Turley et al v. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Turley and Lila Wolff
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03775
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Cobb
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Janet F King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Clerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons. READ and APPROVED by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (kt)
October 3, 2018 Clerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/2/2018 for plaintiff to respond to #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 10/2/2018. (adg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dana Turley, Lila Wolff. (Casurella, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Dana Turley, Lila Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casurella, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Clerks Notation re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement : reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
October 1, 2018 Clerks Notation re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. READ and APPROVED by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (kt)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Mary)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Limited for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Smith, Mary)
September 5, 2018 MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry R. Seegull; granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen Allie McGinley. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/5/18. (se)
August 29, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Kathleen Allie McGinley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8099377). Attorney Kathleen Allie McGinley added appearing on behalf of Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pmb)
August 29, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Larry R Seegull Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8099356). Attorney Larry R. Seegull added appearing on behalf of Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pmb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Kathleen Allie McGinley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8099377)by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Smith, Mary)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Larry R Seegull Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8099356)by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Smith, Mary)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/1/2018 for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Answer #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 8/22/2018. (adg)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Mary)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Lila Wolff, Dana Turley. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Casurella, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (eop)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lila Wolff and Dana Turley. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8064649) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turley et al v. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Turley
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Casurella
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lila Wolff
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Casurella
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Allie McGinley
Represented By: Larry R. Seegull
Represented By: Mary Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?