Dicta-Direct, LLC v. Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dicta-Direct, LLC
Defendant: Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04316
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. Answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/2/18. (bnw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blake, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. Answer due 11/8/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/3/18. (hfm)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blake, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Berschadsky ; granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Davis. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/01/2018. (rvb)
September 28, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Berschadsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8167334). Attorney Jonathan Berschadsky added appearing on behalf of Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. (pmb)
September 28, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Davis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8167399). Attorney Christopher Davis added appearing on behalf of Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. (pmb)
September 27, 2018 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Speech Processing Solutions GmbH, Corporate Parent SPS Beteiligungs und Management GmbH for Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.. (Blake, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Davis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8167399)by Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.. (Blake, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Berschadsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8167334)by Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.. (Blake, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey David Blake on behalf of Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. (Blake, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Dicta-Direct, LLC. Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Kent, Daniel)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/17/18. (hfm)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jkl)
September 14, 2018 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc. (jkl)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dicta-Direct, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Red Dragon Innovations, LLC for Dicta-Direct, LLC. (jkl)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand filed by Dicta-Direct, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8142262) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Pat No 9,123,343, #2 Exhibit B-1 - Preliminary Claim Chart - Claim 10, #3 Errata B-2 - Preliminary Claim Chart - Claim 14, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicta-Direct, LLC v. Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speech Processing Solutions, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Berschadsky
Represented By: Christopher Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey David Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dicta-Direct, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?