Hudson Insurance Company v. 18 Speed Trucking et al
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Defendant: BD&J Trucking, LLC, Trans-Lease Mid Continent Van, Trans Recovery - DH Transportation, Birkey Trucking, Mid Continent Van Service, Inc., R B Humphreys, Inc., Wallace Factoring - Southern Armour, RE Transportation, Gregory Transport 1 Inc., Sunbelt Finance, LLC - Dreamer Logistics, Greatwide Dallas & Mavis, LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Services, CD Consortium- Accent Transportation, Priority 1, Inc., XPO Logistics, Vero Business Capital - DH Transportation, Inc., S&S Trucking, Lanita Specialized, LLC, Titan Express, LLC, R2 Logistics, LLC, Basingen Group- 1A Intermodal, Roadstar Transport, Inc., ZG Logistics, TCI Business Capital, Inc. - MP Express, Inc., West Trans Auto, Inc., Accent Transport, Cast Transportation, First Line Funding - Grace Transport, XPress Transportations, LLC, M & K Logistics, Roger Henson Trucking, LLC, CKR Transport, LTD, QuickPay Funding - ASL Transport & Service, RTS Financial - Salas Express, LLC, Fleetone Factoring - Ocean Star Transportation, LLC, Firstline Funding - Velocity by Grace, Titan Transport, LLC, TAFS, Inc. - William Burke, MVP Logistics, RTS Financial - Liberty Transit, LLC, KATSS & S, LLC, Marroquin Transport, Inc., Probilling & Funding Service - J&P Trucking, Inc., Gulf Coast Business Credit - Ironhorse Carriers, Gella Star Transport, LLC, TBS Logistics, LLC - Goody Boy Hauling, Fox Transport Co., Total Logistics, Porter Trucking, Route 66 Logistics Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Ecapital - Barnes Unlimited Transport, Tryon Trucking, Inc., Skylight Express Logistics, Inc., Titi, Transport Inc., Determined Transport, Fleetone Factoring - Hermes NVC, TAFS, Inc. - Liberty Freight Transport, Capital Energy Solutions, Tex-Mex Transport, Unity Trans Inc., CFI, Firstline Funding - Nash, Trail Lines, Inc., Skyline Express, LLC, Wallace Factoring - Fitts Trucking, Worthing Transportation Co., LLC, Match Factors - Privateer Solutions, Liberty Transit, Interstate Capital - Randall Stubbs Trucking, Trucker Path, Inc., ComData, Vero Business Capital - A M Baker Trucking, CJM Financial- Hamilton Haulers, RTS Financial - Fast Lane Transit, Bluestar Services, LLC, Super Dan Trucking, LLC, Nationwide Transport Finance- G&G Specialized Carriers, Shippers Preferred Express, Inc., Shaw Transport & Hauling, LLC, J. Line, Inc, 18 Speed Trucking, Panther Trucking, Triumph Business Capital, 918 Transport LLC, RE Building, Starrett Service, Inc., Global Expedited, Inc., Springbrook Express, LLC, Marques Transportation, RTS Financial - Trans Lines., Quick Carrier, LLC, F.E.T., Ikes Trucking, C&W Trucking, Loper Trucking, Wallace Factoring, LLC - Eight Transportation, CW Trucking, Delux Transport, We Haul, Oak Hill Capital - PEI, Interstate Capital - Kaptan, LLC, Credit Express Inc.- Route 66 Auto Shippers, Smart Transport, Inc, Crestmark TPG, LLC- Jet Inc., Redline Trucking, Inc., TBS Logistics, LLC - SNM Logistic, JCC Transport, MLS Official Transport, DLS Motor- Transport, LLC, Apex Capital Corp.- Lyon Express, TAFS, Inc. - KK's Trucking, RTS Financial - SS Carrier, Inc., Powell Transportation Co., Inc., Hagwood Transportation Svcs, Inc., Freight Factoring Spec. - Bataille Hauling Svcs, Boskurt Transport, Apex Capital Corp.- Gomez Trucking, Road Kings Transport LLC, FANS Transportation, Road King Transport and Logistics, LLC, Jenel Leodor Popescu, Transport US, CMZ Hotshots Services, TAG Trans Inc., Arcbest, Johnny Trans LLC, J.E.T. of Searcy, EDE, Inc., CSX Intermodal Terminal, Inc., Proserv Logistics, LLC, Sunone Logistics, LLC, TAFS, Inc. - Moneypenny Trucking, Bud Trucking, Financial Carrier Services, Inc.- ESCO Transportation, Global Business Intergroup, Baylor Trucking, Dakotaland Transportation Inc., RTS Financial - UA Trucking, JY Transportation, Inc., RTS Financial - Run Direct, First Line Funding - Bricker Transport, Mike Collins Trucking, GAP Transportation, LLC, Orange Commerical Credit - Delta Express, Inc., Gulf Coast Business Credit - 1st Time Transportation, BAM Capital-Nile Express, LLC, Superior Power Specialist, LLC, Wallace Factoring - Quad L Transport, Echo Global Logistics, Inc., Latul Transporation, LLC, Schibi Transportation, LLC, Global Trucking, LLC, Ithrive - Longhorn Laramie Express, Interstate Capital - J Hughes Hot Shot Transporation, RTS Financial - Fox C Group, DSG Logistics, Americars Transportation, Inc., Wallace Factoring - Winston Trans, Jagim Transportation, Inc., Eagle Capital- D&D Rockstar Trucking, BQT, Inc., Nationwide Express, Inc., Altpro, RTS Financial - La Roma Transport, Taylorsville Freight Service, LLC, Roland Davis Trucking, Inc., Triumph Business Capital doing business as Advance Business Capital, LLC- Boskurt Transport Inc., Jenel Leodor Popescu doing business as O D Trucking, Arcbest doing business as Panther Premium Log, AGA Express, LLC, Alpine Express, LLC, AST Inc. of Illinois, Atlantic Coast Carriers, Inc., BAH Express Inc.