Seal Select Exhibits And Documents In Support Of Plaintiffs Oppositions And Defendants Replies To Motions For Summary Judgment by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1657 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1637 Notice of Filing, #1601 Response in Opposition to Motion #1598 Statement of Material Facts #1644 Notice of Filing #1597 Response to Statement of Material Facts #1619 Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Meltzer, Joshua) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
February 9, 2018 Filing 1657 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1637 Notice of Filing, #1601 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, #1598 Statement of Material Facts,, #1644 Notice of Filing, #1597 Response to Statement of Material Facts,, #1619 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1612 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #1646 Notice of Filing,, #1604 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1636 Notice of Filing,, #1613 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #1609 Response to Statement of Material Facts, #1608 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1640 Notice of Filing,, #1611 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #1600 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, #1614 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, #1641 Notice of Filing, #1620 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #1596 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Solvay Pharmaceuticals, INC.s Motion To Seal Select Exhibits And Documents In Support Of Plaintiffs Oppositions And Defendants Replies To Motions For Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James B. HYnd, #2 Affidavit Joshua Meltzer, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 9, 2018 Filing 1656 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1655 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1601 Response in Opposition to Motion #1600 Response to Motion #1615 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Acosta, Adam) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
February 9, 2018 Filing 1655 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1601 Response in Opposition to Motion #1600 Response to Motion #1615 Response in Opposition to Motion by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
February 9, 2018 Filing 1654 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1592 Notice (Other), #1589 Notice of Filing, #1590 Notice of Filing, #1591 Notice of Filing, Watson Defendants' Motion to Seal with Brief In Support by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart, #2 Exhibit B - King Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul)
February 9, 2018 Filing 1653 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc re #1652 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Brief MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #2 Appendix APPENDIX OF PROVISIONALLY SEALED EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF DAVID F. SORENSEN IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #3Ex 1, #4 Ex 2, #5 Ex 3, #6 Ex 4, #7 Ex 13, #8 Ex 14, #9 Ex 15, #10 Ex 16, #11 Ex 17, #12 Ex 18, #13 Ex 19, #14 Ex 20, #15 Ex 21, #16 Ex 22, #17 Ex 23, #18 Ex 24, #19 Ex 25, #20 Ex 26, #21 Ex 27, #22 Ex 28, #23 Ex 30, #24 Ex 31, #25 Ex 32, #26 Ex 41, #27 Ex 42, #28 Ex 43, #29 Ex 44, #30 Appendix A, #31 Ex DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED TRIAL PLAN)(Sorensen, David) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
February 9, 2018 Filing 1652 MOTION to Certify Class by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Class Certification, #2 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DAVID F. SORENSEN IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #3 Exhibit Ex 5, #4 Exhibit Ex 6, #5 Exhibit Ex 7, #6 Exhibit Ex 8, #7 Exhibit Ex 9, #8 Exhibit Ex 10, #9 Exhibit Ex 11, #10 Exhibit Ex 12, #11 Exhibit Ex 29, #12 Exhibit Ex 33, #13 Exhibit Ex 34, #14 Exhibit Ex 35, #15 Exhibit Ex 36, #16 Exhibit Ex 37, #17 Exhibit Ex 38-1, #18 Exhibit Ex 38-2, #19 Exhibit Ex 38-3, #20 Exhibit Ex 39, #21 Exhibit Ex 40, #22 Exhibit Ex 45, #23 Exhibit Ex 46, #24 Affidavit Declaration of Elena K. Chan)(Sorensen, David)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1651 ORDER granting #1650 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs may file a 45-page brief in support of their class certification motion. Defendants may file a 45-page brief in opposition. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/6/2018. (ss)
February 6, 2018 Submission of (1572 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson(Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Gustafson MOTION to Appoint Expert (Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Leave to Disclose Former Watson Employee Paul Gustafson As A Non-Retained Expert Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2(C)), (1574 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Appoint Expert , (1550 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, (1553 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude, (1577 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (1552) MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, (1551) MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, (1564) Notice of Fil, (1551 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, (1559 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (1556 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (1548 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson, (1562 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno, (1552 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, (621 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, (640 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: (621) MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, (632) Notice of Filing , (625 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (622 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq., (636 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Gustafson(Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Gustafson) MOTION to Appoint Expert Former Watson Employee Paul Gustafson As A Non-Retained Expert Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2(C)), (630 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno, (619 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson, (620 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION for Summary Judgment On The FTC's Claims to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
February 5, 2018 Filing 1650 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OVERLENGTH CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEF by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Elena) Modified on 2/6/2018 (jkl).
February 1, 2018 Submission of #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1553 MOTION to Exclude to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
January 31, 2018 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2018 at 11:00 AM to discuss oral argument on summary judgment motions, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Mr. Canfield's office to establish call center. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
January 29, 2018 Submission of (1562 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno, (630 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1649 MOTION for Oral Argument re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1648 REPLY BRIEF re #1562 MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Acosta, Adam)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1647 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Singla, Rohit)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1646 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases (Attachments: #1 Brief Reply Brief in Support of Solvay's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Retailers' Damages Claims on AndroGel 1.62% Purchases, #2 Statement of Material Facts Solvay's Objections and Responses to Retailer Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Material Facts)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1645 NOTICE Of Filing Responses to Statements of Fact by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Defendants Par/Paddocks' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Facts to Solvay's and Par/Paddocks' Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Defendants Par/Paddocks' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Par/Paddocks' Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Summary Judgment)(Acosta, Adam) Modified on 10/5/2018 to unseal per #1785 Notice (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1644 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Solvay's Objections And Responses To Plaintiff FTC's Statement Of Additional Material Facts Accompanying Oppositions To Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1643 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1642 Reply Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CC, #2 Exhibit DD, #3 Exhibit EE, #4 Exhibit FF, #5 Exhibit GG, #6 Exhibit HH, #7 Exhibit II, #8 Exhibit JJ, #9 Declaration in Support of Exhibits)(Acosta, Adam) Modified on 10/5/2018 to unseal per #1785 Notice (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1642 REPLY BRIEF re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Acosta, Adam)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1641 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Reply In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1640 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Declaration Of Justin P. Raphael In Support Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Solvay's Motions For Summary Judgment by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1553 MOTION to Exclude, #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 91, #2 Exhibit 92, #3 Exhibit 93, #4 Exhibit 95, #5 Exhibit 96)(Raphael, Justin) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1639 AFFIDAVIT re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1553 MOTION to Exclude, #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement Supplemental Declaration Of Justin P. Raphael In Support Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Solvay's Motions For Summary Judgment by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 91, #2 Exhibit 92, #3 Exhibit 93, #4 Exhibit 94, #5 Exhibit 95, #6 Exhibit 96)(Raphael, Justin)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1638 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Watson Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Actavis, Inc. re #1556 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Response to FTC Statement of Additional Facts Accompanying the Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Eckles, Paul) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1637 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Reply Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1553 MOTION to Exclude (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1636 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Reply Memorandum In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Objections and Responses to Statement of Additional Facts Accompanying the Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 26, 2018 Filing 1635 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Daniel P. Thiel (Thiel, Daniel)
January 23, 2018 Filing 1634 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James King on behalf of Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc (King, Michael)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1633 NOTICE Of Filing Redacted Summary Judgment Opposition Briefs, and Regarding Removal of "Provisionally Sealed" Designation from Certain Filings by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Federal Trade Commission, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Chan, Elena)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1632 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases REDACTED per Order on 01/11/18 (ECF No. 1628) filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1631 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1556 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Watson and in Support of Partial Summary Judgment for Plaintiffs Pursuant to Rule 56(f) filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Hur, Jordy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1630 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement redacted per Order on 1/11/18 (Dkt. No. 1628) filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Hur, Jordy)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1629 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs REDACTED per Order on 1/11/18 (ECF No. 1628) filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Chan, Elena)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1628 ORDER GRANTING Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s (654) Motion to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiffs Oppositions to Solvays Motions for Summary Judgment in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT / (1626) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/11/18. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1627 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Sealing by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1626 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1608 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1596 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
January 5, 2018 Filing 1626 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1627 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Joshua Meltzer)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 1/9/2018 (jkl).
January 5, 2018 Filing 1625 Private Plaintiffs' NOTICE Regarding Previously-Sealed Documents by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc. (Chan, Elena) Modified on 1/9/2018 (jkl).
