IN RE EQUIFAX INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION

Plaintiff: Hampden Kuhns and Patrick Groover
Defendant: Equifax Inc., Richard F. Smith, John W. Gamble, Jr., Jeffrey L. Dodge and Rodolfo O. Ploder
Petitioner: Robert Brock, FRANKFURT-TRUST Investment GmbH and Union Asset Management Holding AG
Case Number: 1:2017cv03463
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: William S Duffey
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on June 12, 2019, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane Peede. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
June 28, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Hearing: A status conference with lead counsel and liaison counsel in the above-referenced Equifax cases is scheduled for Monday, July 29, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. (See Notice for full details.) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT(EQFItrk)(cmd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON LEAD PLAINTIFF'S #102 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Defendants' opposition shall be filed by August 12, 2019, and Lead Plaintiff's reply in support shall be filed by October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (sap)
June 19, 2019 Filing 123 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule on Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re: #68 Order-Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. (Smith, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 6/13/2019. The parties appeared for a Status Conference at the Court's request. Mr. Harrod updated the Court on Securities Plaintiffs' discussions with Defendants to schedule depositions and agree on a briefing schedule for the motion for class certification, advising the Court that the parties would submit a proposed consent order regarding those matters soon. Mr. Harrod further updated the Court on the status of discovery and efforts to resolve a subpoenaed third party's concerns regarding privileged materials with Defendants. Mr. Weiss briefly summarized Plaintiffs' discussions with Equifax's Chief Information Security Officer ("CISO"), a meeting with the Demand Review Committee of Equifax, and the status of the document review for the Court. The parties and Court determined another Status Conference would be beneficial towards the end of July. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(jpa)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting Request to Lift Restrictions on Media. Counsel for Plaintiff Union Asset Management Holding AG shall be allowed to use portable computers, cellular telephones, pagers and personal communication devices without cameras, electronic devices equipped with cameras, including cellular telephones, and laptop or tablet computers in Courtroom 2108, 2188 Richard B. Russell Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30303-3309 before, during, and after the Status Conference scheduled to take place on June 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/7/19. (ddm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on April 3, 2019, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane Peede. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/21/2019. (sap)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER ON SUBMISSION OF POTENTIAL DISCOVERY ISSUES. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/20/2019. (sap)
May 16, 2019 Submission of #113 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #112 Response to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
May 16, 2019 Filing 117 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER on Submission of Potential Discovery Issues. (Smith, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Submission of #105 Joint MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
May 8, 2019 Filing 116 REPLY BRIEF re #105 Joint MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) filed by Equifax Inc., Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Discovery Management ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/1/2019. (ss)
April 26, 2019 Filing 114 PROPOSED ORDER re Discovery Management. (Lee, Benjamin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #112 Response with Brief In Support by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrod, James)
April 24, 2019 Filing 112 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #105 Joint MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Harrod, James) Modified on 5/22/2019 per the #119 Order (sap).
April 24, 2019 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #105 Joint MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Harrod, James)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING #109 Application for Admission of James Fee Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/22/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (sap)
April 22, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re Submission to District Judge: Submitted Prematurely. Submission Terminated. (sap)
April 19, 2019 (SUBMISSION TERMINATED ON 04/22/2019) Submission of #102 MOTION to Certify Class to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap) Modified on 4/22/2019 (sap).
