E-System Design, Inc. v. Mentor Graphics Corp.
Plaintiff: E-System Design, Inc.
Defendant: Mentor Graphics Corp. and Siemens Industry, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01127
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING Defendants' #28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 11/13/17. (jlm)
November 13, 2017 Submission of #28 MOTION for Attorney Fees,Defendants' Joint Motion for Attorneys' Fees, submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm)
November 9, 2017 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Joint Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Mentor Graphics Corp., Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Woodworth, Megan)
October 26, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #28 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Joint Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by E-System Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(McKay, Brannon)
October 12, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Joint Motion for Attorneys' Fees with Brief In Support by Mentor Graphics Corp., Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Megan S. Woodworth, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodworth, Megan)
September 28, 2017 Filing 27 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rsh)
September 28, 2017 Civil Case Terminated. (rsh)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i) (rsh)
September 27, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by E-System Design, Inc. (McKay, Brannon)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines by 30 days. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 9/26/17. (jlm)
September 26, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by Mentor Graphics Corp. re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Mentor Graphic's Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woodworth, Megan)
September 25, 2017 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines Joint Motion to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines by Mentor Graphics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodworth, Megan)
September 15, 2017 Filing 22 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 9/15/17. (rsh)
September 14, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Siemens Industry, Inc. with Brief In Support by Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodworth, Megan)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time through 9/28/17 for parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference, serve initial disclosures, and file a joint preliminary report and discovery plan. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 8/30/17. (rsh)
August 24, 2017 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines Joint Motion to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines by Mentor Graphics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodworth, Megan)
August 9, 2017 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan S. Woodworth; granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank C. Cimino, Jr. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/9/17. (se)
August 8, 2017 Submission of #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon, submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm)
August 7, 2017 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon filed by Mentor Graphics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Supplemental Evans Decl., #2 Exhibit B Form 8-K, #3 Exhibit C Law360 Article re Venue, #4 Exhibit D List of Participating Schools)(Grier, Jason)
August 3, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Nicole Collins on behalf of Mentor Graphics Corp. (Collins, Lisa)
August 3, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Paul Grier on behalf of Mentor Graphics Corp. (Grier, Jason)
July 28, 2017 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Frank C. Cimino, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7264004). Attorney Frank C. Cimino, Jr added appearing on behalf of Mentor Graphics Corp. (pmb)
July 28, 2017 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Megan S. Woodworth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7263978). Attorney Megan S. Woodworth added appearing on behalf of Mentor Graphics Corp. (pmb)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion Extending Deadline for parties to conduct Rule 26(f) conference, serve initial disclosures and file a joint preliminary report and discovery plan by 30 days. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 7/25/17. (jlm)
July 26, 2017 Clerks Notation re #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
July 24, 2017 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E-System Design, Inc. by E-System Design, Inc..(McKay, Brannon)
July 24, 2017 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mentor Graphics Corp., Siemens Industry, Inc.with Jury Demand, filed by E-System Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(McKay, Brannon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 24, 2017 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon filed by E-System Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(McKay, Brannon)
July 24, 2017 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time serve initial disclosures, conduct Rule 26(f) conference, and submit a Joint Preliminary Case Report by E-System Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McKay, Brannon)
July 13, 2017 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Frank C. Cimino, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7264004)by Mentor Graphics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohler, Michael)
July 13, 2017 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Megan S. Woodworth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7263978)by Mentor Graphics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohler, Michael)
July 11, 2017 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
July 10, 2017 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Mentor Graphics Corp.. (Kohler, Michael)
July 10, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon with Brief In Support by Mentor Graphics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kohler, Michael)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Mentor Graphics Corp. Answer due 7/10/2017. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 6/19/17. (jlm)
June 16, 2017 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by E-System Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McKay, Brannon)
June 16, 2017 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by E-System Design, Inc.. Mentor Graphics Corp. served on 5/18/2017, answer due 6/8/2017. (McKay, Brannon)
March 29, 2017 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the USPTO. (btql)
March 29, 2017 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mentor Graphics Corp. (btql)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by E-System Design, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7057159) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: USPN 8352232, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E-System Design, Inc. v. Mentor Graphics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Graphics Corp.
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Collins
Represented By: Megan S. Woodworth
Represented By: Jason Paul Grier
Represented By: Frank C. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Paul Kohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: Megan S. Woodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-System Design, Inc.
Represented By: Brannon C. McKay
Represented By: Armon Shahdadi
Represented By: Benjamin D. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?