Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Murry et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Dekalb Event Center, Inc., Felix Murry, Gilbert W. Smith, Sr. and Gilbert W. Smith, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03887
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 Initial Disclosures by Dekalb Event Center, Inc., Felix Murry, Gilbert W. Smith, Jr, Gilbert W. Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Ware, R.)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Defendants by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Attachment D)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 20, 2018 Clerks Notation approving #15 CIP/CDS (bgt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 First Certificate of Interested Persons by Dekalb Event Center, Inc., Felix Murry, Gilbert W. Smith, Jr, Gilbert W. Smith, Sr. (Ware, R.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Felix Murry served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald) Modified on 9/11/2018 to edit text (jpa).
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Dekalb Event Center, Inc. served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 WRONG PDF ATTACHED Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Felix Murry served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald) Modified on 9/10/2018 (jpa).
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Dekalb Event Center, Inc., Felix Murry, Gilbert W. Smith, Jr, Gilbert W. Smith, Sr. Discovery ends on 2/4/2019.(Ware, R.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Gilbert W. Smith, Sr served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Gilbert W. Smith, Jr served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/15/18. (jpa)
August 15, 2018 Clerks Notation approving #6 CIP/CDS (bgt)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (eop)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dekalb Event Center, Inc.. (eop)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gilbert W. Smith, Sr.. (eop)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gilbert W. Smith, Jr.. (eop)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Felix Murry. (eop)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8081607) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Murry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dekalb Event Center, Inc.
Represented By: R. David Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Murry
Represented By: R. David Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert W. Smith, Sr.
Represented By: R. David Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert W. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: R. David Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?