April 18, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: (109 in 1:17-cv-03463-TWT) APPLICATION for Admission of James Fee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8598599). Attorney Homer Lamar Mixson added appearing on behalf of Union Asset Management Holding AG Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:17-cv-04511-TWT(jkm)
April 17, 2019 Filing 109 APPLICATION for Admission of James Fee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8598599)by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Mixson, Homer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 108 JOINT PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Equifax Inc. (Lee, Benjamin) Modified on 4/18/2019 (cmd).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATED ORDER ON SUBMISSION OF POTENTIAL DISCOVERY ISSUES. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/11/2019. (sap)
April 11, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Exhibit B re #105 Joint MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) by Equifax Inc., Richard F. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) with Brief In Support by Equifax Inc., Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 104 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER on Submission of Potential Discovery Issues. (Seals, Amanda)
April 3, 2019 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/3/2019. The Court DENIED #88 Motion for Clarification. Next Status Conference to be scheduled for June 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. A separate notice will be entered on the docket. (Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03463-TWT and 1:18-cv-317-TWT) (Court Reporter Diane Peede) (sap)
March 29, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION to Certify Class with Brief In Support by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Professor Steven P. Feinstein, Ph.D., CFA, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration on Behalf of Union Asset Management AG in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit 3 - BLBG&G Firm Resume)(Harrod, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Richard F. Smith. Discovery ends on 8/26/2019.(Chaiken, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Jury Demand Added on 4/1/2019 (sap).
March 28, 2019 Filing 100 ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Equifax Inc.. Discovery ends on 8/26/2019.(Smith, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Jury Demand Added on 4/1/2019 (sap).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 4/3/2019 at 2:00 pm, as to J. Harrod. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/28/2019. (ss)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING the Defendants' #92 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #49 Amended Complaint. Defendants' answers shall be filed on or before March 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/21/2019. (sap)
March 20, 2019 Submission of #88 MOTION for Clarification re: #84 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #92 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #49 Amended Complaint to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
March 19, 2019 Filing 97 REPLY BRIEF re #88 MOTION for Clarification re: #84 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Equifax Inc.. (Lee, Benjamin)
March 8, 2019 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on February 19, 2019, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane Peede, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
March 5, 2019 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Clarification re: #84 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Harrod, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (See PDF for details). Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT(EQACtrk)(ss)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Reopen the related Securities Litigation (1:17cv3463) and Derivative Litigation (1:18cv0317) actions. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/22/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT) (EQACtrk) (sap)
February 21, 2019 Filing 92 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #49 Amended Complaint, by Equifax Inc., Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Clerks Notation re #90 Leave of Absence, March 6-12, 2019, March 20, 2019, April 1-2, 2019, April 4-5, 2019, May 22, 2019, July 15-22, 2019, September 4-9, 2019, September 12-16, 2019, November 25-Dec 2, 2019, December 23-30, 2019, by D avid M. Chaiken. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by D. Chaiken on these dates. (ss)
February 20, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING all the individual civil actions linked to this MDL action, EXCLUDING City of Chicago (1:18cv1470) and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (1:18cv5611) vs. Equifax. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap)
February 20, 2019 Filing 90 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 6-12, 2019, March 20, 2019, April 1-2, 2019, April 4-5, 2019, May 22, 2019, July 15-22, 2019, September 4-9, 2019, September 12-16, 2019, November 25-Dec 2, 2019, December 23-30, 2019, by David M. Chaiken. (Chaiken, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 02/19/2019. The Court GRANTED (548 in 1:17-md-02800-TWT) Motion for Clarification. The next Status Conference will be April 3, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. A separate notice will be docketed with additional information. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, and 1:18-cv-00317-TWT) (Court Reporter Diane Peede) (EQACtrk) (sap)
February 19, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for Clarification re: #84 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, with Brief In Support by Equifax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(Lee, Benjamin)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 2/19/2019 at 2:00 p.m., as to J. Harrod. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/13/2019. (ss)
January 30, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. The Court requests that counsel confer, and if able, prepare a proposed agenda and forward to the Court by Tuesday February 19, 2019 9:00 a.m. by email to Ms. Sewell. The Court also requests that Mr. David Worley provide a call center for leadership counsel that wish to monitor by telephone.. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT(EQACtrk)(ss)
