MModal Services Ltd. v. Nuance Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: MModal Services Ltd.
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc.
Counter Defendant: MModal, LLC, MModal IP LLC, MModal, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, Inc. and Multimodal Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00901
Filed: February 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Gwinnett
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
2 Judge: William M Ray
3 Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE by Nuance Communications, Inc. of IPR Review Status (Joint Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stockwell, Mitchell)
June 21, 2019 Filing 131 ANSWER to #43 Counterclaim (Redacted) by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC.(Callahan, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting MModal's #129 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file MModal's Answer to Nuance Communications, Inc.'s Counterclaim under seal. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 6/19/19. (rlb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #128 Notice of Filing, by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 128 SEALED MModal Services Ltd., et al.'s Answer to Nuance Communications, Inc.'s Counterclaim #43 by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC re #43 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, (Callahan, David) Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove provisional text (rlb).
June 12, 2019 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on May 6, 2019, before Judge William M. Ray, II. Court Reporter Wynette C. Blathers. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (wxb)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ordered that the period in which MModal may file its answer, motion, or other response to the Nuances First Counterclaim is extended through and including June 18, 2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 5/23/19. (rlb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Nuance Communications, Inc.'s First Counterclaim by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Inter Partes Review Status re Order #122 by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision to Institute IPR2019-00306, #2 Exhibit B - Decision to Institute IPR2019-00210, #3 Exhibit C - Nuance's Disclosure of Asserted Claims)(Callahan, David) Modified on 5/23/2019 to edit text (rlb).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims: The Court DENIES in part and GRANTS in part Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #21 . Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 5/13/19. (rlb) Modified on 5/13/2019 to edit text (rlb).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #118 Motion to Stay: For good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that discovery in this case is stayed until this Court is apprised of whether, and to what extent, the United States Patent Office will proceed with said petitions. The parties should promptly notify this Court each time that the United States Patent Office has reached a decision on any of the subject patents. Further, either party may move to lift this stay when the United States Patent Office has concluded its work and/or when the District Court of Delaware allows the parties to move forward on the litigation which is pending there. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 5/13/19. (rlb)
May 9, 2019 Submission of #118 MOTION to Stay in View of Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings, to District Judge William M Ray II. (rlb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 121 REPLY BRIEF re #118 MOTION to Stay in View of Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings filed by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Stephen Bosco, #2 Exhibit I - Law 360 Article)(Pannell, Charles)
May 6, 2019 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Stay in View of Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings filed by MModal Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Callahan, #2 Exhibit 1 - 3/6/19 letter from MModal counsel to Nuance Counsel, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order from MiMedx Grp., Inc. v. Liventa Bioscience, Inc., No. 1:14-CV-1178-MHC, Dkt. No. 122 (N.D. Ga. Apr. 6, 2015), #4 Exhibit 3 - Trial and Appeal Board's Standard Operating Procedure 1 (Revision 15), #5 Exhibit 4 - Order from Cooper Lighting, LLC v. Cordelia Lighting, Inc., No. 1:16-CV-2669-MHC, Dkt. No. 85 (N.D. Ga. Nov. 13, 2017))(Callahan, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M Ray, II: Telephone Conference held on 5/6/2019 regarding a discovery dispute and Defendant's request to stay the case pending the patent office's review of the IPR petitions. Plaintiff's response in opposition is due today, and Defendant's reply brief to the motion to stay is due on Wednesday. The Court will issue a ruling on Friday. The Court encourages the parties to consent to hiring a Special Master. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(jkl)
May 1, 2019 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE set for 5/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M Ray II. (jkl)
April 22, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION to Stay in View of Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Stephen Bosco, #3 Exhibit A - DE Hearing Transcript, #4 Exhibit B - Opposition to Motion to Stay, #5 Exhibit C - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, #6 Exhibit D - PTAB Trial Stats March 2019, #7 Exhibit E - Nuance DMO Press Release, #8 Exhibit F - Discovery Dispute Transcript, #9 Exhibit G - March 4 Letter, #10 Exhibit H - March 8 Letter, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles)
April 10, 2019 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's Notice of Document and Deposition Subpoenas Directed to Wolf Greenfield & Sacks and Robert Fleming by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
March 18, 2019 Clerks Notation re #116 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
March 15, 2019 Filing 116 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC. (Callahan, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 115 RESPONSE re #112 Notice (Other), Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
March 4, 2019 Filing 114 RESPONSE re #109 Claim Construction Brief filed by MModal Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Dr. David V. Anderson)(Callahan, David)
March 4, 2019 Filing 113 RESPONSE re #110 Claim Construction Brief filed by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Polish Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sears Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - NUANCE_NDGA_0002858 - 2867)(Pannell, Charles)
March 4, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Counterclaim Defendants' #61 Motion to Dismiss by MModal Services Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Univesity of Florida Research Foundation v. GE Co.)(Hutton, Alison) Modified on 3/4/2019 to edit text (bnp).