- Vessell, Crossroads Logistics & Transport, Randall Johnson, R&R Express, Inc., Stephanie Johnson and Graham Lewis, Inc. doing business as 48 Express
Case Number: 1:2018cv00880
Filed: February 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2020 Order [ECF 212] and Final Judgment entered in favor of Arcbest (dba Panther Premium Log); Boskurt Transport Inc.; South Park Motor Lines, Inc. (dba Cast Transportation); Mikhail Vasilevskiy (dba F.E.T.); Fox Transport Co.; and QuickPay Funding-ASL Transport & Service [ECF 213], the Clerk is directed to close this matter. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 26, 2020. (ash)
October 19, 2020 Submission of #212 Order on Motion to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
October 15, 2020 Filing 215 NOTICE by Hudson Insurance Company and Confirmation of Payment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Arcbest Proof of Delivery, #2 Exhibit B -- Boskurt Proof of Delivery, #3 Exhibit C -- South Park Proof of Delivery, #4 Exhibit D -- FET Proof of Delivery, #5 Exhibit E -- Fox Transport Proof of Delivery, #6 Exhibit F -- QuickPay Proof of Delivery)(Harris, Joseph)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 213 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff Hudson Insurance Company against defendants (SEE JUDGMENT FOR LIST OF DEFENDANTS.). C&W Trucking is DISMISSED from this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Skyline Express, LLC is DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE. Hudson is directed to pay the following amounts to the following Defendants at the addresses indicated using a method of delivery that allows for delivery tracking and confirmation: (SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS.). (tcc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Final Judgment [ECF #202 ]. Hudson's Motion for Final Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is denied to the extent that it seeks entry of a default judgment against C&W Trucking. C&W Trucking is DISMISSED from this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Skyline Express, LLC is DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter DEFAULT against the following Defendants: (SEE ORDER FOR LIST OF DEFENDANTS.) Further, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter DEFAULT JUDGMENTS against each of these Defendants. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter DEFAULT JUDGMENTS against the following additional Defendants for which default has previously been entered: (SEE ORDER FOR LIST OF DEFENDANTS.) Finally, Hudson is directed to pay the following amounts to the following Defendants at the addresses indicated using a method of delivery that allows for delivery tracking and confirmation: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.) Hudson is DIRECTED to file with the Court proof of such delivery within 30 days after entry of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this Order to the undersigned in 30 days. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/17/2020. (tcc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 211 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order and Final Judgment re: #202 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment . (Harris, Joseph)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (rvb) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (mmc) (ADI)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jed)
January 27, 2020 Submission of #202 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
January 7, 2020 Filing 202 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by Hudson Insurance Company. (Harris, Joseph)
January 7, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Jackson Harris and John V. Burch on behalf of Hudson Insurance Company (Harris, Joseph) Modified on 1/8/2020 to edit text (jed).
