April 10, 2018 |
Filing
481
OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants Terex Corporation, Terex Utilities, Inc., and Terex South Dakota, Inc.'s Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude the Testimony of Greg Homiller 413 to Defendants' right to object to designations of Mr. Homiller's deposition testimony. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/10/18. (ddm)
|
April 5, 2018 |
Filing
480
OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants Terex Corporation, Terex Utilities, Inc., and Terex South Dakota, Inc.'s Motion In Limine No. 3 to Exclude or Limit Evidence of Cracking In Other Terex XTs 412 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/5/18. (ddm)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing
479
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Terex Corporation, Terex Utilities, Inc., and Terex South Dakota, Inc.'s Motion In Limine No. 1 To Exclude or Limit Evidence of Cracking In Other Terex XTs 410 . The motion is gr anted with respect to (1) incidents involving the Z887 Location or where it is unclear where the crack occurred and (2) sales of repair kits and it is denied with respect to incidents where the serial number is unknown. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/30/18. (ddm)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
478
OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants Terex Corporation, Terex Utilities, Inc., and Terex South Dakota, Inc.'s Motion In Limine No. 2 To Exclude All References to ABC Professional Tree Services, Inc. (ABC) 411 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/27/18. (ddm)
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing
476
OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants Terex Corporation, Terex Utilities, Inc., and Terex South Dakota, Inc.'s Motion In Limine No. 5 Exclude The Ongoing NHTSA Investigation Initiated by Plaintiffs Counsel 414 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/26/18. (ddm)
|
October 13, 2017 |
Filing
469
OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff Jeffrey Gaddy's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Dr. Vijay Saraf 378 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/13/17. (ddm)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
422
OPINION AND ORDER. Terex's Motion to Strike Rebuttal Report of Nathan Morrill 380 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Terex's Motion is GRANTED with respect to Paragraphs 41, 43, 44, and 47 of Mr. Morrill's Rebuttal Report, includ ing any opinions relating to alternative designs not set forth in Mr. Morrill's Original Report. Terexs Motion is DENIED with respect to Paragraphs 37, 38, 39, 40, 42, 45, and 46 of Mr. Morrill's Rebuttal Report. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/2/2017. (bgt)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing
368
ORDER GRANTING Defendant Atlas ABC Corporation's 295 Motion for Summary Judgment; and GRANTING Defendants Terex Corporation, Terex South Dakota, Inc., and Terex Utilities, Inc.s 327 , 335 , 347 Motions for Continued Protection of Evidence. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/11/17. (jkl)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing
363
OPINION AND ORDER. The Terex Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Non-Party Fault of Ace Tree Surgery 321 is GRANTED. The Court finds that Ace's conduct "contributed" to Plaintiff's injuries. The jury will decide, in accordance with O.C.G.A. § 51-12-33, the percentage of fault attributable to Ace. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/26/2017. (bgt)
|
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
248
ORDER AND OPINION. Proposed Intervenor Beatrice Boyd's Motion to Intervene 207 is DENIED. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/6/2016. (bgt)
|
March 10, 2016 |
Filing
214
OPINION AND ORDER that Defendants Terex Corporation, Terex South Dakota, Inc., and Terex Utilities, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order 199 is GRANTED and Defendants are not required to respond to the Subject Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Jeffrey Gaddy's Motion to Dismiss Defendants MRT Manufacturing, Inc., Formerly Forestry, Inc., and Utility One Source Forestry Equipment, LLC 204 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendants and for Leave to File a Sixth Amended Complaint 205 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may not seek additional discovery from the new parties added, and no further amendments will be allowed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket Plaintiff's Sixth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/10/2016. (anc)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing
191
ORDER granting Movant American Interstate Insurance Company's 156 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/28/2015. (anc)
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
171
OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's 138 Motion to Add Defendants and for Leave to File a Fifth Amended Complaint to Reflect the Same is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/24/2015. (anc)
|