Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights et al v. Deal et al Featured Case

A diverse coalition of groups and individuals sue over Georgia's new immigration law, challenging its constitutionality.

Plaintiff: Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, DREAM Activist.org, Task Force for the Homeless, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Alterna, Coalition of Latino Leaders, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Paul Bridges, Benjamin Speight, Everitt Howe, Paul C. Edwards, Sharon Gruner, Jane Doe # 1, Jaypaul Singh, Ernesto Pinon, John Doe # 1, John Doe # 2, Jane Doe # 2 and David Kennedy
Defendant: Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III, Mike Beatty and Falecia Stewart
Amicus: ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, United Mexican States, Argentina, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Peru, American Immigration Lawyers Association, GALEO, Southern Center for Human Rights, Uruguay, Rightmarch.com, Joshua Clark and Brett Harrell
Case Number: 1:2011cv01804
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: De Kalb
Presiding Judge: Thomas W. Thrash
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Jonathan Blazer. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/4/12. (dr)
January 4, 2012 Filing 122 MOTION to Withdraw Jonathan Blazer as Attorneyby Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blazer, Jonathan)
October 27, 2011 Filing 121 USCA Acknowledgment of receipt of certificate of readiness re 97 Notice of Appeal filed by Samuel S. Olens, Nathan Deal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 11-13044-GG. (fem)
October 26, 2011 Filing 120 USCA Acknowledgment of receipt of record on appeal re 97 Notice of Appeal filed by Samuel S. Olens, Nathan Deal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 11-13044-GG. (fem)
October 20, 2011 Filing 119 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 97 Notice of Appeal Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 11-13044-GG. (fem)
October 20, 2011 Filing 118 Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS transmitted to USCA re 97 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 11-13044-GG (fem)
October 20, 2011 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Appeal Record re 97 Notice of Appeal filed by Samuel S. Olens, Nathan Deal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 11-13044-GG. (fem)
October 6, 2011 Filing 117 FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re 97 Notice of Appeal filed by Samuel S. Olens, Nathan Deal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 11-13044-GG. Appeal Record due by 10/20/2011. (fem)
September 20, 2011 Clerks Notation re 116 Leave of Absence 10/6-10/11, by George Brian Spears. The Court will not require an appearance by G. Spears on these dates. (ss)
September 19, 2011 Filing 116 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/6/11-10/10/11, by George Brian Spears. (Spears, George)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Meghan Robson Davidson terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/18/11. (dr)
August 17, 2011 Filing 114 MOTION to Withdraw Meghan Robson Davidson as Attorneyby Samuel S. Olens. (Davidson, Meghan)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Stay. Defendants obligation to file an answerand stays discovery between the parties including all disclosures and planningconferences pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 and L.R. 26.1. This Order does not stayPlaintiffs from moving for leave to amend their Complaint nor does it stayDefendants from responding to such a motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/10/2011. (rej)
August 8, 2011 Filing 112 RESPONSE re 100 MOTION to Stay The Case and Proposed Consent Order filed by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tsu, Naomi)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 110 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nathaniel Oleson. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/26/11. (dr)
July 25, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 110 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathaniel J. Oleson Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nathaniel J. Oleson added appearing on behalf of Rightmarch.com (pb)
July 21, 2011 Filing 110 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathaniel J. Oleson Pro Hac Viceby Rightmarch.com.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #37391. (dr)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time and to Vacate Hearing; Plaintiffs are directed to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Stay the Case on or before 8/8/11. Hearing scheduled for 7/18/11 is deferred until later order of the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/14/11. (dr)
July 14, 2011 Filing 106 ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III.(Orland, Devon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 14, 2011 Clerks Notation re 103 Leave of Absence September 29, 2011; and December 26, 2011 - January 3, 2012, by Devon Orland. The Court will not require an appearance by D. Orland on these dates. (ss)
July 13, 2011 Filing 109 USCA Acknowledgment of 97 Notice of Appeal filed by Samuel S. Olens, Nathan Deal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 11-13044-C (fem)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File, granting 54 Motion to Join, granting 65 Motion for Leave to File, granting 73 Motion for Joinder, granting 75 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/13/11. (dr)
July 13, 2011 Filing 104 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay Case and Defer Hearing re: 100 MOTION to Stay The Case with Brief In Support by Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spears, George)
July 13, 2011 Filing 103 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 29, 2011; and December 26, 2011 through and including January 3, 2012, by Devon Orland. (Orland, Devon)
July 13, 2011 Clerks Notation re 102 Leave of Absence 7/21-22/11, 7/29/11, 8/19-22/11, 9/8-22/11, 10/13-14/11, 10/21-24/11, by George Brian Spears. The Court will not require an appearance by G. Spears on these dates. (ss)
July 12, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 100 MOTION to Stay The Case Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
July 11, 2011 Submission of 50 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Complaint and for Declaratory and Injuctive Relief, 65 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, 75 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, 73 MOTION for Joinder, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