February 11, 2019 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT of the Motions Hearing Proceedings held on February 4, 2019, before Judge William M. Ray, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number 404-215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
February 11, 2019 Filing 110 Claim Construction Brief filed by MModal Services Ltd... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 9,208,786, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,781,829, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 7,716,040, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 8,412,524, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 8,738,403, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 9,818,398, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Dr. David Anderson, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Dr. Jordan Cohen, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Nathaniel Polish, Ph.D, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt from the Declaration of Dr. Andrew Sears, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt from the Oxford Dictionary of English (3d ed. 2010) for the definition of best practice, #12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt from File History of 040 Patent, Oct. 9, 2009 Response to Office Action, #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt from File History of 040 Patent, Apr. 10, 2009 Response to Final Action, #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts from the February 4, 2019 Motion Hearing, #15 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Patent No. 7,493,253, #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpt from File History of 403 Patent, Dec. 19, 2012 Response after Final Action, #17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpt from File History of 403 Patent, Feb. 11, 2013 Request for Continued Examination, #18 Exhibit 18 - Excerpt from File History of 403 Patent, June 5, 2013 Request for Reconsideration)(Callahan, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 109 Claim Construction Brief filed by Nuance Communications, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 8,738,403, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dragon Medical Advisor Datasheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - US Patent 9,818,398, #4 Exhibit 4 - US Patent 9,208,786, #5 Exhibit 5 - Polish Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - MPEP 2100, #7 Exhibit 7 - Anderson Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cohen Deposition Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 9 - US Patent 8,781,829, #10 Exhibit 10 - US Patent 7,716,040, #11 Exhibit 11 - Microsoft Computer Dictionary, #12 Exhibit 12 - Illustrated Dictionary of Electronics, #13 Exhibit 13 - US Patent 8,412,524, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6-11-09 Non Final Rejection, #15 Exhibit 15 - US Patent 6,915,254, #16 Exhibit 16 - 10-09-09 Response to Office Action, #17 Exhibit 17 - 1-21-10 Notice of Allowance, #18 Exhibit 18 - US Patent 7,493,253)(Pannell, Charles)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is ORDERED that both parties shall have (1) up to and including February 11, 2019, to file their opening claim construction briefs, and (2) up to forty pages for each of their Opening Claim Construction Briefs. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/6/2019. (rlb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 107 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Opening Claim Construction Briefs and MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by MModal Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) . Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 2/5/2019 (bnp).
February 4, 2019 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2019 re #61 MOTION TO DISMISS. Counterclaim Defendants argued for their Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Counterclaim Plaintiff responded. The Court took a 15 minute recess. Counterclaim Defendants replied to the Counterclaim Plaintiff's argument. The Court directed parties to each submit a proposed draft order by the end of the day on 2/25/2019. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(jpa)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 2/4/19 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 1/25/19. (jpa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 104 Joint Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by MModal Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M Ray II. (jkl)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER - Having considered the Parties' Joint Motion and Stipulation for Extension of Claim Construction Discovery Deadline, it is hereby ordered that the claim construction discovery period is extended through and including January 17, 2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 1/10/2019. (tcc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Claim Construction Discovery by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles)
December 26, 2018 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on December 17, 2018, before Judge William M. Ray, II. Court Reporter Wynette C. Blathers, Telephone number (404) 215-1547. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (wxb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE Of Filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by MModal Services Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Parties Proposed Claim Constructions and Supporting Evidence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summary of Testimony by Dr. David V. Anderson, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Testimony by Dr. Jordan R. Cohen, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration by Nathaniel Polish, Ph.D.)(Callahan, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M Ray, II: Discovery Hearing held on 12/17/2018. Parties presented oral argument on a discovery dispute. The Court grants permission for Plaintiff to file a motion to compel, if Plaintiff deems necessary. If and when a motion to compel is filed, the parties should contact Ms. Lee to schedule a hearing to occur after the motion is fully briefed. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(ddm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's Amended Preliminary Claim Construction Disclosure Per LPR 6.2 by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge William M Ray II. (jkl)
December 4, 2018 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
December 4, 2018 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's 2nd Supplemental Responses & Objections to Nuance's 1st Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1,4,6,8); 1st Supplemental Responses & Objections to Nuance's 3rd Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 14,15,17) and MModal's Preliminary Claim Construction Disclosure Per LPR 6.2 by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
November 20, 2018 Filing 95 Case Status Notice by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC - Case Status (Callahan, David) Modified on 11/20/2018 to edit docket entry (ddm).