January 28, 2019 Clerks Notation re #85 Leave of Absence 2/22 - 3/15/2019, by Homer Lamar Mixson. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by h. Mixson on these dates. (ss)
January 28, 2019 Filing 85 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/22 - 3/15/2019, by Homer Lamar Mixson. (ss)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART the Defendants' #62 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. It is GRANTED as to the Defendants Gamble, Ploder, and Dodge. It is DENIED as to the Defendants Equifax and Smith. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (sap)
December 13, 2018 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of the Motion Hearing Proceedings held on December 11, 2018, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
December 13, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE Of Filing by Union Asset Management Holding AG of Demonstrative Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Demonstrative Exhibit)(Harrod, James)
December 12, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE Of Filing Demonstrative Exhibits by Jeffrey L. Dodge, Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Rodolfo O. Ploder, Richard F. Smith (Attachments: #1 Demonstrative Exhibits)(Smith, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2018. The Court heard argument on defendants' #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS and will issue a written order as soon as possible. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jpa)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPOUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 12/11/2018 at 2:00 pm, as to R. Holtzen, E. Massaro-Hales, C. Paulin. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/7/2018. (ss)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 12/11/2018 at 11:00 a.m. (as to J. Harrod & A. Alexander). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/4/2018. (ss)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2018 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., each side is allowed one hour for argument. The Court will allow telephone monitoring of the hearing, Mr. Harrod is asked to make those arrangements.. (ss)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: Hearing on Motion re: #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM set for 12/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. A new date to be determined. Counsel have been sent separate email message with date options.(ss)
November 26, 2018 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: Status Conference set for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. The date for the next status conference will be determined at a later date.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT(EQACtrk)(ss)
October 2, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., proposed agenda to be e-mailed to S. Sewell by 11/27/2018, 2:00 p.m. Mr. Worley to provide call center for leadership counsel not appearing in person. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT(EQACtrk)(ss)
October 2, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., each is allowed on hour for argument. The Court will allow telephone monitoring of the hearing, Mr. Harrod is tasked with making those arrangements.(ss)
September 26, 2018 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 9/26/2018. here will be no blanket lifting of the stay of discovery. There may be some limited lifting. Plaintiff should file a motion so that the matter may be briefed. Equifax and individual defendants have 45 days to respond to the Block case motion for separate discovery track. The next status conference will be in mid-November; Ms. Sewell to be in contact re dates. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT(Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(EQACtrk)(jkl)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 9/26/2018 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/20/2018. (ss)
September 6, 2018 Remark approving re #74 Status Report by TWT. (ss)
August 30, 2018 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's June 18, 2018 Order by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Harrod, James)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Stipulation and ORDER for the Production of Documents and ESI. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/23/2018. (ss)
August 23, 2018 Submission of #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkl)
August 22, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY BRIEF re #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey L. Dodge, Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Rodolfo O. Ploder, Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Benjamin Lee, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L)(Lee, Benjamin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 71 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ESI by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Harrod, James)
July 26, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/26/2018 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., see PDF for additional details & requirements. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:18-cv-00317-TWT(EQACtrk)(ss)
July 23, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harrod, James)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/19/18. (jkl)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER I. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/19/2018. (jkl)
July 19, 2018 NOTICE The Status Conference scheduled for Friday 7/20/2018 at 11:00 a.m. has been cancelled at request of counsel. A date for the next status conference will be determined and notice entered on docket for a date in late August or September. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ss)
July 18, 2018 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Protective Order, Joint MOTION for Case Management Order by Equifax Inc., Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Schedule)(Bersinger, Amanda)
June 20, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Consent to Alexandra S. Peurach's Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendants by Jeffrey L. Dodge, Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Rodolfo O. Ploder (Smith, Michael) Modified on 6/21/2018 (jkl).