October 7, 2019 Filing 200 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Harris, David)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa)
September 27, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jeffrey Michael Blank and Norma V. Garcia re #199 Order. (jpa)
September 16, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Steven D Grimberg. Judge Leigh Martin May no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-00880-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (tmf)
September 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Norma V. Garcia and Jeffrey Michael Blank re Case Assigned/Reassigned. (tmf)
August 2, 2019 Filing 198 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. David A. Harris replacing attorney Timothy Jerome Burson. (Harris, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Harris on behalf of Hudson Insurance Company (Harris, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 196 Leave of Absence of Timothy Burson July 5-15, 2019 (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 5/15/2019 to edit text and add requested dates(tmf).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for a dismissal of Defendants Accent Transport, Bluestar Services, LLC, EDE, Inc., Roland Davis Trucking, Inc., Redline Trucking, Inc., Global Business Intergroup, Road Kings Transport, LLC, Marques Transportation, and Greatwide Dallas & Mavis, LLC is once again DENIED as moot. Defendants Shippers Preferred Express, Inc.; Determined Transport; Starrett Service, Inc.; Gregory Transport 1 Inc.; RE Building; Skylight Express Logistics, Inc.; Hagwood Transportation Svcs., Inc.; Financial Carrier Services Inc.; TCI Business Capital, Inc. MP Express, Inc.; Triumph Business Capital, d/b/a/ Advance Business Capital LLC Boskurt Transport, Inc.; Marroquin Transport, Inc.; Trail Lines, Inc.; Ecapital Barnes Unlimited Transport; and Johnny Trans, LLC are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant dismissed from the case will not be bound by any judgment in this action disbursing the bond at issue. Plaintiff's request for partial disbursement of the Bond, docketed separately as a Motion to Pay Interpleading Defendants #194 , is DENIED without prejudice as premature. Plaintiff's request for entry of default and judgment against the 37 Defendants listed at Dkt. No. #193 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff must comply with the Court's instructions to obtain default against any Defendant whom Plaintiff contends has been properly served and has failed to answer or otherwise defend. Finally, Plaintiff's counsel is DIRECTED to carefully read both this Order as well as all of the Court's prior orders pertaining to service issues to avoid repeating mistakes the Court has previously addressed in detail. See Dkt. Nos. [113, 120, 190, 192]. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/1/2019. (btql)
April 30, 2019 Filing 194 MOTION (found within the #193 response) To pay Interpleading Defendants by Hudson Insurance Company. (tmf)
April 30, 2019 Filing 193 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #192 Filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 5/1/2019 to add document link and edit filer information (tmf).
April 30, 2019 Submission of #192 Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for a dismissal of Defendants Accent Transport, Bluestar Services, LLC, EDE, Inc., Roland Davis Trucking, Inc., Redline Trucking, Inc., Global Business Intergroup, Road Kings Transport, LLC, Marques Transportation, and Greatwide Dallas & Mavis, LLC is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's request for reduction of its bond payment by the cost to formally serve Defendants who did not waive service is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may make a more specific request for such costs by way of separate motion in accordance with the parameters outlined above. Additionally, within 21 days, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Court should find that Plaintiff properly served Defendants (see Order for defendants). The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned in 22 days. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/8/2019. (btql)
April 4, 2019 Filing 191 RESPONSE re #190 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, Report Ordered by Court filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Burson, Timothy)
April 4, 2019 Submission of #190 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #189 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Interpleader Defendants. Plaintiff's interpleader claims against each of the following Defendants are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE: (See Order for defendants). Additionally, within 30 days, Plaintiff is ORDERED to independently review the executed proofs of service already filed to ensure they reflect proper service under the applicable law. Any improperly served Defendant will not be subject to default and will instead be dismissed from the case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned in 30 days. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/4/2019. (btql)
February 28, 2019 Submission of #175 Telephone Conference to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql)
February 27, 2019 Filing 189 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve unserved interpleader bond claimant defendants re: #175 Telephone Conference,, by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Burson, Timothy)
December 26, 2018 Filing 187 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Greatwide Dallas & Mavis, LLC. (Burson, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 Filing 186 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Marques Transportation. (Burson, Timothy)
December 21, 2018 Filing 188 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Skyline Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 11, 2018 Filing 185 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Road Kings Transport LLC. (Burson, Timothy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 184 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Global Business Intergroup. (Burson, Timothy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 183 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. 18 Speed Trucking served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 182 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Ecapital - Barnes Unlimited Transport served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 181 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Skyline Express, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 180 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Trail Lines, Inc. served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 179 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Johnny Trans LLC served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 178 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Redline Trucking, Inc.. (Burson, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 177 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Route 66 Logistics Inc. served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 176 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Road Kings Transport and Logistics, LLC served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 12/11/2018 to correct party name (btql).