July 11, 2011 Filing 102 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/21-7/22/11, 7/29/11, 8/19-8/22/11, 9/8-9/22/11, 10/13-10/14/11, 10/21-10/24/11, by George Brian Spears. (Spears, George)
July 8, 2011 Filing 108 Court Reporter Notification that Transcript has been filed in District Court re 97 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Susan Baker (fem) Modified on 7/19/2011 (fem).
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/8/11. (dr)
July 8, 2011 Filing 100 MOTION to Stay The Case with Brief In Support by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Suppot of Motion to Stay the Case)(Orland, Devon)
July 6, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines re 97 Notice of Appeal : Financial Arrangements due on 7/20/2011 (fem)
July 6, 2011 Filing 99 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 97 Notice of Appeal (fem)
July 6, 2011 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on June 20, 2011 before Judge Thrash, re 97 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Susan C. Baker. (Orland, Devon) Financial Arrangements due 7/20/11. Modified on 7/6/2011 (fem).
July 5, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 93 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Dismiss by Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E-3388558. Transcript Order Form due on 7/19/2011 (Orland, Devon)
July 5, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Robson Davidson on behalf of Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens (Davidson, Meghan)
July 1, 2011 Pro Hac Vice and Returned Check Fee: $585.00, receipt number 36789 (dr)
July 1, 2011 Payment declined by credit card company re 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Carla Gorniak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357145), 53 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher R. Clark Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357148), 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Henry Solano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357135). Payment due from Emmet Bondurant within 10 days in the amount of $$585.00. Payment must be made to the Clerks Office. (mmc)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Tanya Broder. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/30/11. (dr)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 92 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth Sugarman. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/30/11. (dr)
June 30, 2011 Submission of 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonyms, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/27/11. (ss)
June 27, 2011 Filing 92 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth Sugarman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3375250)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 25, 2011 Filing 91 NOTICE by Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights Regarding Buquer v. City of Indianapolis (Attachments: # 1 Buquer v. City of Indianapolis Opinion)(Brooke, Samuel)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 49 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Samuel Brooke. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/23/11. (dr)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Carla Gorniak. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/23/11. (dr)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 53 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Clark. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/23/11. (dr)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 69 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Farrin Anello. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/23/11. (dr)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 68 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Sharpless. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/23/11. (dr)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Henry Solano. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/23/11. (dr)
June 23, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to P Andrew Patterson re 84 Notice of E-filing Requirement. (dr)
June 23, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to Pickens Andrew Patterson, Jr re 83 Answer to Complaint. (dr)
June 22, 2011 Filing 83 ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Falecia Stewart. Discovery ends on 11/21/2011.(dr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 22, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Henry Solano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357135). Attorney Henry L. Solano added appearing on behalf of United Mexican States (cdg)
June 22, 2011 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 20, 2011, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number (404) 215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing) (fem)
June 22, 2011 RETURN of 79 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathaniel J. Oleson Pro Hac Vice to attorney for payment. (cdg)
June 22, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 69 APPLICATION for Admission of Farrin Anello Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3359843), 68 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Sharpless Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3359425). Attorney Rebecca Ann Sharpless, Farrin Rose Anello added appearing on behalf of American Immigration Lawyers Association (cdg)
June 21, 2011 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Azadeh Shahshahani re Notice of Hearing file 6/8/11. (dr)
June 21, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Carla Gorniak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357145), 53 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher R. Clark Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357148). Attorney Christopher R. Clark, Carla Gorniak added appearing on behalf of United Mexican States (cdg)
June 21, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 49 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Brooke Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Samuel Brooke added appearing on behalf of Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless (cdg)
June 21, 2011 Filing 81 NOTICE by Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights (Regarding Additional Government Memoranda) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Spears, George)
June 20, 2011 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2011; taking under advisement 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, taking under advisement 47 Motion to Dismiss; it is the Court's intient to issue an order prior to 7/1/11. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr)
