Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. McGuire et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Sarang Construction LLC and To Yon McGuire
Case Number: 1:2018cv03799
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Sarang Construction LLC served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Unexecuted by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Sarang Construction LLC. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 AO Form 121 mailed to Registrar. (btql)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (btql)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sarang Construction LLC. (btql)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to To Yon McGuire. (btql)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8068655) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. McGuire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarang Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: To Yon McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?