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation regarding Sealing documents (see order for specifics)modifying schedule for filing motions to seal, filing responses or replies, and that this change will not affect any other deadline in case schedule. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/18/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(ss)
December 15, 2017 Filing 1623 STIPULATION Extending Time to Move to Seal by Actavis, Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1622 Private Plantiffs' NOTICE Of Manuel Filing of Certain Provisionally Sealed Exhibits in Support of Their Oppositions to Solvay's MOTION for Summary Judgment of Lack of Antitrust Injury and Par/Paddock's Motion for Summary Judgment. USB RECEIVED, PLACED IN FILE. (jkl)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1621 NOTICE Of Filing - Notice of Manually Filing Certain Provisionally Sealed Exhibits in Support of Oppositions by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1594 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1596 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #1599 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1620 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases -- Appendix and Confidential Exhibits, pt 3 - filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 - sealed, #2 Exhibit 16 - sealed, #3 Exhibit 17 - sealed, #4 Exhibit 18 - sealed, #5 Exhibit 20 - sealed, #6 Exhibit 21 - sealed, #7 Exhibit 22 - sealed, #8 Exhibit 23 - sealed, #9 Exhibit 24 - sealed, #10 Exhibit 25 - sealed, #11 Exhibit 26 - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1619 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases -- Appendix and Confidential Exhibits, pt 2 filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, pt 1 - sealed, #2 Exhibit 14, pt 2 - sealed, #3 Exhibit 14, pt 3 - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1618 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases -- Appendix, and non-confidential exhibits filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 27)(Canfield, Kenneth)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1617 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1562 MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno , part 2 filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Federal Trade Commission, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - sealed, #2 Exhibit H - sealed, #3 Exhibit I sealed, #4 Exhibit J - sealed, #5 Exhibit K - sealed, #6 Exhibit L - sealed, #7 Exhibit M - sealed, #8 Exhibit N - sealed, #9 Exhibit O - sealed, #10 Exhibit P - sealed, #11 Exhibit Q - sealed, #12 Summons R - sealed, #13 Exhibit S - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1616 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1562 MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno , part 1 filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Federal Trade Commission, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Confidential Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - sealed, #3 Exhibit B- sealed, #4 Exhibit C- sealed, #5 Exhibit D- sealed, #6 Exhibit E- sealed, #7 Exhibit - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1615 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1553 MOTION to Exclude -- Appendix of Confidential Exhibits, with confidential exhibits filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - sealed, #2 Exhibit 3 - sealed, #3 Exhibit 4 - sealed, #4 Exhibit 5 - sealed, #5 Exhibit 6 - sealed, #6 Exhibit 7 - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1614 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs - Confidentail Exhibits in Support of Opposition to MSJ - part 6 - filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 118 - sealed, #2 Exhibit 119 - sealed, #3 Exhibit 120 - sealed, #4 Exhibit 121 - sealed, #5 Exhibit 122 - sealed, #6 Exhibit 123 - sealed, #7 Exhibit 124 - sealed, #8 Exhibit 125 - sealed, #9 Exhibit 126 - sealed, #10 Exhibit 127 - sealed, #11 Exhibit 128 - sealed, #12 Exhibit 129 - sealed, #13 Exhibit 130 - sealed, #14 Exhibit 131 - sealed, #15 Exhibit 132 - sealed, #16 Exhibit 133 - sealed, #17 Exhibit 134 - sealed, #18 Exhibit 135 - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1613 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Confidential Exhibits in Support of Opposition, part 4 filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110, pt B)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1612 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Confidentia Exhibits in Support of Opposition, part 3 filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110, part A)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl). Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1611 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Sealed Exhibits in Support of Opposition to MSJ of Lack of Anitrust Injury, part 3 - filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 103 - sealed, #2 Exhibit 104 - sealed, #3 Exhibit 105 - sealed, #4 Exhibit 106 - sealed, #5 Exhibit 107 - sealed, #6 Exhibit 108 - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1610 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases -- Appendix of Exhibits in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Damages Claims on Androgel 1.62% Purchases filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1609 SEALED Response to Statement of Material Facts re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1608 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Additional Material Facts)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1607 NOTICE Of Filing Confidential Documens in Opposition of Solvay's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Damages Claims on Androgel 1.62% Purchases by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co. (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1606 NOTICE Of Filing Confidentail Documents in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude in Part James R. Bruno by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Federal Trade Commission, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1605 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1553 MOTION to Exclude - Appendix and Non-confidential exhibit filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Canfield, Kenneth)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1604 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1553 MOTION to Exclude Mr. Jack C. Goldstein filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1603 NOTICE Of Filing Confidential Documents Relating to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Mr. Goldstein by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1602 NOTICE of Joinder by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Refsin, Barry)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1601 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs - Appendix of Provisionally Sealed Exhibits, part 2 - in support of #1594 and #1596 Oppositions - filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61 - sealed, #2 Exhibit 62 - sealed, #3 Exhibit 63 - sealed, #4 Exhibit 64 - sealed, #5 Exhibit 65 - sealed, #6 Exhibit 66 - sealed, #7 Exhibit 67 - sealed, #8 Exhibit 68 - sealed, #9 Exhibit 69 - sealed, #10 Exhibit 70 - sealed, #11 Exhibit 71 - sealed, #12 Exhibit 72 - sealed, #13 Exhibit 73 - sealed, #14 Exhibit 74 - sealed, #15 Exhibit 75 - sealed, #16 Exhibit 76 - sealed, #17 Exhibit 77 - sealed, #18 Exhibit 78 - sealed, #19 Exhibit 79 - sealed, #20 Exhibit 80 - sealed, #21 Exhibit 81 - sealed, #22 Exhibit 82 - sealed, #23 Exhibit 83 - sealed, #24 Exhibit 84 - sealed, #25 Exhibit 85 - sealed, #26 Exhibit 86 - sealed, #27 Exhibit 87 - sealed, #28 Exhibit 88 - sealed, #29 Exhibit 89 - sealed, #30 Exhibit 90 - sealed, #31 Exhibit 91 - sealed, #32 Exhibit 92 - sealed, #33 Exhibit 93 - sealed, #34 Exhibit 94 - sealed, #35 Exhibit 96 - sealed, #36 Exhibit 97 - sealed, #37 Exhibit 98 - sealed, #38 Exhibit 100 - sealed, #39 Exhibit 101 - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1600 SEALED RESPONSE re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs - Appendix of Provisionally Sealed Exhibits, part 1, in support of #1594 and [1596 Oppositions - filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - sealed, #2 Exhibit 17 - sealed, #3 Exhibit 18 - seled, #4 Exhibit 19 - sealed, #5 Exhibit 20 - sealed, #6 Exhibit 21 - sealed, #7 Exhibit 22 - sealed, #8 Exhibit 23 - sealed, #9 Exhibit 24 - sealed, #10 Exhibit 25 - sealed, #11 Exhibit 26 - sealed, #12 Exhibit 27 - sealed, #13 Exhibit 28 - sealed, #14 Exhibit 29 - sealed, #15 Exhibit 30 - sealed, #16 Exhibit 31 - sealed, #17 Exhibit 32 - sealed, #18 Exhibit 33 - sealed, #19 Exhibit 34 - sealed, #20 Exhibit 35 - sealed, #21 Exhibit 36 - sealed, #22 Exhibit 37 - sealed, #23 Exhibit 38 - sealed, #24 Exhibit 39 - sealed, #25 Exhibit 40 - sealed, #26 Exhibit 41 - sealed, #27 Exhibit 42 - sealed, #28 Exhibit 43 - sealed, #29 Exhibit 44 - sealed, #30 Exhibit 45 - sealed, #31 Exhibit 46 - sealed, #32 Exhibit 47 - sealed, #33 Exhibit 48 - sealed, #34 Exhibit 49 - sealed, #35 Exhibit 50 - sealed, #36 Exhibit 51 - sealed, #37 Exhibit 52 - sealed, #38 Exhibit 53 - sealed, #39 Exhibit 54 - sealed, #40 Exhibit 55 - sealed, #41 Exhibit 56 - intentionally omitted, #42 Exhibit 57 - sealed, #43 Exhibit 58 - sealed, #44 Exhibit 59 - intentionally omitted, #45 Exhibit 60 - sealed)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl). Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1599 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Appendix of Exhibits in Support of #1594 and #1595 Oppositions filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Errata 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 99, #17 Exhibit 138, #18 Exhibit 142, #19 Exhibit 152, #20 Exhibit 153, #21 Exhibit 154, #22 Exhibit 155, #23 Exhibit 156, #24 Exhibit 157)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1598 SEALED Statement of Material Facts re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Statement of Additional Facts - filed by Giant Eagle, Inc.,American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1597 SEALED Response to Statement of Material Facts re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1596 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1595 SEALED Response to Statement of Material Facts re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Par/Paddock filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1594 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Par/Paddock filed by Giant Eagle, Inc., American Sales Company, Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 12/15/2017 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1593 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1592 NOTICE of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential by Federal Trade Commission (Hur, Jordy)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1591 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing of Confidential Documents Related to Statement of Additional Facts by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1590 Notice of Filing, #1589 Notice of Filing (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1590 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal by American Sales Company, Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs (Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 2/13/2018 (jkl).
December 12, 2017 Filing 1589 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal by American Sales Company, Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 4, 2017 Filing 1588 NOTICE of Change of Address for Monica L. Kiley, counsel for CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. (Kiley, Monica)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER UNSEALING Defendants Par/Paddocks' DOCUMENTS at #1561 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/2/17. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(jkl)
October 30, 2017 Submission of #1572 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson/MOTION to Appoint Expert, #1574 MOTION to Appoint Expert, #1577 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1564 Notice of Filing to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1586 NOTICE by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1561 Notice of Filing,,, Defendants Par/Paddocks' Notice that Documents Provisionally Sealed at MDL Dkt. 1561 May Be Unsealed (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
October 24, 2017 Filing 1585 Notice of Filing CORRECTED VERSION OF #1582 REPLY BRIEF re #1548 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Federal Trade Commission, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Reply Brief)(Hill, Brian) Modified on 10/25/2017 (jkl).