November 16, 2018 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Nuance's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 13) by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
November 16, 2018 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Nuance's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 2, 3, 7) by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
October 30, 2018 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
October 30, 2018 Submission of #61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge William M Ray II. (rjs)
October 30, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge William M Ray, II. Judge Steve C. Jones no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-901-WMR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rjs)
October 26, 2018 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's Responses and Objections to Nuance's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 18) by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
October 15, 2018 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's Disclsoure of Asserted Claims to Nuance by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
October 9, 2018 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
October 1, 2018 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
September 24, 2018 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
September 21, 2018 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's Responses & Objections to Nuance's Third Set of Interrogatories by MModal Services Ltd..(Hutton, Alison)
September 18, 2018 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #81 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Sudip Kundu. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/17/2018. (rjs)
September 17, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Sudip Kundu re #83 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
September 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #81 APPLICATION for Admission of Sudip Kundu Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8133238). Attorney Sudip Kundu added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
September 12, 2018 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's Third Set of Interrogatories to Nuance (Nos. 14-17) by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
September 7, 2018 Filing 81 APPLICATION for Admission of Sudip Kundu Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8133238)by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ON CASE NARROWING: granting #77 Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims and Prior Art References. (see Order for specifics) Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/7/2018. (rjs)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER denying as moot #78 Motion for Order on Case Narrowing per Order #80 granting #77 . Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/7/2018. (pdw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
August 30, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION for Order on Claim Narrowing by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order MModal's Proposed Order on Claim Narrowing)(Hutton, Alison)
August 30, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims and Prior Art References by Nuance Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Pannell, Charles) Modified on 8/31/2018 to edit text (rjs).
August 30, 2018 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
August 24, 2018 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference Hearing Proceedings held on August 22, 2018, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber David A. Ritchie, Telephone number 404-215-1516. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
August 22, 2018 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2018 in re: discovery dispute regarding constructionclaims. Parties to file briefs next Thursday, 8/30, with ruling to follow. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
August 14, 2018 Submission of #61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
August 10, 2018 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
August 9, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re #61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC. (O'Donohue, Stephen)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #66 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Stephen Bosco. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/8/2018. (rjs)
August 8, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Stephen Bosco re #71 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
August 3, 2018 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - MModal's Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of RPDs by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
August 1, 2018 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - MModal's Responses to Nuance's Second RPDs; MModal's Response to Nuance's Disclosure of Infringement Contentions; MModal's Disclosure of Invalidity Contentions; MModal's Responses to Nuance's Third RPDs by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
July 30, 2018 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
July 26, 2018 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Excerpt from '403 Patent File History, #2 Ex. B - Excerpt from '938 Patent File History)(Pannell, Charles)
July 25, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #66 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Bosco Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8025553). Attorney Stephen Bosco added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
July 20, 2018 Filing 66 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Bosco Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8025553)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, through and including July 26, 2018, to respond to #61 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/3/18. (ddm)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #59 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Gabriel K. Bell. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/3/18. (ddm)
July 3, 2018 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles)
July 3, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Gabriel K. Bell re #64 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (ddm)
June 29, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #59 APPLICATION for Admission of Gabriel K. Bell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7975073). Attorney Gabriel K. Bell added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd., MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
June 28, 2018 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
June 28, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., Multimodal Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Hutton, Alison)
June 27, 2018 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
June 27, 2018 Filing 59 APPLICATION for Admission of Gabriel K. Bell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7975073)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ordered that the period in which the parties may serve their Infringement Contentions is extended through and including June 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/27/2018. (rjs)
June 27, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for One-Day Extension of LPR 4.1 Deadline by Nuance Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles) Modified on 6/27/2018 to change event type to MOTION (rjs).
