Riteway, LLC et al v. Stegas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Riteway, LLC and Riteway Crack Repair, LLC
Defendant: Stegas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03394
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmd)
September 13, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd)
September 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (cmd)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Riteway Crack Repair, LLC, Riteway, LLC (Kerenyi, Justin)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, through and including September 17, 2018, to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/10/18. (ddm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, through and including September 17, 2018, by Stegas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Riteway, LLC, Riteway Crack Repair, LLC. Stegas, Inc. served on 7/27/2018. (Kerenyi, Justin)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Arthur Kent on behalf of Stegas, Inc. (Kent, Daniel)
July 25, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Andrew Zappia as to Riteway Crack Repair, LLC regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (mlb)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Andrew Zappia. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/25/18. (mlb)
July 25, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Zappia Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8025394). Attorney Andrew Zappia added appearing on behalf of Riteway Crack Repair, LLC, Riteway, LLC (pmb)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Zappia Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8025394)by Riteway Crack Repair, LLC, Riteway, LLC. (Kerenyi, Justin)
July 18, 2018 Clerks Notation re #6 Leave of Absence. Attorney Justin M. Kerenyi is relieved from personally having to attend any proceedings or trials in this matter on the following dates: November 21-26, 2018 and December 21-January 2, 2018. This leave of absence will not affect the processing of this case including the scheduling of motions, hearings, trials or other events before this Court. (mlb)
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 21-26, 2018, December 21, 2018-January 2, 2019, by Justin M. Kerenyi. (Kerenyi, Justin)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bnw)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Riteway Crack Repair, LLC, Riteway, LLC. (bnw)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stegas, Inc. (bnw)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Riteway, LLC, Riteway Crack Repair, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8011803) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 16, 2018 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Riteway Crack Repair, LLC, Riteway, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riteway, LLC et al v. Stegas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riteway, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Kerenyi
Represented By: Andrew Zappia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riteway Crack Repair, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Kerenyi
Represented By: Andrew Zappia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stegas, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?