Pombert v. Glock, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Pombert
Defendant: Consultinvest, Inc., Robert T. Core, James M. Deichert, Glock, Inc. and John F. Renzulli
Case Number: 1:2015cv00723
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Cherokee
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2016 Filing 66 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of defendant James M. Deichert against plaintiff for costs of action. (adg)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 27, 2016 Civil Case Terminated. (adg)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #64 Motion for Leave for Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/27/2016. (adg)
July 26, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION Leave For Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
July 21, 2016 Filing 63 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (JOINT) by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
July 6, 2016 Clerks Notation re #62 Leave of Absence 9/26-30/16, 11/23-25/16, 12/5-8/16, 12/15-16/16, 12/23-30/16, by John Frank Salter, Jr. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by J. Salter on these dates. (ss)
July 5, 2016 Filing 62 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/26-30/16, 11/23-25/16, 12/5-8/16, 12/15-16/16, 12/23-30/16, by John Frank Salter, Jr. (Salter, John)
June 28, 2016 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Robert T. Core.(Kohler, Michael)
June 23, 2016 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc..(Bersinger, Amanda)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #57 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 9/30/2016. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/31/2016. If no Summary Judgment Motion filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2016. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/17/2016. (ss)
May 17, 2016 Clerks Notation re #58 Leave of Absence June 20-24, 2016, July 1-5, 2016, July 30, 2016, by Michael Paul Kohler.Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by m. Kohler on these dates. (ss)
May 16, 2016 Filing 58 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 20-24, 2016, July 1-5, 2016, July 30-August 5, 2016, by Michael Paul Kohler. (Kohler, Michael)
May 13, 2016 Filing 57 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
May 13, 2016 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY (Initial Disclosures) by Jeffrey L. Pombert.(Salter, John)
May 13, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Robert T. Core.(Kohler, Michael)
May 13, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc. of Service of Defendants Glock, Inc. and Consultinvest, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures (Doherty, Ronan)
May 13, 2016 Filing 53 FILED IN ERROR Initial Disclosures by Robert T. Core. (Parker, Christopher) Modified on 5/13/2016 per atty filed telephone call. (jtj)
May 10, 2016 Filing 52 Amended ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Robert T. Core.(Kohler, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 29, 2016 Filing 51 Robert T. Core's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Robert T. Core.(Kohler, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 29, 2016 Filing 50 Consultinvest, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Consultinvest, Inc..(Doherty, Ronan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 29, 2016 Filing 49 Glock, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Glock, Inc.. Discovery ends on 9/26/2016.(Doherty, Ronan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 31, 2016 Discovery ends on 9/30/2016. (ss)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Consultinvest, Inc.; Robert T. Core; Glock, Inc. Answers due 4/29/2016. Joint Preliminary Planning Report no later than May 13, 2016. Discovery shall open May 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/31/2016. (ss)
March 30, 2016 Filing 47 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Establish Deadlines for the Parties' Rule 26 Obligations by Consultinvest, Inc., Robert T. Core, Glock, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Doherty, Ronan) Modified to add word on 3/31/2016 (bdb).
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION and ORDER granting #22 Defendant James M. Deichert's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #24 Defendant Robert T. Core's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #23 and #25 Defendants Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., and John F. Renzulli's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2016. (bdb)
February 16, 2016 Clerks Notation re #45 Leave of Absence March 24, 2016, April 27-29, 2016, June 27-July 1, 2016, by Christine L. Mast. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by C. Mast on these dates. (ss)
February 15, 2016 Filing 45 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 24, 2016, April 27-29, 2016, June 27-July 1, 2016, by Christine L. Mast. (Mast, Christine)
January 28, 2016 Clerks Notation re #44 Leave of Absence March 4-14, 2016, by Christine L. Mast. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by C. Mast on these dates. (ss)
January 27, 2016 Filing 44 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 4-14, 2016, by Christine L. Mast. (Mast, Christine)
October 29, 2015 Clerks Notation re #42 Leave of Absence, 11/25-27/2015, 12/17-18/2015,12/23/2015-1/1/2016, 4/4-8/2016, 6/3-13/2016, by John Frank Salter, Jr. and #43 Leave of Absence November 25-30, 2015, December 28, 2015 through January 5, 2016, by Christine L. Mast. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by J. Salter and C. Mast on dates requested. (ss)
September 30, 2015 Filing 43 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 25-30, 2015, December 28, 2015 through January 5, 2016, by Christine L. Mast. (Mast, Christine)
September 29, 2015 Filing 42 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/25/2015-11/27/2015, 12/17/2015-12/18/215,12/23/2015-1/1/2016, 4/4/2016-4/8/2016, 6/3/2016-6/13/2016, by John Frank Salter, Jr. (Salter, John)
August 10, 2015 Clerks Notation re #41 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT. (ss)
August 6, 2015 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
July 30, 2015 Clerks Notation re #40 Corporate Disclosure Statement, OK per TWT. (ss)
July 29, 2015 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert T. Core by Robert T. Core.(Kohler, Michael)
July 28, 2015 Clerks Notation re #39 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT. (ss)
July 27, 2015 Clerks Notation re #38 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT. (ss)
July 27, 2015 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Persons by James M. Deichert. (Mast, Christine)
July 24, 2015 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Persons by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc.. (Bersinger, Amanda)
July 22, 2015 Submission of #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
July 22, 2015 Clerks Notation re #34 Leave of Absence July 27-31 and August 19-24, 2015 by Ronan P. Doherty. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by R. Doherty on these dates. (ss)
July 16, 2015 Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert T. Core. (Kohler, Michael)
