Gooch v. United States Department of Justice

Plaintiff: Milton Gooch, III
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2018cv03750
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Certificate of Compliance by United States Department of Justice.(Manship, Flora)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Compliance by United States Department of Justice. (Manship, Flora)
September 25, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re #5 Order. (jtj)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/25/2018. (jtj)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by United States Department of Justice. Discovery ends on 2/7/2019.(Manship, Flora) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Milton Gooch, III. United States Department of Justice served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (jtj)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, Office of the Inspector General, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (btql)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief filed by Milton Gooch, III. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100104980) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooch v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Gooch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Flora Manship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?