Mavrix Photo, Inc. v. Straight From The A LLC

Plaintiff: Mavrix Photo, Inc.
Defendant: Straight From The A LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03853
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Straight From The A LLC by Straight From The A LLC.(Miller, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Straight From The A LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Witness List, #2 Exhibit Expert Witness List, #3 Exhibit Document List)(Miller, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Mavrix Photo, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel)
September 7, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Register of Copyrights re #6 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (rjs)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (rjs)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Rothman, Joel)
September 6, 2018 SECOND Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rjs)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Straight From The A LLC. Discovery ends on 2/4/2019.(Miller, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Mavrix Photo, Inc.. Straight From The A LLC served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (Rothman, Joel)
August 14, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ddm)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Straight From The A LLC. (ddm)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Mavrix Photo, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8076852) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mavrix Photo, Inc. v. Straight From The A LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavrix Photo, Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straight From The A LLC
Represented By: Michael N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?