Sanders v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Raymond Sanders
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04516
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Abram I. Bohrer. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/08/2018. (rvb)
November 7, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Abram I. Bohrer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8239951). Attorney Abram I. Bohrer added appearing on behalf of Raymond Sanders (pmb)
October 30, 2018 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Abram I. Bohrer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8239951)by Raymond Sanders. (Barks, Daniel)
October 23, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Raymond Sanders.(Barks, