Clark et al v. Porter et al
Plaintiff: Jason Joseph Clark and Tamah Jada Clark
Defendant: Daniel J. Porter, Nathan Deal, Thomas Davis, Jr., Sam Olens, David Cavendar, Brian Owens, Stanley Williams, Charles M. Walters, Butch Conway, Tracy Goodbar, Jane Doe #1, Patricia Gray, Brian Bellamy, Ronald Spence, Jane Doe #2, John Doe, D'Anna K. Liber, Brian Kemp, Georgia Department of Corrections, Gwinnett County, State of Georgia, Gwinnett County Police Department, Pelham Police Department, Camila Police Department and Mitchell County
Case Number: 1:2014cv02128
Filed: July 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Willis B Hunt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE by Tamah Jada Clark re #39 Order, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(adg)
March 31, 2015 Filing 40 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs, dismissing all claims as to all Defendants. (bjh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendants' #29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Granting Defendants' #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Granting Defendants' #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Granting Defendants' #34 Motion to Dismiss. The instant action is DISMISSED as to all claims and all Defendants. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr on 3/31/15. (bjh)
March 31, 2015 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Tamah Jada Clark re #39 Order. (bjh)
March 31, 2015 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Joseph Clark re #39 Order. (bjh)
March 31, 2015 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Joseph Clark re #40 Clerk's Judgment (bjh)
March 31, 2015 Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
March 31, 2015 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Tamah Jada Clark re #40 Clerk's Judgment (bjh)
December 17, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE to the Court Regarding the Denial of Access to the U.S Courts and the Resulting Necessity to Seek Remedy Abroad by Jason Joseph Clark, Tamah Jada Clark. (adg)
October 17, 2014 Submission of #34 MOTION to Dismiss , submitted to District Judge Willis B. Hunt. (ddm)
October 16, 2014 Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Brian Bellamy, Thomas Davis, Jr, Nathan Deal, Georgia Department of Corrections, Brian Kemp, D'Anna K. Liber, Sam Olens, Brian Owens, Daniel J. Porter, State of Georgia, Stanley Williams. (Gore, Deborah)
October 14, 2014 Submission of [30,33] MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, submitted to District Judge Willis B. Hunt. (ddm)
October 8, 2014 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tamah Jada Clark. (ddm)
October 8, 2014 Filing 35 Emergency Notice to the Court filed by Tamah Jada Clark. (ddm)
October 6, 2014 Submission of #29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , submitted to District Judge Willis B. Hunt. (ddm)
September 29, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Brian Bellamy, Thomas Davis, Jr, Nathan Deal, Brian Kemp, D'Anna K. Liber, Sam Olens, Brian Owens, Daniel J. Porter, State of Georgia, Stanley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Their Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Eyvette Cook, #3 Exhibit Attachment A to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Attachment B to Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Attachment C to Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Attachment D to Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Attachment Eto Exhibit 1)(Gore, Deborah)
September 25, 2014 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Butch Conway, Jane Doe #1, Tracy Goodbar, Gwinnett County, Gwinnett County Police Department, Charles M. Walters. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Morelli, Douglas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition (entitled Motion) to #29 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and #30 Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss filed by Tamah Jada Clark. (ddm)
September 24, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE Of Filing Copies of Defendants' Waiver of Service of Summons by Tamah Jada Clark. (ddm)
September 24, 2014 Filing 30 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Camila Police Department, Mitchell County. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Rollins, Raleigh)
September 15, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brian Bellamy, Thomas Davis, Jr, Nathan Deal, Brian Kemp, D'Anna K. Liber, Sam Olens, Brian Owens, Daniel J. Porter, State of Georgia, Stanley Williams. (Gore, Deborah)
September 12, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Raleigh Willis Rollins, Jr on behalf of Camila Police Department, Mitchell County (Rollins, Raleigh)
September 11, 2014 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Camila Police Department. Camila Police Department waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Rollins, Raleigh)
September 11, 2014 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mitchell County. Mitchell County waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Rollins, Raleigh)
August 27, 2014 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles M. Walters. (Morelli, Douglas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gwinnett County Police Department. Gwinnett County Police Department waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Morelli, Douglas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gwinnett County. Gwinnett County waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Morelli, Douglas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Doe #1. Jane Doe #1 waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Morelli, Douglas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tracy Goodbar. Tracy Goodbar waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Morelli, Douglas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles M. Walters. Charles M. Walters waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Morelli, Douglas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Butch Conway. Butch Conway waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Morelli, Douglas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Stuart Morelli on behalf of Butch Conway, Jane Doe #1, Tracy Goodbar, Gwinnett County, Gwinnett County Police Department, Charles M. Walters (Morelli, Douglas)
August 22, 2014 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Bellamy. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Nolan Gore on behalf of Brian Bellamy, Thomas Davis, Jr, Nathan Deal, Georgia Department of Corrections, Brian Kemp, D'Anna K. Liber, Sam Olens, Brian Owens, Daniel J. Porter, State of Georgia, Stanley Williams (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Georgia Department of Corrections. Georgia Department of Corrections waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Kemp. Brian Kemp waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Georgia. State of Georgia waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nathan Deal. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Anna K. Liber. D'Anna K. Liber waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel J. Porter. Daniel J. Porter waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nathan Deal. Nathan Deal waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas Davis, Jr. Thomas Davis, Jr waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sam Olens. Sam Olens waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Owens. Brian Owens waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stanley Williams. Stanley Williams waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah)
August 21, 2014 Filing 4 WRONG PDF ATTACHED-- WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Bellamy. Brian Bellamy waiver mailed on 7/29/2014, answer due 9/29/2014. (Gore, Deborah) Modified on 8/22/2014 to advise the wrong PDF was attached by attorney, who has been directed to refile pleading (ddm).
July 17, 2014 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tamah Jada Clark, Jason Joseph Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 7, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of updated contact information for Jason Joseph Clark, Tamah Jada Clark. (tcc)
July 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tamah Jada Clark, Jason Joseph Clark. Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100066115. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Porter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Joseph Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamah Jada Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Porter
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Deal
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Olens
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cavendar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Owens
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Williams
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Walters
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Conway
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Goodbar
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bellamy
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Anna K. Liber
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia
Represented By: Deborah Nolan Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Police Department
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelham Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camila Police Department
Represented By: Raleigh Willis Rollins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell County
Represented By: Raleigh Willis Rollins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?