Earls et al v. Home Depot, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Holt, Sr. and Shonna Earls
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. and Home Depot Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv04081
Filed: December 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Any response by the Objector/Appellant Sam A. Miorelli to the ConsumerPlaintiffs' MOTION for Bond Pending Appeal is limited to 20 pages exclusive ofexhibits. Any financial information concerning the Objector/Appellant's financial ability to post a bond must be submitted under oath. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/7/2016. (HDACtrk)(adg)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER in accordance with Case Management Order No. 2, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINSTRATIVELY CLOSE all individual civil actions linked to this MDL action. Counsel are also directed to become familiar with Case Management Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/20/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT et al.(HDACtrk)(dr)
January 21, 2015 Civil Individual Cases Terminated. ALL FUTURE DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED IN 1:14-MD-2583-TWT Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT et al.(HDACtrk)(dr)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/16/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT et al.(HDACtrk)(dr)
January 16, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set for 2/12/2015 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on applications for appointment of leadership positions for plaintiffs. When filing your application for any of the leadership positions also deliver a hard copy to chambers. As a reminder the applications are due by February 2, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT et al.(HDACtrk)(ss)
January 7, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Girard on behalf of Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT, 1:14-cv-04081-TWT(dr)
January 7, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Appearance of Daniel C. Girard by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT, 1:14-cv-04081-TWT(dr)
January 7, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Linh Vuong by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT, 1:14-cv-04081-TWT(dr)
January 7, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Appearance of Linh G. Vuong by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02583-TWT, 1:14-cv-04081-TWT(dr)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/16/14. (dr)
December 24, 2014 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:14-cv-04315. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 23, 2014 Filing 19 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Georgia. In Re: The Home Depot, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2583. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
December 23, 2014 Transferring case electronically to the Northern District of Georgia. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
December 16, 2014 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Further Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Sabnis ISO Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Deadlines, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration ISO)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 12/16/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #15 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheryl A. Sabnis in Support of the Parties Stipulation)(Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/21/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc.. (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/21/2014) Modified on 10/22/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc. other than the named parties, no such interest to report (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/21/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
October 15, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/30/2014, answer due 10/21/2014. (George, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
October 15, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr. Home Depot, Inc. served on 10/1/2014, answer due 10/22/2014. (George, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 30, 2014 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/29/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 26, 2014 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 25, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 25, 2014 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 25, 2014 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr.. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 25, 2014 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 24, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 24, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]
September 24, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-8946709.). Filed by Shonna Earls, John Holt, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/25/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/24/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earls et al v. Home Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Holt, Sr.
Represented By: Linh G. Vuong
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonna Earls
Represented By: Linh G. Vuong
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?