Reid v. Trill Entertainment, LLC

Plaintiff: Jeremy E. Reid
Defendant: Trill Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04105
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Jeremy E. Reid. Trill Entertainment, LLC served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Honore, Alcide)
August 31, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Register of Copyrights re #7 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (rjs)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (rjs)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Honore, Alcide)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court VACATES its previous #4 Order. Before the Court can schedule a hearing on Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunction, Plaintiff must serve the opposing party and file a motion requesting the Court to schedule such a hearing. When a party files a proper request for a court order, they must also include a brief in support of their motion providing supporting authority. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/30/2018. (rjs)
August 30, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rjs)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (VACATED PER #5 ORDER)ORDER: This matter is set for a HEARING on Plaintiff's request for preliminary and permanent injunction as set forth in Plaintiff's Complaint on MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 10TH, 2018 AT 11:30 A.M. in Courtroom 1907. As no entry of appearance has yet been made by or on behalf of Defendant, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve Defendant with a copy of this notice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/29/2018. (rjs) Modified on 8/30/2018 (rjs).
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Trill Entertainment, LLC. (rjs)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeremy E. Reid. (rjs)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Declaratory Judgment, Preliminary Injunction, Permanent Injunction, and Other Relief with Jury Demand filed by Jeremy E. Reid. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 105649) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Trill Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy E. Reid
Represented By: Alcide Honore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trill Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?