Inniss et al v. Aderhold et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Christopher Inniss, Shelton Stroman, Rayshawn Chandler, Avery Chandler, Michael Bishop, Johnny Shane Thomas and Jennifer Sisson
Defendant: Deborah Aderhold, Brook Davidson and Pinkie Toomer
Case Number: 1:2014cv01180
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Gwinnett
Presiding Judge: William S. Duffey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Filing 64 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 18, 2015 through May 20, 2015, by Devon Orland. (Orland, Devon)
March 5, 2015 Filing 63 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 04-06-2015 through 04-13-2015, 06-23-2015, 07-01-2015 through 07-02-2015, 08-10-2015 through 08-11-2015, by Devon Orland. (Orland, Devon)
February 13, 2015 Filing 62 Defenses and ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint by Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton.(Orland, Devon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that the 53 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling by the United States Supreme Court is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED with respect to discovery in this action, but DENIED with respect to non-discovery pleadings, including the Answer required to be filed by Defendants Aderhold and Fenton. Defendants Aderhold's and Fenton's Answer is required to be filed on or before February 17, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's January 8, 2015, Opinion and Order 49 is CERTIFIED under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). The Court determines that its January 8th Order involves a controlling question of law as to which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion and that an immediate appeal from the January 8th Order may materially advance the ultimate termination of this litigation. The ten-day period within which to appeal the Court's January 8th Order will run from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/29/2015. (anc)
January 28, 2015 Filing 60 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Lanna Renee Hill replacing attorney Diana L. Freeman. (Hill, Lanna)
January 28, 2015 Filing 59 AMENDED RESPONSE re 53 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling by the United States Supreme Court filed by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas, Elizabeth Wurz, Krista Wurz. (Borelli, Tara) Modified on 1/28/2015 in order to uodate docket text (anc).
January 27, 2015 Filing 58 RESPONSE re 53 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling by the United States Supreme Court filed by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas, Elizabeth Wurz, Krista Wurz. (Borelli, Tara)
January 26, 2015 Filing 57 RESPONSE re 53 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling by the United States Supreme Court filed by Brook Davidson. (Walker, Robert)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that Plaintiffs and Defendants Davidson and Toomer shall, on or before January 28, 2015, file their response to the Motion to Stay 53 , so that the Court can determine whether a Stay is warranted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Aderholds and Fentons Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer the Amended Complaint 55 is GRANTED. The Court will determine the schedule for filing an Answer to the Amended Complaint after it determines if this matter will be stayed. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/23/15. (hfm)
January 22, 2015 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint by Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Orland, Devon) Modified on 2/3/2015 to correct filing attorney(hfm).
January 20, 2015 Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER Unopposed Motion re: 53 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling by the United States Supreme Court. (Orland, Devon)
January 20, 2015 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling by the United States Supreme Court by Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton. (Orland, Devon)
January 12, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw Nels Stefan David Peterson as Attorneyby Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Nels)
January 12, 2015 Filing 51 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Britt Grant replacing attorney Nels Stefan David Peterson. (Orland, Devon) Modified on 1/13/2015 in order to update docket text (anc).