October 23, 2017 Filing 1584 NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal of Memoranda and Exhibits by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1564 Notice of Filing,,,,,,,, #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1581 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,, #1553 MOTION to Exclude (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq., #2 Brief Memorandum In Support Of Solvays Motion For Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #3 Statement of Material Facts Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Solvays Motion For Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 31, #25 Exhibit 32, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 36, #28 Exhibit 37, #29 Exhibit 38, #30 Exhibit 39, #31 Exhibit 45, #32 Exhibit 47, #33 Exhibit 49, #34 Exhibit 51, #35 Exhibit 52, #36 Exhibit 53, #37 Exhibit 54, #38 Exhibit 55, #39 Exhibit 56, #40 Exhibit 57, #41 Exhibit 58, #42 Exhibit 59, #43 Exhibit 60, #44 Exhibit 61, #45 Exhibit 62, #46 Exhibit 63, #47 Exhibit 64, #48 Exhibit 65, #49 Exhibit 66, #50 Exhibit 67, #51 Exhibit 71, #52 Exhibit 72, #53 Exhibit 73, #54 Exhibit 74, #55 Exhibit 75, #56 Exhibit 76, #57 Exhibit 77, #58 Exhibit 78, #59 Exhibit 79, #60 Exhibit 80, #61 Exhibit 81, #62 Exhibit 83, #63 Exhibit 84, #64 Exhibit 86, #65 Exhibit 88, #66 Exhibit 89)(Singla, Rohit)
October 23, 2017 Filing 1583 Notice of Court Ordered Sealed Filing of Exhibits 12,13, 28 by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re: #1581 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,, #1564 Notice of Filing,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 28)(Singla, Rohit)
October 23, 2017 Submission of (1548 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson, (619 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1582 REPLY BRIEF re #1548 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Federal Trade Commission, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Hill, Brian)
October 16, 2017 Docket ORDER approving Defendants and Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, CVS Plaintiffs, and Walgreen Plaintiffs plan to hold their in-person Rule 16.3 conference by December 15, 2017.At the direction of Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/16/2017. (ss)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 ORDER GRANTING Par's (1579) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT and (642) Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT. Exhibit 12 accompanying Solvay's motions for summary judgment shall remain under seal in its entirety. Exhibit 13 accompanying Solvay's motions for summary judgment shall remain under seal in its entirety. Exhibit 28 accompanying Solvay's motions for summary judgment shall remain under seal in its entirety and a public version of Exhibit 28 with a redaction to paragraph 56 or an excerpt excluding paragraph 56 shall be filed with the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(adg)
October 13, 2017 Docket ORDER extension of time granted, at letter request of parties, until 11/16/2017 to hold the in-person meeting and to comply with Local Rule 16.3. The FTC, Actavis, Inc., Actavis Holdco US, Inc. agree that no other deadline in the Courts scheduling Order (Dkt. 615) will be affected.At the direction of Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
October 12, 2017 Filing 1580 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1578 Notice of Filing,,, filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc (Meltzer, Joshua)
October 11, 2017 Filing 1579 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1564 Notice of Filing by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
October 11, 2017 Filing 1578 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Motion to Seal by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, #1577 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, #1564 Notice of Fil, #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, #1564 Notice of Filing,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Meltzer, Joshua)
October 11, 2017 Filing 1577 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, #1564 Notice of Filing,,,,,,,, by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James B Hynd in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Affidavit Joshua S Meltzer in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1576 CONSENT ORDER that the briefing on Daubert motions shall follow the summary judgment briefing schedule (order 1543 in 109md2084) relating to (1562 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno, (1553 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Exclude Jack Goldstein, and (622 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq. (630 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/11/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1575 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Regarding Daubert Motions. (Hur, Jordy)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1574 DUPLICATE ENTRY MOTION to Appoint Expert with Brief In Support by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Leave to Disclose Former Watson Employee Paul Gustafson As A Non-Retained Expert, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1573 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1548 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson filed by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Gustafson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul)
October 6, 2017 Filing 1572 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson(Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Gustafson, MOTION to Appoint Expert (Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Leave to Disclose Former Watson Employee Paul Gustafson As A Non-Retained Expert Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2(C)) with Brief In Support by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckles, Paul)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 ORDER granting #1565 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Summary Judgment Briefs. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/2/2017. (ss)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1570 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc Request to File Original Discovery Materials (Singla, Rohit)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1569 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc Notice Of Filing Original Discovery Materials (Singla, Rohit)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1568 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Documents by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Singla, Rohit)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1567 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Law and Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, #2 Statement of Material Facts Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1566 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Law and Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #2 Statement of Material Facts Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs)(Singla, Rohit)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1565 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Summary Judgment Briefs by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1564 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits and Declaration accompanying Declaration of Justin P Raphael and James B. Hynd by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, #1560 Affidavit, #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1553 MOTION To Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 28, #26 Exhibit 29, #27 Exhibit 30, #28 Exhibit 31, #29 Exhibit 32, #30 Exhibit 33, #31 Exhibit 34, #32 Exhibit 35, #33 Exhibit 36, #34 Exhibit 37, #35 Exhibit 38, #36 Exhibit 39, #37 Exhibit 45, #38 Exhibit 47, #39 Exhibit 48, #40 Exhibit 49, #41 Exhibit 50, #42 Exhibit 51, #43 Exhibit 52, #44 Exhibit 53, #45 Exhibit 54, #46 Exhibit 55, #47 Exhibit 56, #48 Exhibit 57, #49 Exhibit 58, #50 Exhibit 59, #51 Exhibit 60, #52 Exhibit 61, #53 Exhibit 62, #54 Exhibit 63, #55 Exhibit 64, #56 Exhibit 65, #57 Exhibit 66, #58 Exhibit 67, #59 Exhibit 71, #60 Exhibit 72, #61 Exhibit 73, #62 Exhibit 74, #63 Exhibit 75, #64 Exhibit 76, #65 Exhibit 77, #66 Exhibit 78, #67 Exhibit 79, #68 Exhibit 80, #69 Exhibit 81, #70 Exhibit 83, #71 Exhibit 84, #72 Exhibit 86, #73 Exhibit 88, #74 Exhibit 89, #75 Affidavit Declaration of James B. Hynd in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl). Modified on 10/16/2017 (adg).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1563 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1562 MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Acosta, Adam)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1562 MOTION to Exclude In Part Plaintiffs' Expert James R. Bruno with Brief In Support by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1561 NOTICE Of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential re #1559 Motion for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB)(Acosta, Adam) Modified on 11/2/2017 to unseal entry (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1560 AFFIDAVIT re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases, #1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, #1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs, #1553 MOTION To Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq. Declaration of Justin P. Raphael by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Affidavit James B. Hynd regarding exhibits, #92 Affidavit Cherri Petrie)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1559 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Adam) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
September 29, 2017 Filing 1558 NOTICE of Joinder by Actavis, Inc. re #1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases (Eckles, Paul) Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1557 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents in support of Watson Defendants' #1556 Motion for Summary Judgment by Actavis, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Julia York, #3 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of ANDA, #4 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of Buchen 2011 deposition, #5 Exhibit 3 - Docket sheet, #6 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from transcript of proceedings, #7 Exhibit 5 - Final Settlement and Release Agreement, #8 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt of Buch 2015 deposition, #9 Exhibit 7 - Co-Promotion Agreement, #10 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of Heimers deposition, #11 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt of Amato Deposition, #12 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt of Orne Expert Report, #13 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt of Tykot deposition, #14 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt of Bazerman deposition)(Eckles, Paul) Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1556 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Eckles, Paul) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
September 29, 2017 Filing 1555 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Law and Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Solvays #1551 Motion For Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement, #2 Statement of Material Facts Local Rule 56.1(B) Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Solvay's Motion For Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1554 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Memorandum Of Law In Support Of #1553 Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq. by Actavis, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq.)(Singla, Rohit) Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1553 MOTION To Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Patent Law Expert Jack C. Goldstein, Esq. by Actavis, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 10/2/2017 to edit motion type(jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1552 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Retailers' Damages Claims On Androgel 1.62% Purchases by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1551 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To The Par/Paddock Settlement by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 1550 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Lack Of Antitrust Injury Against The Private Plaintiffs by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Singla, Rohit) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 10/2/2017 (jkl).
September 25, 2017 Filing 1549 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc of Withdrawal of Appearance of Craig Glantz (Canfield, Kenneth)
September 22, 2017 Filing 1548 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Paul Gustafson with Brief In Support by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Federal Trade Commission, Giant Eagle, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A to Brief, #4 Exhibit B to Brief, #5 Exhibit C to Brief, #6 Exhibit D to Brief, #7 Exhibit E to Brief, #8 Exhibit F to Brief)(Hill, Brian)
September 18, 2017 Filing 1547 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rebuttal Witness Disclosure by Actavis, Inc..(Grayson, Timothy)
August 31, 2017 Filing 1546 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc of Withdrawal of Appearance of Emma W. Perry (Canfield, Kenneth)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER DENYING FTC's request to designate the Declaration of Jim Hynd as "Highly Confidential" under the Protective Order, or alternatively, allowing the FTC to share this evidence with outside counsel, DENYING Defendants' request to strike the Plaintiffs' expert rebuttal reports and DENYING Defendants' request to serve sur-rebuttal expert reports and extend the time for expert discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/15/17. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
August 1, 2017 Filing 1544 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Consent to Withdrawal of Michael J. Perry by Jordy Hur on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Hur, Jordy)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1543 ORDER granting (609) Motion To Modify Case Schedule in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; granting (1535) Motion To Modify Case Schedule in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Discovery closes 9/14/2017, Summary Judgment Motion due 9/29/2017, responses due 12/12/2017, Replies due 1/26/2018. Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion due by 2/9/2018, responses by 3/28/2018, replies 5/11/2018. (See order for other details). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/31/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
July 28, 2017 Filing 1542 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Consent to Withdrawal of Saralisa C. Brau by Jordy Hur on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Hur, Jordy)
July 24, 2017 Submission of (1535 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION To Modify Case Schedule, (609 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION To Modify Case Schedule, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
July 20, 2017 Filing 1541 REPLY BRIEF re #1535 MOTION To Modify Case Schedule filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Meltzer, Joshua) Text mdified on 7/24/2017 (jkl).