November 28, 2018 Filing 175 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Telephone Conference held on 11/28/2018. A Telephone Conference was held to discuss Plaintiff's lack of service upon Defendants. Plaintiff requested an additional 90 days to complete service on Defendants. The Court granted Plaintiff's request and will allow Plaintiff through and including Tuesday, February 26, 2019 to complete service. The Court will be reluctant to grant any further requests for an extension to serve Defendants without extremely good cause shown. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a status report on Friday, December 28, 2018 and Monday, January 28, 2019 regarding its progress as to serving Defendants. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(rlb)
November 27, 2018 Filing 174 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Unity Trans Inc.. (Burson, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 173 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Trans Recovery - DH Transportation. (Burson, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 172 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Roland Davis Trucking, Inc.. (Burson, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 171 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to EDE, Inc.. (Burson, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 170 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Bluestar Services, LLC. (Burson, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 169 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Accent Transport. (Burson, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 168 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Skylight Express Logistics, Inc. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 167 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Marroquin Transport, Inc. served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 166 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Credit Express Inc.- Route 66 Auto Shippers served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 165 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. XPO Logistics served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 164 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Triumph Business Capital served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 163 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. TCI Business Capital, Inc. - MP Express, Inc. served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 162 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Sunone Logistics, LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 161 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Shaw Transport & Hauling, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 160 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Roadrunner Transportation Services served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 159 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. RE Building served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 158 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Hagwood Transportation Svcs, Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 157 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Gregory Transport 1 Inc. served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 156 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Gella Star Transport, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 155 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. DLS Motor- Transport, LLC served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 154 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. CSX Intermodal Terminal, Inc. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 153 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. CD Consortium- Accent Transportation served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 152 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Starrett Service, Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 151 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Shippers Preferred Express, Inc. served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 150 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. CW Trucking served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 149 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Superior Power Specialist, LLC.(Burson, Timothy) Text modified on 11/27/2018 (btql).
November 26, 2018 Filing 148 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. MVP Logistics served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 147 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. M & K Logistics served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 146 Return of Service Unexecuted by Hudson Insurance Company as to Crossroads Logistics & Transport.(Burson, Timothy) Text modified on 11/27/2018 (btql).
November 19, 2018 Filing 145 ANSWER/CLAIM to #13 Amended Complaint by F.E.T. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 16, 2018 Filing 144 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. F.E.T. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 143 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Orange Commerical Credit - Delta Express, Inc. served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 142 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Quick Carrier, LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 141 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Interstate Capital - Randall Stubbs Trucking served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 140 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Interstate Capital - Kaptan, LLC served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 139 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Interstate Capital - J Hughes Hot Shot Transporation served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 138 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. TBS Logistics, LLC - SNM Logistic served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Filing 137 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Sunbelt Finance, LLC - Dreamer Logistics served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Filing 136 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Roadstar Transport, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Filing 135 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Financial Carrier Services, Inc.- ESCO Transportation served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Filing 134 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Determined Transport served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Filing 133 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. TBS Logistics, LLC - Goody Boy Hauling served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018.(Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Filing 132 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Shippers Preferred Express, Inc. served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Filing 131 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Landstar Global Logistics served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (btql).
November 13, 2018 Submission of #120 Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql)
November 9, 2018 Filing 130 ANSWER/CLAIM to #13 Amended Complaint by Boskurt Transport. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 8, 2018 Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process , as to Vero Business Capital - AM Baker. (Burson, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 128 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process , as to Comdata. (Burson, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process , as to CW Trucking. (Burson, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process , as to 918 Transport, LLC. (Burson, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process , as to Xpress Transportation, LLC. (Burson, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process , as to S&S Trucking. (Burson, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process , as to Roger Henson Trucking, LLC. (Burson, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process, as to Vero Business Capital - DH Transportation, Inc. (Burson, Timothy) Text modified on 11/6/2018 (btql).