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #52 Motion for Limited Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay. The Motion is granted as to Defendant Equifax, only. The Court orders that the Lead Plaintiff and Equifax: (a) Meet and confer, and, within 30 days of this Order, seek entry of orders governing the treatment of confidential material and the production of Electronically Stored Information; (b) Meet and confer, and, within 30 days of this Order, seek entry of a proposed discovery schedule and Case Management Order; (c) May serve initial requests for the production of documents; (d) Meet and confer regarding the custodians whose ESI will be searched and what search terms should be used to search for ESI in response to any initial requests for the production of documents, and report to the Court within 75 days of this Order on any disagreements or issues with respect to that process; and (e) May serve necessary document preservation subpoenas on Third Parties that have not been served in the MDL. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/15/18. (jkl)
June 7, 2018 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT re #62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Benjamin Lee by Jeffrey L. Dodge, Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Rodolfo O. Ploder, Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Smith, Michael)
June 7, 2018 Filing 62 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Jeffrey L. Dodge, Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Rodolfo O. Ploder, Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Statements Chart)(Smith, Michael)
June 6, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., proposed agenda due 7/19/2018, 3:00 p.m. (see notice for further details). (ss)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/5/2018. (ss)
June 1, 2018 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss Briefing by Jeffrey L. Dodge, Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Rodolfo O. Ploder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
June 1, 2018 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on May 22, 2018, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
May 22, 2018 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 5/22/2018. The Court followed the parties proposed agenda and heard from counsel regarding the Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay. The next status conference will be in mid to late July, a date to be determined. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jkl)
May 22, 2018 Submission of #52 MOTION FOR LIMITED MODIFICATION OF THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkl)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL & OTHER COMPUTER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 5/22/2018 at 2:00 pm Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/21/2018. (ss)
May 18, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION FOR LIMITED MODIFICATION OF THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Harrod, James)
May 18, 2018 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrod, James)
May 11, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION FOR LIMITED MODIFICATION OF THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY filed by Jeffrey L. Dodge, Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Rodolfo O. Ploder, Richard F. Smith. (Smith, Michael)
April 27, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION FOR LIMITED MODIFICATION OF THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY with Brief In Support by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrod, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. Rodolfo O. Ploder waiver mailed on 4/25/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Harrod, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. Jeffrey L. Dodge waiver mailed on 4/25/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Harrod, James)
April 23, 2018 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith, Rodolfo O. Ploder, Jeffrey L. Dodgewith Jury Demand, filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG.(Harrod, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 10, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Lee on behalf of Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr (Lee, Benjamin)
April 4, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT(EQACtrk)(ss)
April 3, 2018 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 4/3/2018. Mr. Harrod to file motion regarding limited lifting of PSLRA stay and permission to serve document preservation subpoenas on third parties. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(EQACtrk)(jkl)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal and Substitution re #41 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: David M. Chaiken replaces attorneys B. Warren Pope, Michael R. Smith, Israel Dahan and Alexandra Spear Peurach for Defendant Richard F. Smith. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/2/2018. (jkl)