July 19, 2017 Filing 1540 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1535 MOTION To Modify Case Schedule filed by Giant Eagle, Inc.. (Hill, Brian)
July 19, 2017 Filing 1539 RESPONSE re #1535 MOTION To Modify Case Schedule filed by American Sales Company, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 19, 2017 Filing 1538 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1535 MOTION To Modify Case Schedule filed by Federal Trade Commission, Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Saralisa C. Brau ISO the FTC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Modify the Case Schedule, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, David)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1537 ORDER GRANTING (610) Motion to Expedite Briefing in Defendants' Motion to Modify Case Schedule in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; GRANTING (1536) Motion to Expedite in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Plaintiffs' Opposition due 7/19/2017, Any reply due 7/21/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
July 12, 2017 Filing 1536 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Modify the Case Schedule by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua)
July 12, 2017 Filing 1535 MOTION To Modify Case Schedule by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua)
June 16, 2017 Filing 1534 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notices of Deposition by Actavis, Inc..(Grayson, Timothy)
June 16, 2017 Filing 1533 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition by Actavis, Inc..(Grayson, Timothy)
June 13, 2017 Filing 1532 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Janet K. DeLeon by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
June 13, 2017 Filing 1531 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of John R. Tupman, Jr. by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
June 13, 2017 Filing 1530 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notices of Deposition by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
June 12, 2017 Filing 1529 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Jeffrey Leitzinger by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
June 12, 2017 Filing 1528 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Jack C. Goldstein by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
June 12, 2017 Filing 1527 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notices of Deposition by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
June 2, 2017 Filing 1526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Carl Shapiro by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
June 2, 2017 Filing 1525 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Keith B. Leffler by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 ORDER denying (541) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/1/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
May 31, 2017 Filing 1523 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Fotios Plakogiannis by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 31, 2017 Filing 1522 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Bozena B. Michniak-Kohn by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 31, 2017 Filing 1521 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Professor Bazerman by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Bozena B. Michniak-Kohn by Abbott Products, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Lawton, Adam)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1519 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Fotios Plakogiannis by Abbott Products, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Lawton, Adam)
May 26, 2017 Filing 1518 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Deborah Jaskot by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1517 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Larry D. Reed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1516 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Dr. Hayes by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1515 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Professor Elhauge by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 23, 2017 Filing 1514 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Notice Of Deposition Of James R. Bruno by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
May 22, 2017 Filing 1513 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc Notice of Service of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Expert Reply Report (Noteware, Ellen)
May 22, 2017 Filing 1512 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS EXPERT REPLY REPORTS (Urban, Nicholas)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1511 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. of Service of Expert Reports (Refsin, Barry)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1510 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Professor Thomas by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1509 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of James R. Bruno by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1508 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Expert Reply Reports by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1507 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Expert Reply Reports by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1506 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. of Rebuttal Expert Report (Allen, Erin)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1505 ORDER granting #1504 Motion for Extension of Time to serve reply expert reports May 12, 2017 for Prof. Elhauge, and to May 19, 2017 for Dr. Leffler, Dr. Leitzinger, and Mr. Tupman. The deadline for defendants to depose these experts is extended to 7/28/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/2/2017. (ss)
May 3, 2017 Filing 1504 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Reply Expert Reports of Dr. Keith Leffler, Dr. Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, John R. Tupman and Prof. Einer Elhauge re: #1480 Scheduling Order, with Brief In Support by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canfield, Kenneth)
April 28, 2017 Filing 1503 NOTICE of Change of Address for Monica L. Kiley, counsel for CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. (Kiley, Monica)
April 19, 2017 Filing 1502 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Erika F. Lietzan by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
March 21, 2017 Filing 1501 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Pierre-Yves Cremieux, Ph.D. by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
March 16, 2017 Filing 1500 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. Notice of Name Change (Rebuck, Monica)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1499 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Erika F. Lietzan by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1498 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Elizabeth C. Lindsey by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1497 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Roderick R. McKelvie by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
March 3, 2017 Filing 1496 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Daniel L. Rubinfeld by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1495 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Christopher N. Bowman by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 14, 2017 Filing 1494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Leslie Sandberg Orne by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1493 ORDER GRANTING (1491) / (573) Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice claims as to Defendants Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. and Paddock Holdings, LLC. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. & Paddock Laboratories Inc. are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/7/2017. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
February 7, 2017 Filing 1492 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notices of Depositions of J. Robert Powell, Norman D. Weiner and Kurt R. Karst by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 2, 2017 Filing 1491 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendants Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. and Paddock Holdings, LLC by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction, #2 Exhibit Letter Agreement)(Weinsten, Randall)
February 1, 2017 Filing 1490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Guhan Subramanian by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 1, 2017 Filing 1489 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Chad W.M. Ritenour, MD by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 1, 2017 Filing 1488 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Michael Moffitt by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 1, 2017 Filing 1487 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Erika F. Lietzan by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
January 31, 2017 NOTICE of cancellation of the 11:00 a.m. status conference for today. Counsel has advised the Court that the one issue on the agenda has been resolved. (ss)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1486 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Expert Reports by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1485 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Marianne C. Mann by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
January 17, 2017 Filing 1484 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Expert Disclosures by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
January 14, 2017 Filing 1483 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Expert Reports by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
December 20, 2016 Filing 1482 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Service of Declaration of Einer Elhauge Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(e) (Canfield, Kenneth)
November 21, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/31/2017 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Proposed agenda due Monday 1/30/2017 2:00 p.m. to Ms. Sewell. Ms. Chan's office to make call center arrangements. (ss)
November 16, 2016 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/29/2016 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. A new date for the next status conference to be determined and noticed.(ss)
November 8, 2016 Filing 1481 NOTICE of Appearance of Timothy H. Grayson by Actavis, Inc. (jkl)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 Consent Order Modifying SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for deadlines regarding expert reports and depositions of experts. Expert Discovery ends on 7/14/2017. Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/18/2017. Response due 10/31/2017, replies due 12/18/2017. Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motions due by 1/5/2018, responses by 2/22/2018, replies by 4/9/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 ORDER from ruling made during 9/21/2016 conference. Denying defendants' request to strike Plaintiffs' expert disclosures; Granting Defendants' request to take four hour depositions of Drs. Michniak-Kohn and Plakogiannis; Denying Private Plaintiffs' request that Solvay produce documents (see order for which documents). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1478 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Leonard S. Marks (York, Julia)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1477 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Larry D. Reed (York, Julia)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1476 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Keith B. Leffler (York, Julia)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1475 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Frances J. Hayes (York, Julia)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1474 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Carl Shapiro (York, Julia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 1473 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Carl Shapiro by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
October 28, 2016 Filing 1472 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Leonard S. Marks by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
October 28, 2016 Filing 1471 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Keith Leffler by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
October 26, 2016 Filing 1470 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Regarding Determinations Made at September 21, 2016 Status Conference. (Meltzer, Joshua)
October 26, 2016 Filing 1469 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Modifying Case Schedule. (Meltzer, Joshua)
October 21, 2016 Filing 1468 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Jack C. Goldstein by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
October 21, 2016 Filing 1467 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. and Actavis Holdco U.S., Inc.'s Notice of Deposition of John R. Thomas (York, Julia)
October 21, 2016 Filing 1466 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. of Notice of Deposition of Jack C. Goldstein (York, Julia)
October 19, 2016 Filing 1465 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of John R. Thomas by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
October 19, 2016 Filing 1464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. (York, Julia)
October 12, 2016 Filing 1463 NOTICE of Appearance by Kuangyan Huang on behalf of Actavis, Inc. (Huang, Kuangyan)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 ORDER granting (515) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kuan Huang in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/6/16. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 ORDER granting (513) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jay P. Lefkowitz in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/6/16. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 ORDER granting (514) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James F. Hurst in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/6/16. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(jkl)
October 6, 2016 Filing 1459 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Larry Reed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
October 6, 2016 Filing 1458 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Frances Hayes by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
October 5, 2016 Filing 1457 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of James R. Bruno by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
October 5, 2016 Filing 1456 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of James R. Bruno by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 29, 2016 Filing 1455 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey Leitzinger (York, Julia)
September 29, 2016 Filing 1454 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Max H. Bazerman (York, Julia)
September 29, 2016 Filing 1453 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Jeffrey Leitzinger by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 29, 2016 Filing 1452 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice of Max Bazerman by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 28, 2016 Filing 1451 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Notice Of Deposition Of Deborah Jaskot by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 28, 2016 Filing 1450 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Notice Of Deposition Of Max H. Bazerman by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 28, 2016 Filing 1449 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Notice Of Deposition Of Jeffrey Leitzinger by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 28, 2016 Filing 1448 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Deborah Jaskot (York, Julia)
September 28, 2016 Filing 1447 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Einer R. Elhauge (York, Julia)
September 28, 2016 Filing 1446 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Amended Deposition Notice of Deborah Jaskot by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 27, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/29/2016 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.,(Status conference scheduled for 10/25/2016 cancelled). Ms. Chan's office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 11/28/2016 via e-mail to S. Sewell(ss)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1445 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Notice Of Deposition Of Einer Elhague by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
September 22, 2016 Filing 1444 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Notice of Deposition of Einer R. Elhauge by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 22, 2016 Filing 1443 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on September 21, 2016, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
September 22, 2016 Clerks Notation re (1441 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) and (512 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
September 22, 2016 Filing 1442 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 9/22/2016. The Court heard from counsel and ruled on issues in dispute. Mr. Singla to prepare order summarizing rulings have reviewed as to form by opposing counsel and submit to the court for signature. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ss)
September 21, 2016 Filing 1441 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. for Actavis, Inc.. (York, Julia)
September 20, 2016 Filing 1440 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Deposition Notice for Deborah Jaskot by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 14, 2016 Filing 1439 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. of Retailer Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Defendant Abbvie Products LLCs Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 17, 19, 20 and 21 (Ravkind, Lauren)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1438 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Notice of Deposition of John W. McIlvaine (York, Julia)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1437 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Notice of Deposition of John McIlvaine by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 13, 2016 Counsel called re: Clerks Entry of Dismissal - Parties Paddock Laboratories Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Actavis, Inc. reopened as to lead case only. (bdb)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1436 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. of Notice of Deposition of John R. Tupman, Jr. (York, Julia)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. of Giant Eagle's Supplemental Responses to AbbVie's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 17, 19, 20, and 21 (Hill, Brian)
September 13, 2016 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Hearing set for 9/21/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Counsel to submit directly to chambers two page letters outlining issues to be discussed. These may be emailed to Ms. Sewell for Judge Thrash.(ss)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1434 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc for the Deposition Notice of John Tupman (Acosta, Adam)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1433 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John W. McIlvaine filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc (Lawton, Adam)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1432 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Notice of Deposition of John R. Tupman, Jr. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 8, 2016 Filing 1431 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of FTC's Supplemental and Amended Initial Disclosures and Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1430 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CVS and Rite Aid's Supplemental Responses to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 17, 19, 20 and 21 by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp..(Rebuck, Monica)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1429 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to AbbVie's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 17, 19, 20, and 21 (Chan, Elena)
August 22, 2016 Filing 1428 NOTICE by Giant Eagle, Inc. of Service of Expert Reports on Merits and Class Certification Issues (Hill, Brian)
August 22, 2016 Filing 1427 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, HEB Grocery Company, LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. of Service of Expert Reports (Refsin, Barry)
August 19, 2016 Filing 1426 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Service of Expert Reports on Merits and Class Certification Issues (Chan, Elena)
August 19, 2016 Filing 1425 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Expert Reports by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1424 SEALED pursuant to #1422 Order NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Sealed Exhibits by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1423 Notice of Filing,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Noteware Declaration - under seal, #2 Exhibit 4 to Noteware Declaration - under seal, #3 Exhibit 6 to Noteward - under seal)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 8/9/2016 to edit text. (aaq).
