Dressler v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Sandra K. Dressler
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., DOES 1-10, Florida Department of Education, Navient Corporation, Equifax Inc, Navient Solutions, Inc., Betsy Devos, Education Credit Management Corporation, Equifax Information Services LLC and U.S. Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2018cv04345
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 69 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00311. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 14, 2018 Filing 68 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta). (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 67 Case Reassigned to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:18-cv-311-FtM-29CM. Judge Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (laf) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 65 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Betsy Devos, Education Credit Management Corporation, Equifax Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Florida Department of Education, Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., U.S. Department of Education with Jury Demand. Terminating DOES 1-10 filed by Sandra K. Dressler. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying as moot #62 Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 9/5/2018. (APH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Holden, West) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 62 PLAINTIFF'S request for telephonic case management conference by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #28 , #33 , #39 , #54 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss to the extent they seek dismissal of the Complaint as a shotgun pleading. The Motions are otherwise denied. The Complaint (Doc. #1) is dismissed without prejudice to filing an Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/29/2018. (BLW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Defendant Florida Department of Education's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference and to Submit Case Management Report. The parties shall have up to and including August 27, 2018 to conduct their case management conference and may conduct the conference by telephone. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 26, 2018 to identify and serve Defendants Does 1-10. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/23/2018. (APH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition to Pioneer Credit Recovery Inc.'s re #54 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MLS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference and to Submit Case Management Report by Florida Department of Education. (Rives, Marie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 57 LETTER RESPONSE re #55 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #52 Interested persons order by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Holden, West) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #51 Defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.'s #54 Motion to Dismiss is deemed as timely filed. Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 17, 2018 to provide the Clerk of Court with her address, e-mail address and telephone number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/9/2018. (DRS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Holden, West) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 52 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/13/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/30/2018. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Holden, West) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 49 RETURN of service executed on 5/18/18 by Florida Department of Education as to Sandra K. Dressler. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 48 RETURN of service executed on 5/22/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to Betsy Devos. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 47 RETURN of service executed on 5/23/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to Navient Corporation. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 46 RETURN of service executed on 5/22/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to U.S. Department of Education. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 45 RETURN of service executed on 5/23/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 44 RETURN of service executed on 5/29/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to Education Credit Management Corporation. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 43 RETURN of service executed on 5/18/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 42 RETURN of service executed on 5/18/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to Equifax Inc.. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 41 RETURN of service executed on 5/21/18 by Sandra K. Dressler as to Navient Solutions, Inc.. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Florida Department of Education. (Rives, Marie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #29 Interested persons order by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Holden, West) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #32 Defendant Florida Department of Education's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference and to Submit Case Management Report. The parties shall have up to and including August 20, 2018 to conduct their case management conference, and up to and including September 3, 2018 to file a case management report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 6/20/2018. (DRS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Education Credit Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ECMC Group, Inc. for Education Credit Management Corporation.. (Weinman, Richard) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Education Credit Management Corporation. Related case(s): no (Weinman, Richard) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Education Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weinman, Richard) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to extend time to conduct Rule 26(f) conference and to submit case management report by Florida Department of Education. (Rives, Marie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Interested persons order by Florida Department of Education. (Rives, Marie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Florida Department of Education. Related case(s): yes (Rives, Marie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 29 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Navient Corporation and Navient Solutions, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/26/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/12/2018. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Holden, West) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): no (Love, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Love, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Love, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Inc.. (Love, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Equifax Inc.. Related case(s): no (Love, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Inc..(Love, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 21 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Florida Department of Education. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/21/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/7/2018. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendant Florida Department of Education shall have up to and including July 13, 2018, to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 6/6/2018. (LPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading by Florida Department of Education. (Rives, Marie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie T. Rives on behalf of Florida Department of Education (Rives, Marie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sandra K. Dressler. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of service by mail by Sandra K. Dressler. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/24/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/10/2018. (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/24/2018. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/10/2018. (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/8/2018. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Department of Education. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Betsy Devos. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Navient Solutions, Inc. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Navient Corporation. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Education Credit Management Corporation. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Inc. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Florida Department of Education. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION in support of re #1 Complaint by Sandra K. Dressler. (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, Betsy Devos, Education Credit Management Corporation, Equifax Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Florida Department of Education, Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., U.S. Department of Education with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number FtM012382) filed by Sandra K. Dressler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dressler v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: West Allan Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Education
Represented By: Marie T. Rives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Corporation
Represented By: West Allan Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: West Allan Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Devos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Richard Brian Weinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K. Dressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?