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #47 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Close of fact discovery is January 28, 2019. (see attachment for details) Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rjs)
June 25, 2018 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/14/2018. (rjs)
June 13, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE Of Filing by MModal Services Ltd. - Joint Proposed Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") (Hutton, Alison)
June 13, 2018 Filing 52 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. (Hutton, Alison)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ordered that the period in which MModal may file its answer, motion, or other response to the Counterclaims is extended through and including June 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/1/2018. (rjs)
June 1, 2018 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For MModal to Respond to Nuance's Counterclaims re: #43 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by MModal Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hutton, Alison)
June 1, 2018 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MModal's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10), First Set of RPDs (Nos. 1-119) and its Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by MModal Services Ltd..(Snedeker, Alice)
June 1, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: MModal IP LLC, MModal Services Ltd., MModal, Inc., MModal, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc. and Multimodal Technologies, LLC answers due 6/28/2018. (rjs)
May 31, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
May 29, 2018 Filing 47 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by MModal Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed case schedule, #2 Exhibit B - ESI order from D. Del., #3 Exhibit C - Stipulated protective order from D. Del.)(Snedeker, Alice)
May 29, 2018 Filing 46 Initial Disclosures by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Pannell, Charles)
May 23, 2018 Filing 45 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rjs)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER: The Clerk having submitted Defendant Nuance Communication, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaim (Doc. No. #43 ) to the Court for party review, the Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk to amend the case-style to add the following entities as counter-defendants: Multimodal Technologies LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., MModal IP LLC, MModal, Inc., and MModal, LLC. Ruled on by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/22/2018 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
May 22, 2018 Submission of #43 Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim to District Judge Steve C. Jones for party review. (rjs)
May 17, 2018 Filing 44 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Pannell, Charles)
May 17, 2018 Filing 43 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against MModal Services Ltd., Multimodal Technologies, LLC, Multimodal Technologies, Inc., MModal IP LLC, MModal, Inc. and MModal, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 8,738,403, #2 Exhibit B - US 9,818,398)(Pannell, Charles) Modified on 5/22/2018 (rjs).
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Surendra K. Ravula. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/14/2018. (rjs)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Ilya Svetlov. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/14/2018. (rjs)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Rene Elise Mai. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/14/2018. (rjs)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Megan H. Wantland. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/14/2018. (rjs)
May 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Megan H. Wantland re #39 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
May 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Ilya Svetlov re #41 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
May 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Rene Elise Mai re #40 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
May 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Surendra K. Ravula re #42 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
May 11, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #38 APPLICATION for Admission of Surendra K. Ravula Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7846667). Attorney Surendra K. Ravula added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
May 7, 2018 RETURN of #37 APPLICATION for Admission of David Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7843664) to attorney for correction. (pmb)
May 3, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Rene Elise Mai Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7837760). Attorney Rene Elise Mai added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
May 3, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Ilya Svetlov Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7837767). Attorney Ilya Svetlov added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
May 1, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #32 APPLICATION for Admission of Megan H. Wantland Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7833700). Attorney Megan H. Wantland added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
April 30, 2018 Filing 38 APPLICATION for Admission of Surendra K. Ravula Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7846667)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
April 27, 2018 Filing 37 APPLICATION for Admission of David Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7843664)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
April 26, 2018 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Persons by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
April 26, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Nuance Communications, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/22/2019.(Pannell, Charles) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 25, 2018 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Admission of Ilya Svetlov Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7837767)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
April 25, 2018 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of Rene Elise Mai Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7837760)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
April 23, 2018 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Admission of Megan H. Wantland Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7833700)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Anish R Desai. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/23/2018. (rjs)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Holly K. Victorson. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/23/2018. (rjs)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Stephen D. O'Donohue. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/23/2018. (rjs)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner David J Lender. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/23/2018. (rjs)
April 23, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to David J Lender re #28 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
April 23, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Stephen D. O'Donohue re #29 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
April 23, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Holly K. Victorson re #30 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
April 23, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Anish R Desai re #31 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
April 19, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Anish R Desai Pro Hac Vice (per db). Attorney Anish Rohit Desai added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
April 18, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of David J Lender Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7780231). Attorney David J. Lender added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
April 18, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Holly K. Victorson Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7808075). Attorney Holly K. Victorson added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