August 9, 2016 Filing 1423 NOTICE Of Filing Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration, under seal, pursuant to Order of August 2, 2016 by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Partial Reconsideration, #2 Declaration of Ellen Noteware in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 to Noteware Declaration - SEALED, #4 Exhibit 2 to Noteware Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Noteware Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Noteware Declaration - SEALED, #7 Exhibit 5 to Noteware Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Noteware Declaration - SEALED, #9 Exhibit 7 to Noteware Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Noteware Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Noteware Declaration)(Canfield, Kenneth)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 ORDER granting #1420 Motion to Seal Document (500 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT), (706 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT), (733 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT), (513 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/2/16. Plaintiffs shall file Exhibits 1, 4, and 6 to the Declaration of Ellen T. Noteware under seal within 7 calendar days of the date of this Order. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-02776-TWT(jkl)
July 19, 2016 Submission of (1420 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT), (500 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) (706 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT), (733 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT), (513 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT) MOTION to Seal Select Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration , submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-02776-TWT(ss)
July 18, 2016 Submission of (513 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT) MOTION to Seal Select Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-02776-TWT(jkl)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1421 Revised Scheduling ORDER as to Expert Reports on Merits and Class Certification Issues (see order for details); extending time for Expert Discovery through 3/10/2017. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/24/2017; Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motions due 8/7/2017 (see order for EXPANDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE for each motion type). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/14/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
June 28, 2016 Filing 1420 MOTION to Seal Select Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James B. Hynd, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua) Modified on 6/29/2016 (bdb).
June 27, 2016 Filing 1419 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on June 23, 2016, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
June 23, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/25/2016 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Ms. Chans office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 10/24/2016 via e-mail to S. Sewell. (ss)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1418 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 6/23/2016; Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2016 re (1400 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Partial Reconsideration filed by Meijer Distribution Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Meijer Inc, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. The Court denied (1400) Motion for Reconsideration. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ss)
June 23, 2016 Submission of #1400 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration. Submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (bdb)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1417 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents (Under Seal) Pursuant to Sealing Orders Dated June 15, 2016 by Federal Trade Commission, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 23-a, #8 Exhibit 23-b, #9 Exhibit 23-c, #10 Exhibit 23-d, #11 Exhibit 23-e, #12 Exhibit 23-f, #13 Exhibit 23-g, #14 Exhibit 23-h, #15 Exhibit 23-i, #16 Exhibit 23-j, #17 Exhibit 23-k, #18 Exhibit 23-l, #19 Exhibit 23-m, #20 Exhibit 23-n, #21 Exhibit 23-o, #22 Exhibit 23-p, #23 Exhibit 23-q, #24 Exhibit 23-r, #25 Exhibit 23-s, #26 Exhibit 23-t, #27 Exhibit 23-u)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified to remove provisionally on 6/23/2016 (bdb).
June 22, 2016 Filing 1416 NOTICE Of Filing Documents Pursuant to Sealing Orders Dated June 15, 2016 by Federal Trade Commission, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 22, #15 Exhibit 24)(Canfield, Kenneth)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL and OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 6/23/2016 at 2:00 pm. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/20/2016. (ss)
June 17, 2016 Filing 1414 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Federal Trade Commission, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential (Canfield, Kenneth)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 ORDER granting (704) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (731) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (1412) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT; granting (511) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief in case 1:09-cv-02776-TWT. Plaintiffs shall file Exhibits 5-7, 17, 21, and 23 under seal within 7 calendar days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/15/16. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-02776-TWT(jkl)
June 14, 2016 Filing 1412 MOTION to Seal Select Exhibits to Plaintiffs' #1400 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James B. Hynd, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua) Modified to correct relief on 6/15/2016 (bdb).
June 3, 2016 Filing 1411 NOTICE of Change of Address for Linda P. Nussbaum, counsel for Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc (Nussbaum, Linda)
June 3, 2016 Filing 1410 NOTICE of Change of Address for Bradley J. Demuth, counsel for Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc (Demuth, Bradley)
June 1, 2016 Filing 1409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Joseph Nolan by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
May 31, 2016 Filing 1408 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1400 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit K. Singla, #2 Exhibit 1-3)(Meltzer, Joshua)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDER granting (493) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; granting (1405) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT through 6/14/2016 re Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Reconsideration(Motion) (MDL Dkt. No. 1400).. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/23/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 ORDER approving stipulation re (1402 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Stipulation filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/23/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
May 23, 2016 Filing 1405 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua)
May 20, 2016 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1403 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC and AbbVie Products LLC f/k/a Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. and Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Paddock Laboratories, Inc. now known as Paddock Holdings, LLC with prejudice, and agree that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs and that no other compensation or consideration has been or shall be paid. (bdb)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Actavis, Inc.'s Supplemental And Amended Initial Disclosures by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1403 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand (Dees, Marshall)
May 16, 2016 Filing 1402 STIPULATION Between All Plaintiffs and Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission. (Hur, Jordy)
May 13, 2016 Filing 1401 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc re #1400 MOTION for Reconsideration NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS CONTAINING INFORMATION DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL (Sorensen, David)
May 13, 2016 Filing 1400 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, 8, 9, 10)(Sorensen, David) Modified on 5/16/2016 (bdb).
May 10, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/23/2016 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Ms. Chans office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 6/22/2016 via e-mail to S. Sewell.. (ss)
May 10, 2016 Filing 1399 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Michael Gautsch (Chan, Elena)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1398 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Health Net's Objections to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices by Health Net, Inc..(Dees, Marshall)
May 4, 2016 Filing 1397 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Lynn Dale by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
May 4, 2016 Filing 1396 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Lynn Dale by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
May 4, 2016 Filing 1395 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLCs Amended Notice Of 30(B)(6) Deposition Of Plaintiff Health Net, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
May 3, 2016 Filing 1394 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of FOP's Objections to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police.(Dees, Marshall)
May 2, 2016 Filing 1393 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Frank Jaeger by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
April 28, 2016 Filing 1392 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Proceedings held on April 22, 2016, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
April 28, 2016 Filing 1391 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Third Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Safeway, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
April 28, 2016 Filing 1390 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Third Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Supervalu, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
April 27, 2016 Filing 1389 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition to Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
April 27, 2016 Filing 1388 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Michael Gautsch by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
April 22, 2016 Filing 1387 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 4/22/2016. The Court followed the parties joint proposed agenda (see PDF for details) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ss) Modified on 4/29/2016 (kac).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 Consent ORDER in accordance with determinations made at Status Conference 3/1/2016 regarding fact discovery depositions of individual deponents to be completed by 5/23/2016; 30(b)(6) deposition witness to Par Pharmaceuticals by FTC; as to FTCs response to Actaviss Interrogatory Number 1, the parties to meet and confer in an attempt to work out a resolution; absent a resolution,Defendants may file a motion to compel. (See order for additional details.) Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/22/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
April 22, 2016 Filing 1385 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Second Supplemental Response to Defendant Actavis, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission by Federal Trade Commission.(Johnson, Heather)
April 21, 2016 Filing 1384 STIPULATION Concerning Documents from National Wholesalers by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Meltzer, Joshua)
April 19, 2016 Filing 1383 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Second Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Walgreen Co. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
April 19, 2016 Filing 1382 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Besins Healthcare, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
April 18, 2016 Filing 1381 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.'s Objections and Designated Testimony in Response to the FTC's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 4/22/2016 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/14/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
April 14, 2016 Filing 1379 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' (1) Amended Notice of Deposition of Michael Gautsch, (2) Amended Notice of Deposition of Frank Jaeger, and (3) Amended Notice of Deposition of Joseph Mahoney by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
April 11, 2016 Filing 1378 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Objections To Plaintiffs' Amended 30(B)(6) Notice by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 Consent ORDER Modifying Schedule discovery limits set re (972 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Scheduling Order remain in effect. Fact Discovery Closes 3/23/2016, Expert Discovery Closes 12/20/2016, Summary Judgment Motions due 2/14/2017, Responses due 3/16/2017, Replies due 4/17/2017, Motion for Class Certification due by 5/3/2017, Responses due 6/19/2017, Replies due 8/3/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/5/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(ss)
April 4, 2016 Filing 1375 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc. of their Objections to Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices (Ravkind, Lauren)
April 1, 2016 Filing 1374 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Supervalu, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
April 1, 2016 Filing 1373 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Second Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Safeway, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
April 1, 2016 Filing 1372 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc. of its Objections to Defendants' Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (Ravkind, Lauren)
March 31, 2016 Filing 1376 NOTICE of Appearance of Thrisha M. Grant by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (bdb)
March 30, 2016 Filing 1371 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Amended Notice Of 30(B)(6) Deposition Of Plaintiff Fraternal Order Of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 30, 2016 Filing 1370 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff George Steven LeGrand by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 28, 2016 Filing 1369 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. (Certificate of Service of Actavis, Inc.'s Objections to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition to Defendant Actavis, Inc.) (York, Julia)
March 25, 2016 Filing 1368 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Objections To Plaintiffs' 30(B)(6) Notice by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 25, 2016 Filing 1367 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's First Supplemental Response to Defendant Actavis, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
March 25, 2016 Filing 1366 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rite Aid Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp..(Rebuck, Monica)
March 24, 2016 Filing 1365 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Rite Aid Corporation Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1364 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff American Sales Company, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1363 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Subpoenas On Non-Parties AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., And McKesson Corporation by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1362 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Joseph Mahoney by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1361 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co., Inc.'s Objections to Defendants' Amended rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc.(Segura, Susan)
March 21, 2016 Filing 1360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Cross-Notice of Deposition Subpoena to Joseph A. Mahoney by Abbott Products, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Lawton, Adam)
March 17, 2016 Filing 1359 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Actavis, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Second Set of Interrogatories to Actavis, Inc. by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia)
March 17, 2016 Filing 1358 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Response To The Federal Trade Commissions Third Set Of Interrogatories To Abbvie Products LLC by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 ORDER SUSPENDING Local Rule 83.1(B)(2) requiring signature of local counsel upon all pleadings and other papers filed in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(ss)
March 14, 2016 Filing 1356 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 14, 2016 Filing 1355 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co., Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 14, 2016 Filing 1354 STIPULATION Between All Plaintiffs and Defendant Actavis, Inc. by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
March 14, 2016 Filing 1353 STIPULATION Between All Plaintiffs and Defendant Actavis, Inc. Regarding Rule 30(B)(6) Notice of Deposition by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
March 14, 2016 Filing 1352 STIPULATION Between All Plaintiffs and Defendant Actavis, Inc. by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
March 14, 2016 Filing 1351 NOTICE of Change of Address for Scott E. Perwin, counsel for American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott)
March 11, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/22/2016 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., Ms. Chan's office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 4/21/2016 via e-mail to S. Sewell. (ss)