June 17, 2011 Filing 79 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathaniel J. Oleson Pro Hac Viceby Rightmarch.com. (dr)
June 17, 2011 Filing 78 AMICUS BRIEF in Support of 47 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Nathan Deal, Samuel Olens, Clyde Reese and Mike Beatty filed by Rightmarch.com, Joshua Clark, Brett Harrell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(dr)
June 17, 2011 Filing 77 RESPONSE re 72 Objection to Irrelevant and Inadmissible Evidence filed by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Lapointe, Michelle) Modified on 6/20/2011 (dr).
June 17, 2011 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Nathan Deal, Samuel Olens, Clyde Reese and Mike Beatty filed by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 17, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 17, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE Of Filing by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III re 70 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Orland, Devon)
June 17, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION Leave to Join Brief of the United Mexican States as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs re 50 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Uruguay. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Emmet) Modified event/text on 6/20/2011 (dr).
June 17, 2011 Filing 72 OBJECTION to Irrelevant and Inadmissible Evidence by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III (Orland, Devon) Modified on 6/20/2011 (dr).
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/17/11. (ss)
June 17, 2011 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F Part 1, # 8 Exhibit F Part 2, # 9 Exhibit F Part 3, # 10 Exhibit F Part 4, # 11 Exhibit F Part 5, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K, # 17 Exhibit L)(Orland, Devon)
June 16, 2011 Filing 69 APPLICATION for Admission of Farrin Anello Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3359843)by American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Chea, Socheat)
June 16, 2011 Filing 68 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Sharpless Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3359425)by American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Chea, Socheat)
June 16, 2011 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Support re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Amicus Southern Center for Human Rights, et. al.) filed by Southern Center for Human Rights. (Weber, Gerald)
June 16, 2011 Filing 66 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Gerald R. Weber on behalf of Southern Center for Human Rights. (Weber, Gerald)
June 16, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials with Brief In Support by GALEO. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Brief in Support)(Rohan, Douglas)
June 16, 2011 Filing 64 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Douglas Brooks Rohan on behalf of GALEO. (Rohan, Douglas)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Omar C. Jadwat. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 06/15/2011. (jtj)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sin Yen Ling. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 06/15/2011. (jtj)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Hess Turner. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 06/15/2011. (jtj)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elora Murkherjee. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 06/15/2011. (jtj) Modified on 6/16/2011 to correct file date (jtj).
June 16, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Orland, Devon)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of AILA. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/16/11. (ss)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 54 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (to Join Brief of United Mexican States as Amicus Curiae). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/16/11. (ss)
June 16, 2011 NOTICE re 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for 6/20/11 at 10:00 A.M. THE LOCATION OF THE HEARING HAS CHANGED TO COURTROOM 2308. The Courtroom doors will be unlocked at 9:00 a.m., an overflow courtroom (Courtroom 2306) will be made available for spectator and media with simultaneous video/audio feed. (ss)
June 15, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunctionby American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Chea, Socheat)
June 15, 2011 Filing 55 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Socheat Chea on behalf of American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Chea, Socheat)
June 15, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION to Join Brief of the United Mexican States as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs 50 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Complaint and for Declaratory and Injuctive Relief by Argentina, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Costa Rica, El Salvador, Guatemala, Honduras, Nicaragua, Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Emmet)
June 15, 2011 Filing 53 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher R. Clark Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357148)by United Mexican States. (Bondurant, Emmet)
June 15, 2011 Filing 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Carla Gorniak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357145)by United Mexican States. (Bondurant, Emmet)
June 15, 2011 Filing 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Henry Solano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3357135)by United Mexican States. (Bondurant, Emmet)
June 15, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Complaint and for Declaratory and Injuctive Relief with Brief In Support by United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amicus Curiae, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Bondurant, Emmet)
June 15, 2011 Filing 49 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Brooke Pro Hac Vice by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 15, 2011 Filing 48 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Dale M. Schwartz on behalf of ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE. (Schwartz, Dale)
June 15, 2011 RETURN of 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Brooke Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3335105) to attorney for correction. Petitioners signature needed. (cdg) Modified on 6/15/2011 to terminate application. Application was orginally approved in error. (cdg).