January 12, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Britt Grant on behalf of Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton (Orland, Devon) Modified on 1/13/2015 to correct attorney name. (jtj)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION and ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 42 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/8/15. (hfm)
November 26, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Authority by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas, Elizabeth Wurz, Krista Wurz re 43 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jernigan v. Crane (E.D. Ark. Nov. 25, 2014), # 2 Exhibit B - Campaign for Southern Equality v. Bryant (S.D. Miss. Nov. 25, 2014))(Borelli, Tara)
November 24, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Authority by Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Opinion, # 2 Exhibit B Supreme Court Docket Page)(Orland, Devon)
October 23, 2014 Submission of 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
October 22, 2014 Filing 46 REPLY BRIEF re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Opinion and Order)(Orland, Devon)
October 6, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Authority by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas, Elizabeth Wurz, Krista Wurz re 43 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supreme Court Order Denying Certiorari)(Borelli, Tara)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Defendants Pending Motion to Dismiss up to and including 10/22/14. No Further Extensions Will Be Granted. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 9/12/14. (jdb)
September 11, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Defendants Pending Motion to Dismiss and Proposed Order by Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton. (Orland, Devon)
September 5, 2014 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Inniss. (Custer, William)
September 5, 2014 Submission of 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
August 18, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Deborah Aderhold, Monica P. Fenton. (Orland, Devon)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 Motion to Stay Proceedings. This case is stayed until such time as the Court rules on Defendant Aderhold's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/7/2014. (anc)
August 5, 2014 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Such a Time That The Court Rules on the Pending Motion To Dismiss and Brief in Support by Deborah Aderhold. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orland, Devon)
August 5, 2014 Filing 39 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Christopher Inniss, Johnny Shane Thomas, Jennifer Sisson, Avery Chandler, Krista Wurz, Elizabeth Wurz, Michael Bishop, Shelton Stroman, Rayshawn Chandler. Monica P. Fenton served on 8/4/2014, answer due 8/26/2014. (Custer, William)
August 5, 2014 Filing 38 Electronic Summons Issued as to Monica P. Fenton. (anc)
August 4, 2014 Filing 37 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants, filed by Avery Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Johnny Shane Thomas, Michael Bishop, Rayshawn Chandler, Shelton Stroman, Jennifer Sisson. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for Monica P. Fenton)(Borelli, Tara) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Plaintiffs and a Defendant. Plaintiffs shall have five (5) days from the date of this Order to file their First Amended Class Action Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief. Those Defendants who have answered the previously filed complaint are relieved of any obligation under the rules of civil procedure to answer the amended complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/31/2014. (anc)
July 31, 2014 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint, to Add Plaintiffs and A Defendant by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Class Action Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Custer, William)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. No later than September 5, 2014, Plaintiffs shall serve a brief of no more than 40 pages in length opposing Defendant Deborah Aderhold's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/25/2014. (anc)
July 24, 2014 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendant Deborah Aderhold's 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION To Exceed Page Limit by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borelli, Tara) Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 7/25/2014 (anc).
July 22, 2014 NOTICE FROM THE COURT (by docket entry only): Parties are advised to go to the district courts website at www.gand.uscourts.gov. On the home page, locate the Attorney Information link which will direct you to Preparation for a Civil and/or Criminal Trial Before Judge Duffey. Here, the Court has provided its Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigants. The Parties shall abide by this Standing Order throughout the processing of this case. Parties are instructed to pay particular attention to the requirements for Motions for Summary Judgment. (jdb)
July 21, 2014 Filing 32 ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Pinkie Toomer.(Burwell, Kaye) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 7/23/2014 in order to remove duplicate text (anc).
July 21, 2014 Filing 31 ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Brook Davidson. Discovery ends on 12/18/2014.(Jenkins, Frank) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 21, 2014 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Persons by Brook Davidson. (Jenkins, Frank)
July 21, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Deborah Aderhold. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Her Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A)(Orland, Devon)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant Deborah Aderhold is permitted to file a brief in support of a motion under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) that is up to forty five (45) pages in length. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/18/2014. (anc)
July 18, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Deborah Aderhold. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orland, Devon) Modified on 7/21/2014 in order to remove duplicate text (anc).
July 8, 2014 Filing 26 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 22, 2014 through July 28, 2014 and August 6, 2014 through August 12, 2014, by Devon Orland. (Orland, Devon)
June 18, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Nels Stefan David Peterson on behalf of Deborah Aderhold (Peterson, Nels)
June 11, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Devon Orland on behalf of Deborah Aderhold (Orland, Devon)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have an additional thirty (30) days, up to and including July 21 2014, in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 5/30/2014. (anc)
May 30, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by R. David Ware on behalf of Pinkie Toomer (Ware, R.)
May 30, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana L. Freeman on behalf of Pinkie Toomer (Freeman, Diana)
May 30, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaye Woodard Burwell on behalf of Pinkie Toomer (Burwell, Kaye)
May 30, 2014 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Revised Consent Motion For Extension of Time to File a Response Either by Answer or Motion to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Deborah Aderhold, Brook Davidson, Pinkie Toomer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orland, Devon) Modified on 5/30/2014 in order to update motion type (anc).