March 10, 2016 Filing 1350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CVS and Caremark's Objections to Defendants' Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C..(Rebuck, Monica)
March 9, 2016 Filing 1349 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE /Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Rochester Drug Co-operative, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 9, 2016 Filing 1348 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE /Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Caremark L.L.C. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 9, 2016 Filing 1347 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE /Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Meijer, Inc., et al. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 9, 2016 Filing 1346 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE /Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 4, 2016 Filing 1345 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of its Objections to Defendants Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Giant Eagle, Inc..(Hill, Brian)
March 2, 2016 Filing 1344 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Walgreen Co. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
March 2, 2016 Filing 1343 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on March 1, 2016, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
March 2, 2016 Filing 1342 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Walgreen Co. of its Objections to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (Ravkind, Lauren)
March 1, 2016 Filing 1341 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Telephone/Status Conference held on 3/1/2016. The Court followed the parties' proposed agenda. Counsel updated the Court on the status of discovery. The Court will give the parties 60 days after the close of discovery (on March 23rd) to finish the depositions already noticed. Parties are not required to respond to written discovery served by either side in the last two weeks. The Court ordered the parties to present a proposed consent order to the Court readjusting deadlines for expert reports, etc., extending the deadlines generally for 60 days. Regarding Plaintiffs' second Rule 30(b)(6) notice to Par: Par is ORDERED to produce the 30(b)(6) witness pursuant to the FTC's notice. Regarding the FTC's response to Actavis's Interrogatory No. 1: the parties are to meet and confer in an attempt to work out a resolution; absent a resolution, Defendants may file a motion to compel. The parties are to contact Ms. Sewell next week to set up a date for the next status conference in a month or 6 weeks from now. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(bdb)
March 1, 2016 Filing 1340 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Subpoena Ad Testiicandum to ZS Associates by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1339 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Service of Subpoena on Joseph Mahoney by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Notices of Deposition and Amended 30(b)6 Notices of Deposition by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1337 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Giant Eagle, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1336 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Of Besins Healthcare, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Lynn Dale by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 ORDER denying as moot (674) Joint Motion to Seal Use of Highly Confidential Information During January 22, 2016 Status Conference 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; denying as moot (699) Joint Motion to Seal Use of HighlyConfidential Information During January 22, 2016 Status Conference in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; denying as moot (668) Joint Motion to Seal Use of HighlyConfidential Information During January 22, 2016 Status Conference in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; denying as moot (1277) Joint Motion to Seal Use of HighlyConfidential Information During January 22, 2016 Status Conference in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/24/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(bdb)
February 24, 2016 Filing 1333 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Besins Healthcare, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
February 24, 2016 Filing 1332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Edward Heimers by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 24, 2016 Filing 1331 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Carol Yeomans by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 24, 2016 Filing 1330 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Paul Campanelli by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 3/1/2016 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/24/2016. (ss)
February 23, 2016 Filing 1328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Joseph Nolan by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 23, 2016 Filing 1327 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by HEB Grocery Company, LP of its Objections to Defendants Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (Ravkind, Lauren)
February 22, 2016 Filing 1326 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff HEB Grocery Company LP Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1325 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of RFAs and RFPs to Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RFAs, RFPs, and Interrogatories to Defendant Paddock Holdings, LLC by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1323 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of RFAs, RFPs, and Interrogatories to Defendant Actavis, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1322 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of RFAs, RFPs, and Interrogatories to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for AbbVie Products LLC's First Set of Requests for Admission to All Plaintiffs by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1320 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE End-Payor Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests to Defendants by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1319 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 19, 2016 Submission of #1277 Joint MOTION to Seal Use of Highly Confidential Information During January 22, 2016 Status Conference. Submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (bdb)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1318 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pf Actavis, Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories to Private Plaintiffs by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1317 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Actavis, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Admission to All Plaintiffs by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1316 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Actavis, Inc.s Request for Production of Documents to All Plaintiffs by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1315 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Subpoena Ad Testificandum of John MacPhee by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1314 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs Objections and Response to Defendant Abbvie Products LLCs Interrogatory No. 22 to Private Plaintiffs by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1313 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. Giant Eagle, Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Response to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory No. 22 to Private Plaintiffs (Hill, Brian)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1312 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. Walgreen Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Response to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory No. 22 to Private Plaintiffs (Ravkind, Lauren)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CVS and Rite Aid's Supplemental Objections and Response to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory No. 22 to Private Plaintiffs by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp..(Rebuck, Monica)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1310 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Response to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Fourth Set of Interrogatory No. 22 to Private Plaintiffs by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
February 17, 2016 Filing 1309 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for AbbVie Products LLC's Fifth Set of Interrogatories to the Private Plaintiffs by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 17, 2016 Filing 1308 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's First Set of Interrogatories to Private Plaintiffs and Second Set of Interrogatories to the Federal Trade Commission by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
February 17, 2016 Filing 1307 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Request for Production of Documents to Private Plaintiffs and the Federal Trade Commission by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
February 17, 2016 Filing 1306 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Responses to Defendant Actavis, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
February 16, 2016 Filing 1305 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Rule 5.4(a)(4) Notice of Subpoena to McKinsey & Company (Canfield, Kenneth)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1304 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Fifth Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Third Set of Interrogatories and Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Paddock Holdings, LLC by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1302 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Second Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Actavis, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Third Set of Interrogatories and Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC by Federal Trade Commission.(Lamb, Hannah)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC's F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s First Supplemental Response To The Federal Trade Commissions Second Set Of Interrogatories To Abbvie Products LLC by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1298 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Supplemental and Amended Responses to End-Payor Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1297 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Par/Paddock's Supplemental and Amended Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
February 9, 2016 Filing 1296 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Of Oliver Engert by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Raphael, Justin)
February 9, 2016 Filing 1295 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc. (Ravkind, Lauren)
February 8, 2016 Filing 1294 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Supervalu, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 8, 2016 Filing 1293 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Safeway, Inc. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 30(B)(6) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
February 8, 2016 Filing 1292 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Benjamin Julius Warlick replacing attorney Brian Joel Levy. (Warlick, Benjamin)
February 5, 2016 Filing 1291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. (Allen, Erin)
February 3, 2016 Filing 1290 NOTICE of Appearance of Daniel P. Thiel on behalf of CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. (bdb)
February 1, 2016 Filing 1289 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on January 22, 2016, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1288 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Federal Trade Commission of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition to Defendant Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Weinsten, Randall)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (1232) Motion for Service in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT ;granting in part and denying in part (649) Motion for Service in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting in part and denying in part (674) Motion for Service in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting in part and denying in part (643) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; GRANTED as to the non-class members,DENIED as to the absent putative class members. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1285 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC's First Supplemental Response To End Payor Plaintiffs' Interrogatories To Defendant Abbvie Products LLC (Nos. 1-3) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1284 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC's First Supplemental Response To Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Interrogatories To Abbvie Products LLC (Nos. 1-3) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
January 28, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/1/2016 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. Ms. Chans office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 2/29/2016 via e-mail to S. Sewell.(ss)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1286 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin P. Raphael for Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc (adg)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1283 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1276 Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,,, #1232 MOTION for Service Notice Of Manual Filing Of Documents Pursuant To Sealing Order Dated January 20, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Reply In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members)(Meltzer, Joshua)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1282 REPLY BRIEF re #1232 MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL ) (adg)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1281 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. Giant Eagle, Inc.'s Response to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Private Plaintiffs (Allen, Erin)
January 22, 2016 Filing 1280 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: TelephoneStatus Conference held on 1/22/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ss) Modified to correct filed date on 2/19/2016 (bdb).
January 22, 2016 Filing 1279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Janie Gwinn by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
January 21, 2016 Filing 1278 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Neill, Anna)
January 21, 2016 Filing 1277 Joint MOTION to Seal Use of Highly Confidential Information During January 22, 2016 Status Conference by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp.. (Tucker, Robert)
January 21, 2016 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: TIME CHANGE and change to telephone conference. Status Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. The same call center information provided for the 10:00 a.m. in court conference can be used for the 11:00 a.m. conference. (ss)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER GRANTING (671) Motion to Seal Portions of Defendants Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (696) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (665) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1270) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(adg)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Responses to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EPP's Responses to Defendant AbbVie Products LLCs Fourth Set of Interrogatories by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. CVS and Rite Aid's Responses to AbbVie's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Rebuck, Monica)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1272 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. Walgreen Plaintiffs' Response to AbbVie Products LLC's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Private Plaintiffs (Ravkind, Lauren)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1271 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc - Certificate of Service of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Fourth Set of Interrogatories t Private Plaintiffs (Canfield, Kenneth)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1270 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucker, Robert)
January 15, 2016 Filing 1269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. Supplemental and Amended Response to End-Payor Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (York, Julia)
January 15, 2016 Filing 1268 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Actavis, Inc. of Supplemental and Amended Response to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (York, Julia)
January 14, 2016 Filing 1267 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc /Notice of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential (Meltzer, Joshua)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 1/22/2016 at 10:00 a.m., for status conference. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/14/2016. (ss)
January 13, 2016 Filing 1265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Jean-Louis Anspach to counsel for Actavis by Federal Trade Commission.(Schwartz, David)
January 13, 2016 Filing 1264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Jean-Louis Anspach to counsel for Solvay by Federal Trade Commission.(Schwartz, David)
January 8, 2016 Filing 1263 FILED UNDER SEAL RESPONSE in Opposition re #1232 MOTION for Service of Subpoenas on Regional Wholesalers and Other Entities filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Highly Confidential, #2 Exhibit D - Highly Confidential, #3 Exhibit E - Highly Confidential, #4 Exhibit I - Highly Confidential)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 1/8/2016 (adg).