June 15, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Tanya Broder Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334227) Attorney Tanya Broder added appearing on behalf of Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless (cdg)
June 14, 2011 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Nathan Deal, Samuel Olens, Clyde Reese and Mike Beatty with Brief In Support by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Orland, Devon)
June 10, 2011 Clerks Notation re 27 Leave of Absence June 22, 2011 through and including June 29, 2011, by Devon Orland. The Court will not require an appearance by D. Orland on these dates. (ss)
June 10, 2011 Clerks Certificate of faxing as to Falecia Stewart, Executive Director of the Housing Authority of Fulton County Georgia, re Notice of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 6/20/11 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 2108. (ss)
June 10, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2011 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. The Court will also hear argument on Defendant Deal, et al's Motion to Dismiss that is to be filed. (ss)
June 10, 2011 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: granting 30 Motion to Expedite; Status Conference held on 6/10/2011. The Court will hold a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on June 20, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ss)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Andre Segura. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/9/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nora Preciado. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/9/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Blazer. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Karen Tumlin. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Keaney. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Katherine Desormeau. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Linton Joaquin. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Cecillia Wang. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (dr)
June 9, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Hess Turner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3335661) 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Brooke Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3335105) Attorney Samuel Brooke, Andrew H. Turner added appearing on behalf of Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul C. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, David Kennedy, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless (cdg)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 36 Amended Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The brief in support of defendants Deal, et al Motion to Dismiss not to exceed 65 pages.. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/9/11. (ss)
June 9, 2011 Clerks Notation re 33 Supplmental Certificate of Interested Persons, and 2 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT. (ss)
June 9, 2011 Filing 36 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orland, Devon)
June 8, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing re 35 Order on Motion to Amend to non-registered counsel: Andre I. Segura, Azadeh N. Shahshahani, Cecillia D. Wang, Elora Mukherjee, Jonathan Blazer, Karen C. Tumlin, Katherine Desormeau, Linton Joaquin, Melissa S. Keaney, Nora Preciado, Omar C. Jadwat, Sin Yen Ling, Tanya Broder, along with letter that no further copies of order or notices would be mailed by the court. (ss)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Amend Caption. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (ss)
June 8, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Nora Preciado Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334298) Attorney Nora Preciado added appearing on behalf of Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless (cdg)
June 8, 2011 Remark re Notice of Hearing, mailed to non-registered counsel and advised by letter that no further paper orders/notices will be mailed to non-registered counsel by the Court. Pro Hac Vice counsel may make arrangements with the Clerks Office to receive electronic notices or arrange to have your local counsel forward electronic notices and/or orders. (ss)
June 8, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/10/2011 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. The Court will be soliciting suggestions on how to proceed and discussing scheduling as to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (ss)
June 8, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andre I Segura Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334183) 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Blazer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334223). Attorney Andre I. Segura, Jonathan Blazer added appearing on behalf of Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless (cdg)
June 8, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orland, Devon)
June 8, 2011 Filing 33 Supplemental Certificate of Interested Persons by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 8, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Amend Caption by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Caption)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 8, 2011 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Consideration and Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 30 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Hearing. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 8, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Hearing by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 8, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Georgia House Bill 87, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Declaration of Abraham F. Lowenthal, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Declaration of Jane Doe 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Declaration of David S. Kennedy, Jr., # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Declaration of Paul Bridges, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Declaration of Benjamin Speight, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Declaration of Everitt Howe, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Declaration of Paul C. Edwards, Jr., # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Declaration of Sharon Gruner, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Declaration of Jane Doe 1, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 Declaration of George Gascon, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 Declaration of Eduardo Gonzalez, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 Declaration of Lewis Smith, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 Declaration of Ernesto Pion, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 Declaration of Jaypaul Singh, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 Declaration of John Doe 1, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 17 Declaration of John Doe 2, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 18 Declaration of Silvia America Gruner, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 19 Declaration of Anton Flores, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 