November 2, 2018 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process, as to Titan Transport, LLC. (Burson, Timothy) Text modified on 11/6/2018 (btql).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #119 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendant Bond Claimants. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve the following Defendants or otherwise provide proof to the Court that each has waived service: (see Order for Defendants). The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned in 30 days. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter default against Defendants (see Order for Defendants). Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/11/2018. (btql)
October 11, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorneys Jeffrey Michael Blank and Norma V. Garcia re #120 Order. (btql)
October 11, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Default as to 918 Transport LLC, CMZ Hotshots Services, CW Trucking, ComData, Match Factors - Privateer Solutions, Porter Trucking, Powell Transportation Co., Inc., Roger Henson Trucking, LLC, Taylorsville Freight Service, LLC, Titan Transport, LLC, Vero Business Capital - A M Baker Trucking, Vero Business Capital - DH Transportation, Inc., Wallace Factoring - Winston Trans, XPress Transportations, LLC (btql)
October 10, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION for Extension of Time Serve Interpleader Defendants re: #116 Order to Show Cause by Hudson Insurance Company. (Burson, Timothy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Service and Request for Default by Hudson Insurance Company re #116 Order to Show Cause,, (Burson, Timothy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE Of Filing Client Certificate to Withdrawal of Counsel by Hudson Insurance Company (Roberts, David)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: Within 14 days of this Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file proofs of service demonstrating compliance with the Court's July 13, 2018 Order or to SHOW CAUSE why its interpleader claim against those 90 un-served Defendants should not be dismissed for lack of service of process. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). If Plaintiff wishes to avoid dismissal, it should file proofs or waivers of service that make clear that Rule 4(h) has been satisfied as to all 90 of these Defendants. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/24/18. (hfm)
September 24, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorneys Jeffrey Michael Blank and Norma V. Garcia re #116 Order. (hfm)
September 12, 2018 Submission of #113 Order, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm)
August 10, 2018 Filing 115 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by QuickPay Funding - ASL Transport & Service.(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 17, 2018 Filing 114 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. CMZ Hotshots Services waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING in part Plaintiff's Affidavit for Rule 55(a) Entry of Default and Other Relief #111 . Within 60 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve the Defendants listed in Dkt. No. [111-2] as well as the additional unserved Defendants listed above. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned in 60 days. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to enter default against the above-listed Defendants. Additionally, the Clerk is ORDERED to accept from Plaintiff Hudson Insurance Company funds in the amount of $75,000.00, plus applicable interest, if any, and receive them into the registry of this Court. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/13/2018. c:Financial Office(btql)
July 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Default as to AGA Express, LLC, Alpine Express, LLC, Altpro, Americars Transportation, Inc., Apex Capital Corp.- Gomez Trucking, Apex Capital Corp.- Lyon Express, Atlantic Coast Carriers, Inc., BAH Express Inc.- Vessell, BAM Capital-Nile Express, LLC, BQT, Inc., Baylor Trucking, Birkey Trucking, CJM Financial- Hamilton Haulers, CKR Transport, LTD, Capital Energy Solutions, Crestmark TPG, LLC- Jet Inc., Dakotaland Transportation Inc., Delux Transport, Eagle Capital- D&D Rockstar Trucking, FANS Transportation, First Line Funding - Bricker Transport, First Line Funding - Grace Transport, Firstline Funding - Nash, Firstline Funding - Velocity by Grace, Fleetone Factoring - Hermes NVC, Fleetone Factoring - Ocean Star Transportation, LLC, Freight Factoring Spec. - Bataille Hauling Svcs, Global Expedited, Inc., Global Trucking, LLC, J. Line, Inc, JY Transportation, Inc., Jagim Transportation, Inc., KATSS & S, LLC, Lanita Specialized, LLC, Latul Transporation, LLC, Liberty Transit, Loper Trucking, Mid Continent Van Service, Inc., Mike Collins Trucking, Nationwide Express, Inc., Nationwide Transport Finance- G&G Specialized Carriers, Oak Hill Capital - PEI, Panther Trucking, Jenel Leodor Popescu, Priority 1, Inc., Probilling & Funding Service - J&P Trucking, Inc., Proserv Logistics, LLC, R B Humphreys, Inc., R&R Express, Inc., Redline Trucking, Inc., Roadstar Transport, Inc., S&S Trucking, Schibi Transportation, LLC, Smart Transport, Inc, Springbrook Express, LLC, Sunbelt Finance, LLC - Dreamer Logistics, Super Dan Trucking, LLC, TAFS, Inc. - KK's Trucking, TAFS, Inc. - Liberty Freight Transport, TAFS, Inc. - Moneypenny Trucking, TAFS, Inc. - William Burke, Tex-Mex Transport, Titan Express, LLC, Total Logistics, Trans-Lease Mid Continent Van, Transport US, Trucker Path, Inc., Tryon Trucking, Inc., Wallace Factoring - Fitts Trucking, Wallace Factoring - Quad L Transport, Wallace Factoring - Southern Armour, Wallace Factoring, LLC - Eight Transportation, We Haul, West Trans Auto, Inc., Worthing Transportation Co., LLC, ZG Logistics (btql)
July 11, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 16-01 as to Timothy Jerome Burson re #111 Affidavit. (btql)
July 9, 2018 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT for Rule 55(a) Entry of Default and Other Relief by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Returned Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Exhibit B- Not Been Served, #3 Exhibit C- Served With No Answer, #4 Envelope)(btql)