April 18, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen D. O'Donohue Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7808027). Attorney Stephen D. O'Donohue added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
April 12, 2018 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Anish R Desai Pro Hac Vice by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
April 11, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Holly K. Victorson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7808075)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
April 11, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen D. O'Donohue Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7808027)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
April 11, 2018 RETURN of #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Anish R Desai Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7801195) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
April 9, 2018 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Anish R Desai Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7801195)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Michael R. Gottfried. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/5/2018. (rjs)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Christopher S. Kroon. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/5/2018. (rjs)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Anthony J. Fitzpatrick. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/5/2018. (rjs)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Kevin C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/5/2018. (rjs)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Doug Wayne McClellan. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/5/2018. (rjs)
April 5, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Michael R. Gottfried re #23 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
April 5, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Kevin C. Wheeler re #20 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
April 4, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Doug Wayne McClellan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7780263). Attorney Douglas W. McClellan added appearing on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (pmb)
April 4, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin C. Wheeler Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kevin C. Wheeler added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
April 4, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Fitzpatrick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781821). Attorney Anthony J. Fitzpatrick added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
April 4, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Gottfried Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781869). Attorney Michael R. Gottfried added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
April 4, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher S. Kroon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781855). Attorney Christopher S. Kroon added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
March 29, 2018 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Gottfried Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781869)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
March 29, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher S. Kroon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781855)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
March 29, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Fitzpatrick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781821)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
March 29, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin C. Wheeler Pro Hac Vice by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
March 29, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Doug Wayne McClellan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7780263)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
March 29, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of David J Lender Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7780231)by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Pannell, Charles)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner David K. Callahan. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 3/27/2018. (rjs)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ordered that the period in which Defendant may file its answer, motion, or other response to Complaint is extended through and including April 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 3/27/2018. (rjs)
March 27, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of David K. Callahan Pro Hac Vice (per db) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7762806). Attorney David K. Callahan added appearing on behalf of MModal Services Ltd. (pmb)
March 27, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to David K. Callahan re #12 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
March 26, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pannell, Charles)
March 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Gaines Stockwell on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (Stockwell, Mitchell)
March 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Adam Pannell, III on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (Pannell, Charles)
March 26, 2018 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin C. Wheeler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7762829) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
March 21, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin C. Wheeler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7762829)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
March 21, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of David K. Callahan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7762806)by MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
March 13, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by MModal Services Ltd.. Nuance Communications, Inc. served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018. (Hutton, Alison)
March 2, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by MModal Services Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent New MMI Holdings Inc. for MModal Services Ltd.. (Hutton, Alison)
March 1, 2018 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
February 28, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nuance Communications, Inc.. (eop)
February 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by MModal Services Ltd.; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7716802.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MModal Services Ltd. v. Nuance Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas W. McClellan
Represented By: Mitchell Gaines Stockwell
Represented By: Anish Rohit Desai
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Charles Adam Pannell, III
Represented By: Ilya Svetlov
Represented By: Megan H. Wantland
Represented By: Stephen Bosco
Represented By: Rene Elise Mai
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MModal Services Ltd.
Represented By: Louis Norwood Jameson
Represented By: Alison Haddock Hutton
Represented By: Alice E. Snedeker
Represented By: Christopher S. Kroon
Represented By: Holly K. Victorson
Represented By: Michael R. Gottfried
Represented By: Anthony J. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: David K. Callahan
Represented By: Kevin C. Wheeler
Represented By: Stephen D. O'Donohue
Represented By: Gabriel K. Bell
Represented By: Surendra K. Ravula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MModal, LLC
Represented By: Alison Haddock Hutton
Represented By: David K. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MModal IP LLC
Represented By: Alison Haddock Hutton
Represented By: David K. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MModal, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Haddock Hutton
Represented By: David K. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Multimodal Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Haddock Hutton
Represented By: David K. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Multimodal Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Alison Haddock Hutton
Represented By: David K. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?