April 2, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Steven G. Madison, Meghan A. McCaffrey and Michael E. Liftik re #43 Order on Application for Admission PHV, #44 Order on Application for Admission PHV, #42 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkl)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Michael E. Liftik's #35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/2/2018. (jkl)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Meghan A. McCaffrey's #36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/2/2018. (jkl)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Steven G. Madison's #37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/2/2018. (jkl)
March 30, 2018 Filing 41 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. David M. Chaiken replacing attorney B. Warren Pope; Michael R. Smith; Israel Dahan and Alexandra Spear Peurach. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaiken, David)
March 27, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #37 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven G. Madison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7765018). Attorney Steven G. Madison added appearing on behalf of Richard F. Smith (pmb)
March 27, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #36 APPLICATION for Admission of Meghan A. McCaffrey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7765012). Attorney Meghan A. McCaffrey added appearing on behalf of Richard F. Smith (pmb)
March 27, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #35 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael E. Liftik Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7764977). Attorney Michael E. Liftik added appearing on behalf of Richard F. Smith (pmb)
March 23, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE re #39 Status Report filed by Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith. (Smith, Michael)
March 23, 2018 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Electronic Discovery Stipulation and Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B- Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order)(Mixson, Homer)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 3. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/20/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ddm)
March 22, 2018 Filing 37 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven G. Madison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7765018)by Richard F. Smith. (Chaiken, David)
March 22, 2018 Filing 36 APPLICATION for Admission of Meghan A. McCaffrey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7765012)by Richard F. Smith. (Chaiken, David)
March 22, 2018 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael E. Liftik Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7764977)by Richard F. Smith. (Chaiken, David)
March 22, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Chaiken on behalf of Richard F. Smith (Chaiken, David)
February 23, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference with Lead Counsel set for 4/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Appointing Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel and Addressing case Management. Union Asset Management Holding AG is lead plaintiff; Lead Plaintiff's selection of the law firm of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP serve as lead counsel for the proposed class. Within 60 days of entry of the order counsel shall file consolidated complaint; defendants has answer or move to dismiss consolidated complaint within 45 days of its filing; if a motion to dismiss is filed response by lead plaintiff due within 45 days of its filing; any reply due within 30 days; if motion to dismiss denied answer due 45 days from entry of such order. The filing of Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan suspended pending the Court's ruling on any motion to dismiss the consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/21/2018. (ss)
February 20, 2018 Clerks Notation re #28 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Scheduling Hearing on Applications for Leadership Appointments for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 2108. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADDRESSING CONSOLIDATION AND CERTAIN EARLY SCHEDULING MATTERS. #15 Joint Motion is granted. 17-CV-4511 is consolidated with 17-CV-3463. ALL FUTURE FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN 17-CV-3463. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/10/18. (jkl)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A Consumer Case and Counsel Table, #2 Exhibit 1B Small Business Cases and Counsel Table, #3 Exhibit 2 Financial Cases and Counsel Table)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss)
