Penn v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Darren W. Penn
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co., Chase Home Finance LLC, Chase Home Finance Inc., Jeremy Williams, JRW International, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank and Clearcapital.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04169
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by JRW International, Inc., Jeremy Williams. (Wilco, Leigh)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER and Case Management Instructions re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 6/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/23/18. (jpa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Eaton on behalf of Clearcapital.com, Inc. (Eaton, Andrew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Chase Home Finance Inc., Chase Home Finance LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank.(Hansen, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Clearcapital.com, Inc..(Eaton, Andrew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Williams Defendants' Intitial Disclosures by JRW International, Inc., Jeremy Williams.(Wilco, Leigh)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures by Darren W. Penn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Penn, Darren)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Darren W. Penn. (Penn, Darren)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Darren W. Penn. (Penn, Darren)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JRW International, Inc., Jeremy Williams.(Wilco, Leigh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chase Home Finance Inc., Chase Home Finance LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank. Discovery ends on 2/4/2019.(Hansen, Brian) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8119884) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Proceedings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Brian F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Brian F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance Inc.
Represented By: Brian F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Williams
Represented By: Leigh Martin Wilco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRW International, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh Martin Wilco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Brian F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearcapital.com, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren W. Penn
Represented By: Darren W. Penn
Represented By: Alexandra Cole
Represented By: William L. Ballard
Represented By: James Ian Seifter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?