Lickerish, Ltd. et al v. Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC

Plaintiff: Lickerish, Ltd. and Christopher J. Lane
Defendant: Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC
Petitioner: Honeil Nelson
Case Number: 1:2018cv03854
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC. and Honeil Nelson re #6 Order at 75 Marietta St., Suite 502, Atlanta, GA 30303. (hfm)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC Answer due 11/5/2018. Defendant may not be represented pro se; it must be represented by counsel under the Local Rules of this Court. Defendant is therefore ORDERED to obtain counsel by November 5, 2018. Defendant is ADVISED that the failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including default. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned on November 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/31/18. (hfm)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Honeil Nelson. (hfm)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Lickerish, Ltd., Christopher J. Lane. Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Rothman, Joel)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/17/18. (hfm)
August 14, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ddm)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC. (ddm)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Lickerish, Ltd., Christopher J. Lane. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8076893) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lickerish, Ltd. et al v. Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lickerish, Ltd.
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Lane
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Honeil Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?