January 8, 2018 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Asset Management Holding AG identifying Other Affiliate DZ Bank AG, Other Affiliate VR GbR for Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Mixson, Homer)
January 4, 2018 Filing 27 Letter to Judge Thrash and Judge Duffey by Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith re #25 Notice of Filing, #26 Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) Modified on 1/4/2018 (jkl).
December 28, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE Of Filing Letter to Judge Thrash and Judge Duffey re Opposition to Motion to Decentralize by Union Asset Management Holding AG re #25 Notice of Filing (Mixson, Homer)
December 27, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE Of Filing by Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith re #19 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Set/Clear Flags, Letter to Judge Thrash and Judge Duffey (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by Union Asset Management Holding AG of Appearance of Brenna Nelinson (Mixson, Homer)
December 21, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE by Union Asset Management Holding AG of Appearance of Abe Alexander (Mixson, Homer)
December 21, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE by Union Asset Management Holding AG of Appearance of James A. Harrod (Mixson, Homer)
December 11, 2017 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Mixson, Homer)
December 11, 2017 Filing 20 (Refiled to link to member cases) Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al (jkl) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03422-TWT, 1:17-cv-03433-TWT, 1:17-cv-03436-TWT, 1:17-cv-03443-TWT, 1:17-cv-03444-TWT, 1:17-cv-03445-TWT, 1:17-cv-03447-TWT, 1:17-cv-03448-TWT, 1:17-cv-03449-TWT, 1:17-cv-03450-TWT, 1:17-cv-03451-TWT, 1:17-cv-03452-TWT, 1:17-cv-03453-TWT, 1:17-cv-03454-TWT, 1:17-cv-03456-TWT, 1:17-cv-03457-TWT, 1:17-cv-03458-TWT, 1:17-cv-03459-TWT, 1:17-cv-03460-TWT, 1:17-cv-03461-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:17-cv-03476-TWT, 1:17-cv-03477-TWT, 1:17-cv-03479-TWT, 1:17-cv-03480-TWT, 1:17-cv-03482-TWT, 1:17-cv-03483-TWT, 1:17-cv-03484-TWT, 1:17-cv-03487-TWT, 1:17-cv-03492-TWT, 1:17-cv-03497-TWT, 1:17-cv-03498-TWT, 1:17-cv-03499-TWT, 1:17-cv-03501-TWT, 1:17-cv-03502-TWT, 1:17-cv-03507-TWT, 1:17-cv-03509-TWT, 1:17-cv-03512-TWT, 1:17-cv-03523-TWT, 1:17-cv-03571-TWT, 1:17-cv-03578-TWT, 1:17-cv-03582-TWT, 1:17-cv-03586-TWT, 1:17-cv-03587-TWT, 1:17-cv-03613-TWT, 1:17-cv-03618-TWT, 1:17-cv-03659-TWT, 1:17-cv-03676-TWT, 1:17-cv-03708-TWT, 1:17-cv-03713-TWT, 1:17-cv-03715-TWT, 1:17-cv-03745-TWT, 1:17-cv-03764-TWT, 1:17-cv-03765-TWT, 1:17-cv-03769-TWT, 1:17-cv-03798-TWT, 1:17-cv-03809-TWT, 1:17-cv-03829-TWT, 1:17-cv-03863-TWT, 1:17-cv-03872-TWT, 1:17-cv-03873-TWT, 1:17-cv-03881-TWT, 1:17-cv-03885-TWT, 1:17-cv-03886-TWT, 1:17-cv-03892-TWT, 1:17-cv-03905-TWT, 1:17-cv-03972-TWT, 1:17-cv-04159-TWT, 1:17-cv-04184-TWT, 1:17-cv-04250-TWT, 1:17-cv-04388-TWT, 1:17-cv-04389-TWT, 1:17-cv-04480-TWT, 1:17-cv-04544-TWT, 1:17-cv-04600-TWT, 1:17-cv-04694-TWT, 1:17-cv-04707-TWT, 1:17-cv-04756-TWT, 1:17-cv-04763-TWT, 1:17-cv-04775-TWT, 1:17-cv-04792-TWT, 1:17-cv-04822-TWT, 1:17-cv-04940-TWT, 1:17-cv-04942-TWT, 1:17-cv-04986-TWT, 1:17-cv-04987-TWT, 1:17-cv-04988-TWT, 1:17-cv-04989-TWT, 1:17-cv-04990-TWT, 1:17-cv-04996-TWT, 1:17-cv-04997-TWT, 1:17-cv-05001-TWT, 1:17-cv-05002-TWT, 1:17-cv-05003-TWT, 1:17-cv-05004-TWT, 1:17-cv-05005-TWT, 1:17-cv-05006-TWT, 1:17-cv-05007-TWT, 1:17-cv-05008-TWT, 1:17-cv-05009-TWT, 1:17-cv-05010-TWT, 1:17-cv-05014-TWT, 1:17-cv-05015-TWT, 1:17-cv-05016-TWT, 1:17-cv-05017-TWT, 1:17-cv-05020-TWT, 1:17-cv-05021-TWT, 1:17-cv-05022-TWT, 1:17-cv-05023-TWT, 1:17-cv-05024-TWT, 1:17-cv-05025-TWT, 1:17-cv-05026-TWT, 1:17-cv-05027-TWT, 1:17-cv-05028-TWT, 1:17-cv-05029-TWT, 1:17-cv-05037-TWT, 1:17-cv-05038-TWT, 1:17-cv-05039-TWT, 1:17-cv-05040-TWT, 1:17-cv-05041-TWT, 1:17-cv-05042-TWT, 1:17-cv-05048-TWT, 1:17-cv-05049-TWT, 1:17-cv-05050-TWT, 1:17-cv-05058-TWT, 1:17-cv-05059-TWT, 1:17-cv-05060-TWT, 1:17-cv-05061-TWT, 1:17-cv-05062-TWT, 1:17-cv-05063-TWT, 1:17-cv-05067-TWT, 1:17-cv-05068-TWT(jkl)
December 11, 2017 Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al (jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl)
December 11, 2017 Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re #23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl).
