Dua v. Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Monika Dua
Defendant: Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03358
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daugherty Systems, Inc..(Schwab, Abigail)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Monika Dua.(Kertscher, Douglas)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Monika Dua. (Kertscher, Douglas)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting attorney Andrew J. Martone's #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/7/2018. (bgt)
September 6, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Martone Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew J. Martone added appearing on behalf of Daugherty Systems, Inc. (pmb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Martone Pro Hac Vice by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Green, Shuli)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Willie Thomas McGarry. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/23/18. (jpa)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abigail Schwab. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/23/18. (jpa)
August 23, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Abigail Schwab re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa)
August 23, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Willie Thomas McGarry re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa)
August 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Abigail Schwab Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8082819). Attorney Shuli L. Green added appearing on behalf of Daugherty Systems, Inc. (jkm)
August 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Willie McGarry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8082783). Attorney Shuli L. Green added appearing on behalf of Daugherty Systems, Inc. (jkm)
August 23, 2018 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Martone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8082737) to attorney for correction re: address. (pmb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Monika Dua.(Kertscher, Douglas)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Abigail Schwab Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8082819)by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Green, Shuli)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Willie McGarry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8082783)by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Green, Shuli)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Martone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8082737)by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. (Green, Shuli)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Daugherty Systems, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/7/2019.(Green, Shuli) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Monika Dua. Daugherty Systems, Inc. served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018. (Kertscher, Douglas)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/16/18. (jpa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Daugherty Systems, Inc. (ddm)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Monika Dua. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8008596) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dua v. Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Dua
Represented By: Julie Anne Hoehn Burke
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daugherty Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Martone
Represented By: Willie Thomas McGarry
Represented By: Abigail B. Schwab
Represented By: Shuli L. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?