June 28, 2018 Filing 110 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Roadstar Transport, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 109 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Burson, Timothy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 108 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Fleetone Factoring - Ocean Star Transportation, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 107 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Fleetone Factoring - Hermes NVC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 25, 2018 Filing 106 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Titan Express, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 18, 2018 Filing 105 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Schibi Transportation, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 18, 2018 Filing 104 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. QuickPay Funding - ASL Transport & Service waiver mailed on 6/12/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 6/19/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
June 15, 2018 Filing 103 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Powell Transportation Co., Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 12, 2018 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Freight Factoring Spec. - Bataille Hauling Svcs waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Redline Trucking, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. CKR Transport, LTD waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Crestmark TPG, LLC- Jet Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Global Trucking, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. JY Transportation, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Panther Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Dakotaland Transportation Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 94 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Global Expedited, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 11, 2018 Filing 93 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Atlantic Coast Carriers, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 6, 2018 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Jenel Leodor Popescu waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Super Dan Trucking, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 29, 2018 Filing 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Baylor Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 29, 2018 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Delux Transport waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 29, 2018 Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Altpro waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 25, 2018 Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. ZG Logistics waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 21, 2018 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. FANS Transportation waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to execute Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal #63 under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and dismiss without prejudice Defendants Graham Lewis, Inc., Randall Johnson, and Stephanie Johnson. In addition, because Defendants Stephanie and Randall Johnson were technically dismissed when Plaintiff filed his Notice of Dismissal and before Defendants filed their Suggestions of Bankruptcy, Defendants' Suggestions of Bankruptcy [80-82] are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/18/2018. (btql)
May 21, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Graham Lewis, Inc., Randall Johnson, and Stephanie Johnson pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i) (btql)
May 16, 2018 Submission of #13 Amended Complaint, #63 MOTION to Sever Count II and Drop Principal and Indemnitors or Dismiss without Prejudice to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql)
May 15, 2018 Filing 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. West Trans Auto, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 14, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 16-01 as to David E. Galler re #82 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. (btql)
May 11, 2018 Filing 82 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Randall Johnson, Stephanie Johnson. (btql)
May 9, 2018 Filing 81 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Randall Johnson and by Stephanie Johnson. (Forman, Jordan)
May 9, 2018 Filing 80 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Stephanie Johnson and by Randall Johnson. (Forman, Jordan)
May 9, 2018 Filing 79 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint and Claim to Funds by Arcbest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoices)(Hays, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 8, 2018 Filing 77 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Probilling & Funding Service - J&P Trucking, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 7, 2018 Filing 78 ANSWER/CLAIM to #13 Amended Complaint by Fox Transport Co. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 7, 2018 Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Jagim Transportation, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Trucker Path, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Alpine Express, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. TAFS, Inc. - KK's Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. TAFS, Inc. - Liberty Freight Transport waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. TAFS, Inc. - Moneypenny Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. TAFS, Inc. - William Burke waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 2, 2018 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Arcbest waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
May 1, 2018 Filing 69 ANSWER/CLAIM to #13 Amended Complaint by Cast Transportation. Discovery ends on 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 30, 2018 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Loper Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 30, 2018 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Cast Transportation waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 30, 2018 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. R&R Express, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 30, 2018 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. BAH Express Inc.- Vessell waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 27, 2018 Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.i by Hudson Insurance Company within the #63 Notice. (aaq)
April 27, 2018 Filing 63 Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice of Graham Lewis, Inc., Randall Johnson and Stephanie Johnson, or in the alternative, MOTION to Sever Count II and Drop Principal and Indemnitors or Dismiss without Prejudice with Brief In Support by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burson, Timothy) Modified on 5/21/2018 to edit text (btql).