July 16, 2015 Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [CORRECTED] filed by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli. (Doherty, Ronan)
July 16, 2015 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James M. Deichert. (Mast, Christine)
July 15, 2015 Filing 34 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 27, 28, 29, 30, 31 and August 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, by Ronan P. Doherty. (Doherty, Ronan)
July 14, 2015 Docket ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages at the direction of the Court on 7/14/2015 S. Sewell on 7/14/2015. (ss)
July 13, 2015 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Bersinger, Amanda)
June 18, 2015 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [CORRECTED] filed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/16/2015. (ss)
June 15, 2015 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wilson, Walter)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Docket ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time through June 18, 2015 to file responses and any replies by defendant extended through July 16, 2015 re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . By Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/26/2015. (ss)
May 22, 2015 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond & Reply To Motion To Dismiss re: #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John)
May 22, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Matthew Wilson on behalf of Jeffrey L. Pombert (Wilson, Walter)
May 22, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [CORRECTED] by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Doherty, Ronan)
May 21, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Robert T. Core. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Indictment, #2 Exhibit B: Nolle Prosequi)(Kohler, Michael)
May 21, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Doherty, Ronan)
May 21, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by James M. Deichert. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(Mast, Christine)
May 21, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE Of Filing by Robert T. Core (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Indictment, #2 Exhibit B: Nolle Prosequi)(Kohler, Michael)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages when filing Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/21/2015. (ss)
May 20, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Mast on behalf of James M. Deichert (Mast, Christine)
May 19, 2015 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consultinvest, Inc., Robert T. Core, James M. Deichert, Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bersinger, Amanda)
April 16, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiana Scogin Mykkeltvedt on behalf of Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli (Mykkeltvedt, Tiana)
April 16, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Earl Floyd on behalf of Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli (Floyd, John)
April 16, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Kay Seals Bersinger on behalf of Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli (Bersinger, Amanda)
April 15, 2015 Clerks Notation re # 14 Leave of Absence 5/29/2015-6/5/2015, by John Frank Salter. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by J. Salter on these dates. (ss)
April 14, 2015 Filing 14 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/29/2015-6/5/2015, by John Frank Salter, Jr. (Salter, John)
April 14, 2015 Filing 13 CORRECTED NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Evan Parker on behalf of Robert T. Core (Parker, Christopher) Modified on 4/14/2015 (dr).
April 14, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Evan Parker on behalf of Robert T. Core (Parker, Christopher)
April 14, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Kohler on behalf of Robert T. Core (Kohler, Michael)
March 31, 2015 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. Robert Core answer due 5/21/15. (dr)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting # 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer through 5/21/2015 for All Defendants and Deferring The Parties' Rule 26 Obligations until after the Court rules upon defendants' motion to dismiss, after which parties to confer and submit schedule for completing their intial disclosures and Joint Preliminary Planning Report. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/31/2015. (ss)
March 31, 2015 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. (Salter, John) Modified on 4/1/2015 (dr).
March 27, 2015 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re # 1 Complaint, And To Defer The Parties' Rule 26 Obligations by Consultinvest, Inc., Glock, Inc., John F. Renzulli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Doherty, Ronan)
March 18, 2015 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. John F. Renzulli served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Salter, John)
March 16, 2015 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. James M. Deichert served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Salter, John)
March 16, 2015 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. Consultinvest, Inc. served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Salter, John)
March 16, 2015 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. Glock, Inc. served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Salter, John)
March 11, 2015 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Consultinvest, Inc., Robert T. Core, James M. Deichert, Glock, Inc. and John F. Renzulli. (Attachments: # 1 Consultinvest Inc., # 2 J. Deichert, # 3 J. Renzulli, # 4 R. Core)(eop)
March 11, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jeffrey L. Pombert. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-5706670.) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. - A - Theoretical Money Flows, # 2 Ex. - B - Actual Money Flows, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pombert v. Glock, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Pombert
Represented By: Walter Matthew Wilson
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John Frank Salter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consultinvest, Inc.
Represented By: Ronan P. Doherty
Represented By: Amanda Kay Seals Bersinger
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Represented By: Tiana Scogin Mykkeltvedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Core
Represented By: Michael Paul Kohler
Represented By: Christopher Evan Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Deichert
Represented By: Christine L. Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock, Inc.
Represented By: Ronan P. Doherty
Represented By: Amanda Kay Seals Bersinger
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Represented By: Tiana Scogin Mykkeltvedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Renzulli
Represented By: Ronan P. Doherty
Represented By: Amanda Kay Seals Bersinger
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Represented By: Tiana Scogin Mykkeltvedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?