20 Declaration of Adelina C. Nicholls, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 21 Declaration of Anita Beaty, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 22 Declaration of Helen Kim Ho, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 23 Declaration of Mohammad Abdollahi Ali-Beik, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 24 Declaration of Eliseo Medina, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 25 Declaration of Harris Raynor, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 26 Declaration of Gabriela Gonzalez-Lamberson, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 27 Declaration of Molly Lauterback and Exhibits A through F, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 28 Exhibits G through J for Declaration of Molly Lauterback, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 29 Exhibits K through M for Declaration of Molly Lauterback, # 32 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Lapointe, Michelle) (Attachment 20 replaced on 6/10/2011) (dgs). (Attachment 29 replaced on 6/10/2011) (dgs).
June 8, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Omar C. Jadwat Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334161), 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Sin Yen Ling Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3335040), 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Elora Mukherjee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334250) APPLICATION for Admission of Elora Mukherjee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334250). Attorney Sin Yen Ling, Omar C. Jadwat, Elora Mukherjee added appearing on behalf of Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless (cdg)
June 7, 2011 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Cecillia D. Wang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334243), 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Linton Joaquin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334271) 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Desormeau Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334284), 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa S. Keaney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334289) 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen C. Tumlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334307) APPLICATION for Admission of Karen C. Tumlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334307) APPLICATION for Admission of Karen C. Tumlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334307). Attorney Tanya Broder, Karen C. Tumlin, Katherine Desormeau, Melissa S. Keaney, Linton Joaquin, Cecillia D. Wang added appearing on behalf of Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless (cdg)
June 7, 2011 Clerks Approval re 28 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mmc)
June 3, 2011 Filing 28 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 3334193. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 27 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 22, 2011 through and including June 29, 2011, by Devon Orland. (Orland, Devon)
June 3, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Devon Orland on behalf of Mike Beatty, Nathan Deal, Samuel S. Olens, Clyde L. Reese, III (Orland, Devon)
June 3, 2011 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Gruner, Alterna, Benjamin Speight, Ernesto Pinon, Coalition of Latino Leaders, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Jane Doe # 1, Paul J. Edwards, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Everitt Howe, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul Bridges, John Doe # 1, Service Employees International Union, DREAM Activist.org, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Task Force for the Homeless, Jaypaul Singh, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta. Samuel S. Olens served on 6/2/2011, answer due 6/23/2011. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Gruner, Alterna, Benjamin Speight, Ernesto Pinon, Coalition of Latino Leaders, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Jane Doe # 1, Paul J. Edwards, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Everitt Howe, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul Bridges, John Doe # 1, Service Employees International Union, DREAM Activist.org, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Task Force for the Homeless, Jaypaul Singh, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta. Nathan Deal served on 6/2/2011, answer due 6/23/2011. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Gruner, Alterna, Benjamin Speight, Ernesto Pinon, Coalition of Latino Leaders, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Jane Doe # 1, Paul J. Edwards, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Everitt Howe, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul Bridges, John Doe # 1, Service Employees International Union, DREAM Activist.org, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Task Force for the Homeless, Jaypaul Singh, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta. Mike Beatty served on 6/2/2011, answer due 6/23/2011. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Gruner, Alterna, Benjamin Speight, Ernesto Pinon, Coalition of Latino Leaders, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Jane Doe # 1, Paul J. Edwards, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Everitt Howe, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul Bridges, John Doe # 1, Service Employees International Union, DREAM Activist.org, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Task Force for the Homeless, Jaypaul Singh, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta. Falecia Stewart served on 6/3/2011, answer due 6/24/2011. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Sharon Gruner, Alterna, Benjamin Speight, Ernesto Pinon, Coalition of Latino Leaders, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Jane Doe # 1, Paul J. Edwards, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Everitt Howe, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul Bridges, John Doe # 1, Service Employees International Union, DREAM Activist.org, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Task Force for the Homeless, Jaypaul Singh, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta. Clyde L. Reese, III served on 6/2/2011, answer due 6/23/2011. (Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages not to exceed 50 pages for the Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/3/11. (dr)
June 3, 2011 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Hess Turner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3335661)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Brooke Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3335105)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Sin Yen Ling Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3335040)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 3, 2011 Filing 16 DOCUMENT FILING ERROR Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 3334183. (Lapointe, Michelle) Modified on 6/3/2011 attorney contacted clerk's office, this application has erroneous information and is re-filing the document as to the correct receipt number (rvb).