April 27, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Roberts on behalf of Hudson Insurance Company (Roberts, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Tryon Trucking, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 26, 2018 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Total Logistics waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 26, 2018 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Birkey Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 25, 2018 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Proserv Logistics, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 24, 2018 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Worthing Transportation Co., LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 24, 2018 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. We Haul waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 24, 2018 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Porter Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 24, 2018 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Latul Transporation, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 24, 2018 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Capital Energy Solutions waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 23, 2018 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Sunbelt Finance, LLC - Dreamer Logistics waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/24/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 23, 2018 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Fox Transport Co. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/24/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 20, 2018 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Nationwide Express, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 20, 2018 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. KATSS & S, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 20, 2018 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. CJM Financial- Hamilton Haulers waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 20, 2018 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Wallace Factoring - Winston Trans waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 20, 2018 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Wallace Factoring - Southern Armour waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 20, 2018 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Wallace Factoring - Quad L Transport waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 20, 2018 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Wallace Factoring - Fitts Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 20, 2018 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Wallace Factoring, LLC - Eight Transportation waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 19, 2018 Filing 42 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/7/18-5/11/18, 5/22/18, 5/23/18- 6/3/18, by Alex Benjamin Kaufman. (Kaufman, Alex) Modified on 4/20/2018 to edit text(btql).
April 18, 2018 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. S&S Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 18, 2018 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. BAM Capital-Nile Express, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 17, 2018 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Liberty Transit waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 17, 2018 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Trans-Lease Mid Continent Van waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Mid Continent Van Service, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Lanita Specialized, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Firstline Funding - Velocity by Grace waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Firstline Funding - Nash waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. First Line Funding - Bricker Transport waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. J. Line, Inc waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Oak Hill Capital - PEI waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Eagle Capital- D&D Rockstar Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. First Line Funding - Grace Transport waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. AGA Express, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 16, 2018 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Americars Transportation, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 16, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Springbrook Express, LLC waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 16, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. BQT, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 16, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Apex Capital Corp.- Gomez Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 16, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Apex Capital Corp.- Lyon Express waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 16, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Tex-Mex Transport waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 16, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. R B Humphreys, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 16, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Transport US waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 13, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Smart Transport, Inc waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/16/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 13, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Nationwide Transport Finance- G&G Specialized Carriers waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/16/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 13, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Mike Collins Trucking waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/16/2018 to correct waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 Fourth Amended Complaint. Randall Johnson and Stephanie Johnson Answer due 5/7/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/13/2018. (btql)
April 12, 2018 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Randall Johnson, Stephanie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Alex)
April 12, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Priority 1, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/13/2018 to edit waiver mailed and answer due date (btql).
April 5, 2018 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Stephanie Johnson served on 3/24/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
April 5, 2018 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Randall Johnson served on 3/24/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (Burson, Timothy) Modified on 4/5/2018 to correct service and answer due date (btql).
April 5, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Hudson Insurance Company. Graham Lewis served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (Burson, Timothy)
March 22, 2018 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Randall Johnson, Stephanie Johnson, Graham Lewis. (btql)
March 21, 2018 Filing 13 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hudson Insurance Company.(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 21, 2018 Filing 8 (DOCUMENT FILED INCORRECTLY; REFILE AT DOC. #13 AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS) Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT asserting Count II for Indemnity against Graham Lewis, Inc dba 48 Express, Johnson Randall, Johnson Stephanie, filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Burson, Timothy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/5/2018 to reflect that amended complaint was filed incorrectly, refile to link to all defendants (btql).
