Ball v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Cynthia M. Ball
Defendant: Target Corp. and Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv03783
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Cobb
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Janet F King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cynthia M. Ball re Oral Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (rjs)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting defendant's #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's answer/response to the complaint is due October 9, 2018. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 9/27/2018 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, by Target Corporation. (Lee, Jaclyn)
September 17, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cynthia M. Ball re #8 Order. (rjs)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendants #3 motion to dismiss the original complaint is DENIED as MOOT. Defendant's answer or other response is due within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 9/17/2018. (rjs)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Cynthia M. Ball.(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 6, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cynthia M. Ball re Oral Order. (rjs)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for her response to the motion to dismiss and/or file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's deadline is extended to September 14, 2018. Defendant shall have 14 days to respond. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 9/6/2018 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Cynthia M. Ball.(rjs)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint by Cynthia M. Ball. (rjs)
August 23, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cynthia M. Ball re Oral Order. (rjs)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #4 Plaintiff's motion, which Defendant does not oppose, for extension of time to respond to #3 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response is due on or before September 7, 2018. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 8/23/2018 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Cynthia M. Ball. (rjs)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Target Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lee, Jaclyn)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cynthia M. Ball re #2 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (rjs)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 8/9/2018. (rjs)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Target Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8065769) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia M. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corp.
Represented By: Jaclyn R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Jaclyn R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?