June 2, 2011 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen C. Tumlin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334307)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Nora Preciado Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334298)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa S. Keaney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334289)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Desormeau Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334284)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Linton Joaquin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334271)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Elora Mukherjee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334250)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Cecillia D. Wang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334243)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Tanya Broder Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334227)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Blazer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334223)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andre I Segura Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334183)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Omar C. Jadwat Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3334161)by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lapointe, Michelle)
June 2, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (jtj)
June 2, 2011 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonyms by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (jtj)
June 2, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alterna, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Paul Bridges, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Coalition of Latino Leaders, DREAM Activist.org, Jane Doe # 1, John Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul J. Edwards, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Sharon Gruner, Everitt Howe, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, Ernesto Pinon, Service Employees International Union, Jaypaul Singh, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Benjamin Speight, Task Force for the Homeless. (jtj)
June 2, 2011 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Sharon Gruner, Alterna, Benjamin Speight, Ernesto Pinon, Coalition of Latino Leaders, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Jane Doe # 1, Paul J. Edwards, Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United, Everitt Howe, Coalition for the People's Agenda, Jane Doe # 2, John Doe # 2, Paul Bridges, John Doe # 1, Service Employees International Union, DREAM Activist.org, Asian American Legal Advocacy Center, Task Force for the Homeless, Jaypaul Singh, Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta, and summon(s) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. Filing fee $350 receipt number 35925. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights et al v. Deal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Regional Joint Board of Workers' United
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DREAM Activist.org
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Task Force for the Homeless
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian American Legal Advocacy Center
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alterna
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition of Latino Leaders
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instituto de Mexico, Inc. of Atlanta
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for the People's Agenda
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bridges
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Speight
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everitt Howe
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Edwards
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Gruner
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe # 1
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaypaul Singh
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Pinon
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe # 1
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe # 2
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe # 2
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kennedy
Represented By: Mary C. Bauer
Represented By: Jonathan Blazer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Samuel Brooke
Represented By: Danielle M. Conley
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Robert Keegan Federal, Jr.
Represented By: Chara Fisher Jackson
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Charles H. Kuck
Represented By: Michelle R. Lapointe
Represented By: Sin Yen Ling
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Nora Preciado
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Azadeh N. Shahshahani
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Naomi Ruth Tsu
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Deal
Represented By: Devon Orland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel S. Olens
Represented By: Devon Orland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde L. Reese, III
Represented By: Devon Orland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beatty
Represented By: Devon Orland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falecia Stewart
Represented By: Pickens Andrew Patterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE
Represented By: Dale M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United Mexican States
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Argentina
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Brazil
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Chile
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Colombia
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Costa Rica
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: El Salvador
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Guatemala
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Honduras
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Nicaragua
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Peru
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Represented By: Farrin Rose Anello
Represented By: Socheat Chea
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: GALEO
Represented By: Douglas Brooks Rohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Center for Human Rights
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Uruguay
Represented By: Emmet J. Bondurant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Rightmarch.com
Represented By: Gerald Jason Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Joshua Clark
Represented By: Gerald Jason Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Brett Harrell
Represented By: Gerald Jason Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?