Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Clay et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Tammy Davis and Taqua Davis Clay
Case Number: 1:2018cv03847
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
October 9, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Taqua Davis Clay, Tammy Davis re #11 Order. (bnw)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/9/18. (bnw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Tammy Davis, improperly titled Tammy Davis D/B/A Fanatics Sports Bar. (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Tammy Davis. (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Taqua Davis Clay, improperly titled Taqua Davis Clay D/B/A Fanatics Sports Bar. (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Taqua Davis Clay. Discovery ends on 2/14/2019. (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Tammy Davis served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (eop)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tammy Davis. (eop)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Taqua Davis Clay. (eop)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8076337) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Clay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taqua Davis Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?