Spikes v. Delta Family-Care Disability And Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Giovanni Spikes
Defendant: Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc., Delta Family-Care Disability And Survivorship Plan and Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04126
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Delta Family-Care Disability And Survivorship Plan. (McDonald, John)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Delta Family-Care Disability And Survivorship Plan. Discovery ends on 3/11/2019.(McDonald, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Delta Airlines, Inc., pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (hfm)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of one party Delta Airlines, Inc. filed by Giovanni Spikes (Karrh, Heather)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Richard Carruthers on behalf of Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc. (Carruthers, Jason)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc. Answer due 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/19/18. (hfm)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc.. (McDonald, John)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation in cases proceeding before Judge May. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/11/18. (ddm)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Giovanni Spikes. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Form)(Karrh, Heather)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc.. (eop)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Giovanni Spikes. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8116454) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spikes v. Delta Family-Care Disability And Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan, Delta Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Family-Care Disability And Survivorship Plan
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Represented By: Jason Richard Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Spikes
Represented By: Heather K. Karrh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?