Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta et al v. Bozeman Financial LLC
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia, Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland and Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis
Defendant: Bozeman Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00389
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Final Written Decisions Regarding the Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,754,640 and 8,768,840 by Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas, Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moffitt, Natasha)
July 20, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Compliance re #16 Order by Attorney James B. Hatten (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Hatten, James)
July 16, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bozeman Financial LLC re #17 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (sap)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court ORDERS general counsel for Defendant (or other newly retained counsel) to file a notice of appearance on behalf of Defendant no later than July 30, 2018. The Court permits Defendant to forego local counsel while the case is administratively closed pending the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's decision. In the event that the Court re-opens this case after the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's decision, the Court will direct Defendant at that time to retain new local counsel. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/16/2018. (sap)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING James B. Hatten and Katrina M. Quicker's #14 and #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Bozeman Financial LLC. Defendant Bozeman Financial LLC is a corporate entity and thus must be represented by counsel in this action. Therefore, Defendant Bozeman Financial LLC is ORDERED to retain new counsel who must file a notice of appearance with the Court by July 20, 2018. A failure to do so will result in default judgment against Defendant Bozeman Financial LLC. Mr. Hatten and Ms. Quicker are DIRECTED to promptly provide a copy of this Order to Bozeman Financial LLC. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/22/2018. (sap)
June 19, 2018 Submission of #14 MOTION to Withdraw James Byron Hatten as Attorney and #15 MOTION to Withdraw Katrina M. Quicker as Attorney to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (sap)
May 30, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Katrina M. Quicker as Attorney by Bozeman Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intention to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Notice of Intention to Withdraw as Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
May 30, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw James Byron Hatten as Attorney by Bozeman Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intention to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Notice of Intention to Withdraw as Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatten, James)
March 28, 2017 Civil Case Administratively Closed. (jtj)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Stay Litigation Pending United States Patent Trial and Appeal Board's Covered Business Method Review. This case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The Parties are DIRECTED to inform the Court of the outcome of the CBM review within 10 days of a final decision, including a decision declining review. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/28/2017. (jtj)
March 28, 2017 Submission of #12 Consent MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending United States Patent Trial and Appeal Board's Covered Business Method Review, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj)
March 27, 2017 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending United States Patent Trial and Appeal Board's Covered Business Method Review with Brief In Support by Bozeman Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
March 27, 2017 Filing 11 Certificate of Compliance by Bozeman Financial LLC. (Hatten, James)
March 27, 2017 Filing 10 Certificate of Compliance by Bozeman Financial LLC. (Quicker, Katrina)
March 27, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina M. Quicker on behalf of Bozeman Financial LLC (Quicker, Katrina)
March 27, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Byron Hatten on behalf of Bozeman Financial LLC (Hatten, James)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendant Bozeman Financial LLC has through and including March 27, 2017 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief in this action. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/06/2017. (jtj)
March 6, 2017 Submission of #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj)
March 3, 2017 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant To Respond To Complaint re: #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas, Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moffitt, Natasha)
February 8, 2017 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland, Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas. Bozeman Financial served on 2/3/2017. Answer due 2/24/2017. (Moffitt, Natasha) Modified on 2/8/2017 to add dates. (jtj)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/02/2017. (jtj)
February 1, 2017 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas, Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco and Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis. (eop)
February 1, 2017 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bozeman Financial LLC.. (eop)
February 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland, Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond and Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6948476.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta et al v. Bozeman Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozeman Financial LLC
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: James Byron Hatten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of New York
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Boston
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis
Represented By: Benjamin K Jordan
Represented By: Natasha Horne Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?