March 21, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Hudson Insurance Company to Lewis Graham (Burson, Timothy)
March 12, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued, #2 Electronic Summons Issued, #3 Electronic Summons Issued, #4 Electronic Summons Issued, #5 Electronic Summons Issued, #6 Electronic Summons Issued, #7 Electronic Summons Issued, #8 Electronic Summons Issued, #9 Electronic Summons Issued, #10 Electronic Summons Issued, #11 Electronic Summons Issued)(btql)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/8/2018. (btql)
March 7, 2018 Filing 4 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants, filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Burson, Timothy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 5, 2018 Filing 3 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants, filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment - A, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Burson, Timothy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 2, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants, filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Burson, Timothy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7714196.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Incorrect Proposed Summons)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Insurance Company v. 18 Speed Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BD&J Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans-Lease Mid Continent Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Recovery - DH Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birkey Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid Continent Van Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R B Humphreys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Factoring - Southern Armour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Transport 1 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Finance, LLC - Dreamer Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatwide Dallas & Mavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Consortium- Accent Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority 1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vero Business Capital - DH Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanita Specialized, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R2 Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basingen Group- 1A Intermodal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadstar Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZG Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCI Business Capital, Inc. - MP Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Trans Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accent Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cast Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Line Funding - Grace Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPress Transportations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & K Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Henson Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKR Transport, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuickPay Funding - ASL Transport & Service
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Blank
Represented By: Norma V. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - Salas Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetone Factoring - Ocean Star Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstline Funding - Velocity by Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS, Inc. - William Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - Liberty Transit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATSS & S, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marroquin Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probilling & Funding Service - J&P Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Business Credit - Ironhorse Carriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gella Star Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Logistics, LLC - Goody Boy Hauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Transport Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Route 66 Logistics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Global Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecapital - Barnes Unlimited Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tryon Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylight Express Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titi, Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Determined Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetone Factoring - Hermes NVC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS, Inc. - Liberty Freight Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Energy Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tex-Mex Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unity Trans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstline Funding - Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trail Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Factoring - Fitts Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthing Transportation Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match Factors - Privateer Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Capital - Randall Stubbs Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trucker Path, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ComData
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vero Business Capital - A M Baker Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJM Financial- Hamilton Haulers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - Fast Lane Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestar Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Dan Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Transport Finance- G&G Specialized Carriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shippers Preferred Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Transport & Hauling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Line, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 Speed Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panther Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 918 Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starrett Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Expedited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springbrook Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marques Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - Trans Lines.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Carrier, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.E.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikes Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&W Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loper Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Factoring, LLC - Eight Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CW Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delux Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Haul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Hill Capital - PEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Capital - Kaptan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Express Inc.- Route 66 Auto Shippers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Transport, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestmark TPG, LLC- Jet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redline Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Logistics, LLC - SNM Logistic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCC Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLS Official Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLS Motor- Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Capital Corp.- Lyon Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS, Inc. - KK's Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - SS Carrier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell Transportation Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagwood Transportation Svcs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freight Factoring Spec. - Bataille Hauling Svcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boskurt Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Capital Corp.- Gomez Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Kings Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FANS Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road King Transport and Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenel Leodor Popescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMZ Hotshots Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAG Trans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcbest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Trans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E.T. of Searcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDE, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Intermodal Terminal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proserv Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunone Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS, Inc. - Moneypenny Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Carrier Services, Inc.- ESCO Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Business Intergroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakotaland Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - UA Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JY Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - Run Direct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Line Funding - Bricker Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Collins Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAP Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Commerical Credit - Delta Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Business Credit - 1st Time Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAM Capital-Nile Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Power Specialist, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Factoring - Quad L Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Global Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latul Transporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schibi Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ithrive - Longhorn Laramie Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Capital - J Hughes Hot Shot Transporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - Fox C Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSG Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americars Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Factoring - Winston Trans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagim Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Capital- D&D Rockstar Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BQT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altpro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial - La Roma Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylorsville Freight Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Davis Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Business Capital doing business as Advance Business Capital, LLC- Boskurt Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenel Leodor Popescu doing business as O D Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcbest doing business as Panther Premium Log
Represented By: James William Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGA Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AST Inc. of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Coast Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAH Express Inc.- Vessell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Logistics & Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Johnson
Represented By: David E. Galler
Represented By: Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Johnson
Represented By: David E. Galler
Represented By: Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Lewis, Inc. doing business as 48 Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: John V. Burch
Represented By: Timothy Jerome Burson
Represented By: David A. Harris
Represented By: David A. Roberts
Represented By: Joseph Jackson Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?