Tawfeeq v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John F. Kelly, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Kevin A. McAleenan, Carey Davis, Andy Pryor, Shana Wells, U.S. Department of State and Thomas A. Shannon
Case Number: 1:2017cv00353
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Timothy C. Batten
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing Clerk's Office to make case filings electronically available for review through PACER. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 2/3/17. (rsh)
February 3, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheetul Sheth Wall on behalf of Carey Davis, John F. Kelly, Kevin A. McAleenan, Andy Pryor, Thomas A. Shannon, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Shana Wells (Wall, Sheetul)
February 3, 2017 MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carl W. Hampe; granting 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Pierce. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/3/17. (se)
February 2, 2017 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 15 Order, Set Submission Deadline,, filed by Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING defendants to file their response(s), if any, to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Proceedings by 2/8/17. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve this order on defendants. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 2/2/17. (jlm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2017: # 1 Order) (jlm).
February 2, 2017 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Shana Wells. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Carey Davis. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Andy Pryor. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to John F. Kelly. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Thomas Shannon. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Kevin McAleenan. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to U.S. Department of State. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Moser, Theresia)
February 2, 2017 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to defendants Carey Davis, John F. Kelly, Kevin A. McAleenan, Andy Pryor, Thomas A. Shannon, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State and Shana Wells re 15 Order. (Using addresses provided on summonses) (jlm)
February 1, 2017 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Proceedings with Brief In Support by Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Expedite, # 2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Deborah Rayner, # 3 Text of Proposed Order in Response to Motion to Expedite, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule)(Moser, Theresia)
February 1, 2017 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel P. Pierce Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6945170). Attorney Daniel P. Pierce added appearing on behalf of Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq (pmb)
February 1, 2017 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Carl W. Hampe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6945025). Attorney Carl W. Hampe added appearing on behalf of Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq (pmb)
January 31, 2017 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel P. Pierce Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6945170)by Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq. (Moser, Theresia)
January 31, 2017 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Carl W. Hampe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6945025)by Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq. (Moser, Theresia)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carey Davis, John F. Kelly, Kevin A. McAleenan, Andy Pryor, Thomas A. Shannon, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State and Shana Wells. (aaq)
January 31, 2017 Submission of the 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY, MANDAMUS, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (aaq)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY, MANDAMUS, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq against Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6944220.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executive Order, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tawfeeq v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Abdullah Tawfeeq
Represented By: Carl W. Hampe
Represented By: Theresia Maria Moser
Represented By: Daniel P. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin A. McAleenan
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Davis
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Pryor
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shana Wells
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Shannon
Represented By: Sheetul Sheth Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?