January 7, 2016 Filing 1262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Notice of Deposition of Janie Gwinn by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1261 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1257 Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice Of Compliance Regarding Sealing Order Dated December 28, 2015 (Meltzer, Joshua)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 ORDER granting (664) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (689) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (658) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1258) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT. Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs shall file under seal opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas or portions that cite or refer to documents, information or testimony designated by Cardinal Health as Confidential or Highly Confidential,, including Exhibit I and any such information contained in Exhibits C-E.. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/4/2016. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part (see order for details) re (377 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged filed by Federal Trade Commission, (1128 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged filed by Walgreen Co., Meijer Distribution Inc, Supervalu Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Meijer Inc, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
December 30, 2015 Filing 1258 MOTION to Seal Portions of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Serve Subpoenas on Regional Wholesalers and Other Entities by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucker, Robert)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 ORDER granting (650) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (675) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (644) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1234) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT portion of memo of law in support of Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members within 7 calendars days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 ORDER granting (657) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (682) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (651) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1249) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
December 23, 2015 Clerks Notation re (1252 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (417 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
December 23, 2015 Filing 1255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP by Federal Trade Commission.(Schwartz, David)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1254 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1253 Affidavit,, #1251 Notice of Filing, filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Regional Wholesalers and Other Entities, Declaration of David Sorensen and exhibits thereto, and Notice of Filing Under Seal (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1253 AFFIDAVIT re #1251 Notice of Filing, in support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Regional Wholesalers and Other Entities by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Canfield, Kenneth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1252 Supplemental Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Acosta, Adam)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1251 NOTICE Of Filing Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc re #1248 Notice of Filing, #1232 MOTION for Service (Canfield, Kenneth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Janie Gwinn by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
December 21, 2015 Filing 1249 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members re: #1239 Order,, #1232 MOTION for Service by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canfield, Kenneth)
December 16, 2015 Submission of #1234 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Motion To Seal Portions Of The Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (adg)
December 14, 2015 Filing 1248 Memorandum of Law in Support by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1232 MOTION for Service (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL ) (adg)
December 14, 2015 Filing 1247 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Fourth Set Of Interrogatories To Private Plaintiffs by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
December 14, 2015 Filing 1246 NOTICE Of Filing Documents Pursuant to Sealing Order Dated December 7, 2015 by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1240 Response in Support of Motion, #1234 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Motion To Seal Portions Of The Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members, #1244 Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1232 MOTION for Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members)(Meltzer, Joshua)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1245 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc Notice Of In Camera Submission (Meltzer, Joshua)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 ORDER GRANTING AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp.'s (1242) Motion to Seal in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT Portions of the Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members, (653) Motion to Seal Portions of the Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, (678) Motion to Seal Portions of the Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT and (647) Motion to Seal Portions of the Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT. Defendants shall file under seal those portions of the Memorandum of Law that refer to, quote from, or cite to information from the Expert Report of Daniel L. Rubinfeld Regarding Class Certification within 7 calendar days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/7/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(adg)
December 4, 2015 Filing 1243 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Proceedings held on December 1, 2015, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
December 4, 2015 Filing 1242 MOTION to Seal [Portions of the Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas on Putative Class Members [re 1233]] by AmerisourceBergen Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schumacher, David)
December 1, 2015 Filing 1241 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Livingston for Giant Eagle, Inc. (adg)
December 1, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Ms. Chans office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 1/23/2016 via e-mail to S. Sewell. (ss)
December 1, 2015 Filing 1240 RESPONSE in Support re #1234 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Motion To Seal Portions Of The Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Tucker, Robert)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 ORDER re (674 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) MOTION for Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, (649 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) MOTION Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, (643 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) MOTION for Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, (1232 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Service filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc Extending Time through 12/21/2015 for plaintiffs to file Response and through 1/14/2016 for Defendants' reply. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT(ss)
December 1, 2015 Filing 1238 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 12/1/2015. The Court followed the parties proposed agenda, see PDF for details. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ss)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. Giant Eagle, Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 (Allen, Erin)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1236 NOTICE by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc Notice of In Camera Submission (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Acosta, Adam)
November 25, 2015 Filing 1235 NOTICE of In Camera Submission by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1212 Status Conference (Meltzer, Joshua) Modified on 11/27/2015 (adg).
November 25, 2015 Filing 1234 MOTION to Seal Portions Of The Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Seal Portions Of The Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members)(Meltzer, Joshua) Modified on 11/27/2015 (adg).
November 25, 2015 Filing 1233 NOTICE by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc /Defendants' Notice Of Service Of Documents Containing Information Designated As Confidential (Meltzer, Joshua)
November 25, 2015 Filing 1232 MOTION for Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 /Declaration Of Joshua S. Meltzer In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration Of Joshua S. Meltzer In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration Of Joshua S. Meltzer In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration Of Joshua S. Meltzer In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members, #5 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Motion For Leave To Serve Subpoenas On Putative Class Members)(Meltzer, Joshua) Modified on 11/27/2015 to correct docket text (adg).
November 24, 2015 Filing 1231 NOTICE by Actavis, Inc. re #1212 Status Conference,,,, (Notice of In Camera Submission) (York, Julia)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 12/1/2015 at 11:00 a.m. for status conference. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/24/2015. (ss)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 Consent ORDER Modifying Schedule. All limits on discovery set for in sections II to VI of the Discovery Order, entered 6/11/2014 remain in effect. Fact Discovery closes 3/23/2016. Expert Discovery Closed 9/23/2016. Summary Judgment Motions due 11/15/2016. Plaintiffs' Class Certification due 2/3/2017. See order for specific due dates for responses & replies to mentions motions. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/24/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(ss)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EPP's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendant AbbVie Products LLCs Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
November 23, 2015 Filing 1227 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. Walgreen Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 (Ravkind, Lauren)
November 23, 2015 Filing 1226 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CVS and Rite Aid's Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp..(Rebuck, Monica)
November 23, 2015 Filing 1225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Responses to Defendant AbbVie Products, LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1224 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Leonard Blum (Clark, Neill)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Plaintiffs' Amended Subpoena to Nicholas Manusos c/o Sheldon T. Zenner, Esq. (Clark, Neill)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 ORDER granting (407) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Lamb in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT(adg)
November 18, 2015 Filing 1221 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Michelle Bonomi-Huvala by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
November 17, 2015 Filing 1220 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry Gattegno for Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand (adg)
November 11, 2015 Filing 1219 NOTICE of Change of Address for Kenneth S. Canfield, counsel for Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. (Canfield, Kenneth)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1218 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Stephen Krull by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
November 3, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/1/2015 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Ms. Chans office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 11/30/2015 via e-mail to S. Sewell.. (ss)
October 30, 2015 Filing 1217 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Proceedings held on October 21, 2015, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notification of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
October 28, 2015 Filing 1216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Second Subpoena On McKesson Corporation by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
October 28, 2015 Filing 1215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Second Subpoena On Cardinal Health, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
October 28, 2015 Filing 1214 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Second Subpoena On AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
October 27, 2015 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/23/2015 at 10:00 AM FILED IN ERRO - WRONG CASE.(ss)
October 27, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. The Court directs Co-Liaison Counsel for both plaintiff groups to coordinate provision of call center number and notice all counsel and the court of that information. A proposed joint agenda by all parties should be e-mailed to S. Sewell by noon Friday November 20, 2015(ss)
October 27, 2015 During the Status conference the Court Verbally granted in part and denying in part #1128 Motion to Compel ; granted #1159 Motion for Oral Argument by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/21/2015. (ss)
October 23, 2015 Filing 1213 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition to Defendant Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
October 21, 2015 Filing 1212 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 10/21/2015. Discovery disputes should be handled by motion. Re: Plaintiffs' motion to compel, it is granted in part and denied in part. The Defendants are to produce unredacted paper copies of documents to the Court for in camera review and determine a way to identify the redacted portions on the unredacted copies for the Court's convenience. Mr. Shingla will talk with his client and report back to the Court regarding concerns about the in camera review by the Court. Regarding item 4(c) on the Joint Agenda, Mr. Sorenson is directed to file a motion. The parties are jointly discussing an extension of discovery and the Court will hear further from them at the next status conference. Someone from chambers will contact Mr. Shingla and Mr. Canfield to arrange the date for the next conference. See transcript of status conference for complete details on Court's rulings. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr)
October 19, 2015 Filing 1211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. of Walgreen Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices (Ravkind, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 ORDER ALLOWING ELECTRONIC DEVICES IN THE COURTROOM on 10/21/15 at 1:30pm. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/19/15. (dr)
October 19, 2015 Filing 1209 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CVS and Rite Aid's Objections to Defendants' Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp..(Rebuck, Monica)
October 19, 2015 Filing 1208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. of Walgreen Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant Abbvie Products LLCs Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 (Ravkind, Lauren)
October 16, 2015 Filing 1207 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE End-Payor Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant AbbVie Products LLCs Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10 by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
October 16, 2015 Filing 1206 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CVS and Rite Aid's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10 by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp..(Rebuck, Monica)
October 13, 2015 Filing 1205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition to Defendant Actavis, Inc. by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Canfield, Kenneth)
October 9, 2015 Filing 1204 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit P as an exhibit to the Supplemental Declaration of Barry L. Refsin by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1157 Affidavit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Canfield, Kenneth)
October 9, 2015 Filing 1203 REPLY BRIEF re #1128 MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
October 8, 2015 Filing 1202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. Giant Eagle, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Discovery Materials (Allen, Erin)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Werner Cautreels by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Canfield, Kenneth)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Werner Cautreels by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Canfield, Kenneth)
September 18, 2015 Filing 1199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Jay Janco by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
September 17, 2015 Filing 1198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Subpoena On McKesson Corporation by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 17, 2015 Filing 1197 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Subpoena On Frank W. Kerr Co. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 17, 2015 Filing 1196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Subpoena On Cardinal Health, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 17, 2015 Filing 1195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate Of Service Of Notice Of Subpoena On AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 16, 2015 Filing 1194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2015. (Court Reporter Monty Vann)(ss)
September 15, 2015 Filing 1193 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Non-Party Laboratories Besins Iscovesco by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Initial Disclosures By Defendants Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals LLC, And Abbvie, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants Par Pharmaceutical Co., Inc.'s and Paddock Holdings, LLC's Initial Disclosures to Giant Eagle, Inc. by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Acosta, Adam)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Actavis, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1189 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Giant Eagle, Inc.. (Hill, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. Giant Eagle, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures (Hill, Brian)
September 11, 2015 NOTICE - Telephone conference with the Court as requested. Wednesday 9/16/2015 3:00 p.m. Mr. Canfield to make call center arrangements, advise the Court and all counsel. (ss)
September 10, 2015 Submission of (1159 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT), (398 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT), (635 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT), (661 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT), (630 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT), (471 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT), (469 in 1:09-cv-03019-TWT), (399 in 1:10-cv-01024-TWT) MOTION for Oral Argument re MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(dr)
September 3, 2015 Filing 1187 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Michael B. Kades (Hur, Jordy)
September 2, 2015 Filing 1186 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Proceedings held on August 28, 2015, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2015. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
August 28, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/21/2015 at 01:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr... Ms. Chan's office to make call center arrangements for counsel wishing to monitor or participate by telephone. Proposed agenda due by 2:00 p.m. 10/20/2015 via e-mail to S. Sewell.(ss)
August 28, 2015 Filing 1185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 8/28/2015. (Court Reporter Susan Baker & Debra Bull)(ss)
August 28, 2015 Submission of (1128 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT), (377 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT), (617 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT), (643 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT), (612 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT), (453 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT), (453 in 1:09-cv-02914-TWT), (449 in 1:09-cv-03019-TWT), (380 in 1:10-cv-01024-TWT), (385 in 1:10-cv-02883-TWT), (312 in 1:11-cv-00334-TWT) MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged , submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(dr)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co., Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Meijer, Inc by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Walgreen Plaintiffs Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant AbbVie Products LLCs Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10 by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Perwin, Scott)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE End-Payor Plaintiffs Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant AbbVie Products LLCs Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - CVS and Rite Aid's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10 by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp..(Rebuck, Monica)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10 to All Plaintiffs by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.(Canfield, Kenneth)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Caremark L.L.C. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Eckerd Corporation by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Maxi Drug, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1173 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff JCG (PJC) USA, LLC by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Rite Aid Corporation by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1171 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Supervalu, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1170 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Heb Grocery Company LP by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1169 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff American Sales Company, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1168 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Safeway Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1167 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff Walgreen Co. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 25, 2015 Filing 1166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of 30(B)(6) Deposition Of Plaintiff Health Net, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 25, 2015 Filing 1165 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of 30(B)(6) Deposition Of Plaintiff Fraternal Order Of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 25, 2015 Filing 1164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Notice Of Deposition Of Plaintiff George Steven Legrand by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 24, 2015 Filing 1163 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Response To Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Third Set Of Requests For Production To Abbvie Products LLC by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 24, 2015 Filing 1162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC F/K/A Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Responses To The Federal Trade Commission's Second Set Of Interrogatories To Abbvie Products LLC by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 24, 2015 Filing 1161 NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Attachment to Plaintiffs' #1154 Notice of Filing Documents Pursuant to Sealing Orders Dated August 12, 2015, by Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified related document/text on 8/25/2015 (dr).