December 11, 2017 Submission of #15 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Order Addressing Certain Early Scheduling Matters to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
December 11, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Judge William S. Duffey, Jr no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:17-cv-03463-TWT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jkl)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Initial case management conference set for 1/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/8/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl)
December 6, 2017 Submission of #15 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Order Addressing Certain Early Scheduling Matters, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
November 27, 2017 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Mixson, Homer)
November 27, 2017 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith. (Smith, Michael)
November 27, 2017 Filing 16 Withdrawal of Motion #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Robert Brock filed by Robert Brock. (Dees, Marshall)
November 14, 2017 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Order Addressing Certain Early Scheduling Matters by Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel, and MOTION for Consolidation of Related Actions, with Brief In Support, by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of H. Lamar Mixson, #3 Exhibit A - Assignments, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Charts, #6 Exhibit D - PSLRA Notice, #7 Exhibit E - BLB&G Resume, #8 Attorney Certification, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Mixson, Homer) . Added MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases on 11/14/2017 (ddm).
November 13, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION TO Consolidate Cases, MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, with Brief In Support, by FRANKFURT-TRUST Investment GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Bain in Support, #3 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Certification, #4 Exhibit B: Loss Analysis, #5 Exhibit C: PSLRA Notice, #6 Exhibit D: Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit E: Bain Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit F: Local Rule 23.1 Certification, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bain, David) . Added MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases on 11/14/2017 (ddm).
November 13, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Brief In Support by Robert Brock. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip Kim, #4 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Notice, #5 Exhibit 2 - Certification, #6 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #7 Exhibit 4 - Rosen Resume, #8 Exhibit 5 - Holzer Resume)(Dees, Marshall)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/23/17. (jkl)
October 19, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Letter to Chief Judge Thrash by Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith (Smith, Michael)
October 19, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Remove Securities Class Action from Consumer Class Action Stay with Brief In Support by Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Securities Class Action)(Smith, Michael)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. All proceedings and deadlines in the cases set forth in Exhibit A to this Order are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Equifax, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2800. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/11/2017. (dfb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hampden Kuhns. John W. Gamble, Jr waiver mailed on 9/18/2017, answer due 11/17/2017. (Bain, David)
September 29, 2017 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hampden Kuhns. Richard F. Smith waiver mailed on 9/18/2017, answer due 11/17/2017. (Bain, David)
September 29, 2017 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hampden Kuhns. Equifax Inc. waiver mailed on 9/18/2017, answer due 11/17/2017. (Bain, David)
September 15, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Spear Peurach on behalf of Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith (Peurach, Alexandra)
September 15, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Warren Pope on behalf of Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith (Pope, B.)
September 15, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Smith on behalf of Equifax Inc., John W. Gamble, Jr, Richard F. Smith (Smith, Michael)
September 8, 2017 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Hampden Kuhns. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7375260.) (Attachments: #1 Ex -1 - Plaintiff's Certification, #2 Ex -2 - Plaintiff's Transactions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 9/14/2017 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE EQUIFAX INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hampden Kuhns
Represented By: Eduard Korsinsky
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Represented By: James Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Groover
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: James Harrod
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: Alexandra Spear Peurach
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Benjamin Lee
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Smith
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: Alexandra Spear Peurach
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: David M. Chaiken
Represented By: Steven G. Madison
Represented By: Meghan A. McCaffrey
Represented By: Michael E. Liftik
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Gamble, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: Alexandra Spear Peurach
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Benjamin Lee
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Dodge
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo O. Ploder
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Brock
Represented By: Marshall P. Dees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANKFURT-TRUST Investment GmbH
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Union Asset Management Holding AG
Represented By: Brenna D. Nelinson
Represented By: James M. Fee
Represented By: Abraham Alexander
Represented By: James Harrod
Represented By: Amanda Kay Seals
Represented By: Homer Lamar Mixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?