May 29, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Van Stephens, II on behalf of Brook Davidson (Stephens, Michael)
May 29, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lige Walker on behalf of Brook Davidson (Walker, Robert)
May 29, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank E. Jenkins, III on behalf of Brook Davidson (Jenkins, Frank)
May 27, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response Either by Answer or Motion to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Proposed Order by Deborah Aderhold, Brook Davidson, Pinkie Toomer. (Orland, Devon)
May 20, 2014 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pinkie Toomer. Pinkie Toomer waiver mailed on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (Burwell, Kaye)
May 14, 2014 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Avery Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Johnny Shane Thomas, Michael Bishop, Rayshawn Chandler, Shelton Stroman, Jennifer Sisson. Brook Davidson waiver mailed on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (Borelli, Tara)
May 13, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE by Christopher Inniss, Shelton Stroman of Local Rule 23.1(C)(2) Joint Statement (Custer, William)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas E. Winter. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/7/14. (jdb)
May 7, 2014 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 10 APPLICATION for Admission of David P. Draigh Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David P. Draigh added appearing on behalf of Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas (pb)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David P. Draigh. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/7/14. (jdb)
May 5, 2014 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Avery Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Johnny Shane Thomas, Michael Bishop, Rayshawn Chandler, Shelton Stroman, Jennifer Sisson. Deborah Aderhold waiver mailed on 4/22/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (Borelli, Tara)
April 30, 2014 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas E. Winter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5151440). Attorney Douglas E. Winter added appearing on behalf of Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas (pb)
April 29, 2014 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of David P. Draigh Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas. (Custer, William)
April 29, 2014 RETURN of 9 APPLICATION for Admission of David P. Draigh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5151546) to attorney for correction re: format. (pb)
April 24, 2014 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of David P. Draigh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5151546)by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas. (Custer, William)
April 24, 2014 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas E. Winter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5151440)by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas. (Custer, William)
April 24, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory R. Nevins on behalf of Christopher Inniss (Nevins, Gregory)
April 24, 2014 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Sommer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5149525). Attorney Susan L. Sommer added appearing on behalf of Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas (pb)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan Sommer. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 4/24/14. (jdb)
April 23, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Lynn Littrell on behalf of Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas (Littrell, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2014 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Sommer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5149525)by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas. (Borelli, Tara)
April 23, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Borelli on behalf of Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman, Johnny Shane Thomas (Borelli, Tara)
April 22, 2014 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Bishop, Avery Chandler, Rayshawn Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Jennifer Sisson, Shelton Stroman and Johnny Shane Thomas. (eop)
April 22, 2014 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Deborah Aderhold, Brook Davidson and Judge Pinkie Toomer. (Attachments: # 1 B. Davidson, # 2 P. Toomer)(eop)
April 22, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Avery Chandler, Christopher Inniss, Johnny Shane Thomas, Michael Bishop, Rayshawn Chandler, Shelton Stroman and Jennifer Sisson. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-5144522.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inniss et al v. Aderhold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Inniss
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Burch Dempsey
Represented By: David P. Draigh
Represented By: Luke A. Lantta
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Littrell
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Represented By: Jennifer Devine Odom
Represented By: Susan L. Sommer
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Stroman
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Burch Dempsey
Represented By: David P. Draigh
Represented By: Luke A. Lantta
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Littrell
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Represented By: Jennifer Devine Odom
Represented By: Susan L. Sommer
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayshawn Chandler
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Burch Dempsey
Represented By: David P. Draigh
Represented By: Luke A. Lantta
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Littrell
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Represented By: Jennifer Devine Odom
Represented By: Susan L. Sommer
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Chandler
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Burch Dempsey
Represented By: David P. Draigh
Represented By: Luke A. Lantta
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Littrell
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Represented By: Jennifer Devine Odom
Represented By: Susan L. Sommer
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bishop
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Burch Dempsey
Represented By: David P. Draigh
Represented By: Luke A. Lantta
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Littrell
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Represented By: Jennifer Devine Odom
Represented By: Susan L. Sommer
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Shane Thomas
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Burch Dempsey
Represented By: David P. Draigh
Represented By: Luke A. Lantta
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Littrell
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Represented By: Jennifer Devine Odom
Represented By: Susan L. Sommer
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sisson
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Burch Dempsey
Represented By: David P. Draigh
Represented By: Luke A. Lantta
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Littrell
Represented By: Gregory R. Nevins
Represented By: Jennifer Devine Odom
Represented By: Susan L. Sommer
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Aderhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brook Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinkie Toomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?