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL 7 OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 8/28/2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/21/2015. (ss)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1159 MOTION for Oral Argument re #1128 MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1158 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. - Notice of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential - (Canfield, Kenneth)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1157 AFFIDAVIT re #1128 MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged - Supplemental Declaration of Barry L. Refsin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld as Privileged - by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
August 20, 2015 Filing 1156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Kevin Ostrander by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
August 20, 2015 Filing 1155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Subpoena Ad Testificandum of William Mink by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
August 18, 2015 Filing 1154 NOTICE Of Filing Documents Pursuant to Sealing Orders Dated August 12, 2015 by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. re #1128 Motion to Compel, #1142 Order on Motion to Seal, #1143 Order on Motion to Seal, (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Canfield, Kenneth) Modified on 8/18/2015 (dr).
August 18, 2015 Clerks Notation re (465 in 1:09-cv-02914-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (44 in 1:15-cv-01914-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (657 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (626 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (395 in 1:10-cv-01024-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (631 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (465 in 1:09-cv-03019-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (392 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (324 in 1:11-cv-00334-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (1153 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (43 in 1:15-cv-01914-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (397 in 1:10-cv-02883-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (1152 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (467 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons ; OK per TWT. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT, 1:09-cv-02776-TWT, 1:09-cv-02914-TWT, 1:09-cv-03019-TWT, 1:10-cv-01024-TWT, 1:10-cv-02883-TWT, 1:11-cv-00334-TWT, 1:15-cv-01914-TWT(ss)
August 17, 2015 Filing 1153 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Actavis W.C. Holding Inc., Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Actavis, Inc.. (Eckles, Paul)
August 17, 2015 Filing 1152 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Sky Growth Holdings Corporation for Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Acosta, Adam)
August 17, 2015 Clerks Notation re (466 in 1:09-cv-02776-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (464 in 1:09-cv-02914-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (323 in 1:11-cv-00334-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (630 in 1:09-cv-00956-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (394 in 1:10-cv-01024-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (656 in 1:09-cv-00957-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (396 in 1:10-cv-02883-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (42 in 1:15-cv-01914-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (464 in 1:09-cv-03019-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (625 in 1:09-cv-00958-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (391 in 1:09-cv-00955-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, (1151 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:09-cv-00955-TWT, 1:09-cv-00956-TWT, 1:09-cv-00957-TWT, 1:09-cv-00958-TWT, 1:09-cv-02776-TWT, 1:09-cv-02848-TWT, 1:09-cv-02913-TWT, 1:09-cv-02914-TWT, 1:09-cv-02915-TWT, 1:09-cv-03019-TWT, 1:10-cv-01008-TWT, 1:10-cv-01024-TWT, 1:10-cv-02883-TWT, 1:11-cv-00334-TWT, 1:15-cv-01914-TWT(ss)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1151 Certificate of Interested Persons by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Meltzer, Joshua)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1150 ANSWER to COMPLAINT of Giant Eagle, Inc. by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/18/2015 (dr).
August 14, 2015 Filing 1149 ANSWER to COMPLAINT (Answer of Defendant Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Plaintiff Giant Eagle Inc.'s Complaint) by Actavis, Inc..(York, Julia) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 14, 2015 Filing 1148 ANSWER to COMPLAINT of Giant Eagle, Inc. by Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Acosta, Adam) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/18/2015 (dr).
August 13, 2015 Filing 1147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC's Responses To End Payor Plaintiffs' Interrogatories To Defendant Abbvie Products LLC (Nos. 1-3) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 13, 2015 Filing 1146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC's Responses To End Payor Plaintiffs' Request For Production To Defendant Abbvie Products LLC by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 13, 2015 Filing 1145 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC's Responses To Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Interrogatories To Abbvie Products LLC (Nos. 1-3) by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 13, 2015 Filing 1144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Of Service Of Abbvie Products LLC's Responses To Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Request For Production To Abbvie Products LLC by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Meltzer, Joshua)
August 13, 2015 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to all attorneys not receiving an electronic copy re [1142,1143] Orders. (ddm)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER granting #1140 AbbVie Products LLCs Motion to Seal Exhibits L and N to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld as Privileged. Plaintiffs shall file the pertinent documents under seal within 7 calendar days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/12/15. (ddm)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER granting #1139 Actavis, Inc.s Motion to Seal Exhibits L and N to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld as Privileged. Plaintiffs in the above-captioned matters shall file Exhibits L and N of their Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld as Privileged under seal within 7 calendar days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/12/15. (ddm)
August 12, 2015 Filing 1141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Sales Company, Inc., HEB Grocery Company, LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co..(Neill, Anna)
August 11, 2015 Filing 1140 MOTION to Seal Abbvie Products LLC'S Motion To Seal Exhibits L And N To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged with Brief In Support by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James B. Hynd, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit)
August 11, 2015 Filing 1139 MOTION to Seal Exhibits L and N to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld as Privileged by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Matthew O. Brady, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Julia)
August 10, 2015 Filing 1138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1128 MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joshua Meltzer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Singla, Rohit)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER granting (380) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00955-TWT; granting (622) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00956-TWT; granting (648) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00957-TWT; granting (617) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00958-TWT; granting (1135) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-md-02084-TWT; granting (458) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-02776-TWT; granting (456) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-02914-TWT; granting (454) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-03019-TWT; granting (385) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:10-cv-01024-TWT; granting (388) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:10-cv-02883-TWT; granting (315) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-00334-TWT; granting (27) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:15-cv-01914-TWT. Defendants may file any motions to seal in relationship to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Negotiations Withheld as Privileged by 8/11/2015. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT et al.(ss)
August 3, 2015 Filing 1136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc of Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Nicholas Manusos c/o Sheldon T. Zenner, Esq. (Clark, Neill)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1135 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Seal by Abbott Products, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Paddock Laboratories Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Inc, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Julia)
July 30, 2015 Filing 1134 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. John Philip Fry replacing attorney Bryan Guy Harrison. (Fry, John)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER approving (25 in 1:15-cv-01914-TWT), (1132 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Stipulation, Giant Eagle's Complaint is deemed amended to withdraw Claim IV, Paragraphs 198 to 206, against all Defendants; Defendants shall have until 8/14/15 to answer Giant Eagle's Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/28/15. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:15-cv-01914-TWT(dr)
July 27, 2015 Filing 1132 STIPULATION Concerning Claim IV of the Giant Eagle Complaint (Joint) by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Julia)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1131 PROPOSED ORDER re: #1128 MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged . (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1130 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1128 MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged - Declaration of Barry L. Refsin - filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1129 NOTICE by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co. - Notice of Service of Documents Containing Information Designated as Confidential - (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1128 MOTION to Compel Production Of Settlement Negotiations Withheld As Privileged by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc, Supervalu Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 22, 2015 Filing 1127 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Third Set of Interrogatories and Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
July 22, 2015 Filing 1126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Second Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Production to AbbVie Products LLC by Federal Trade Commission.(Hur, Jordy)
July 21, 2015 Filing 1125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc - Notice of Service of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. and Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co., Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant Abbvie Products LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories (Interrogatory No. 17) - (Canfield, Kenneth)
July 17, 2015 Filing 1124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE End-Payor Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Joint Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to All End-Payor Plaintiffs by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
July 15, 2015 Docket ORDER granting (23 in 1:15-cv-01914-TWT) ;(1122 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Abbott Products, Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. Answer due no later 7/29/2015.At the direction of the Court. S. Sewell for Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/15/2015. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:15-cv-01914-TWT(ss)
July 15, 2015 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (24 in 1:15-cv-01914-TWT), (1123 in 1:09-md-02084-TWT) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Perrigo Company without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02084-TWT, 1:15-cv-01914-TWT(dr)
July 14, 2015 Filing 1123 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Giant Eagle, Inc. (Hill, Brian)
July 14, 2015 Filing 1122 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff Giant Eagle's Complaint by Abbott Products, Inc., Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Unimed Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meltzer, Joshua) Modified event on 7/15/2015 (dr).
July 10, 2015 Filing 1121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of EPP First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant AbbVie Products LLC by Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Health Net, Inc., George Steven Legrand.(Dees, Marshall)
July 10, 2015 Filing 1120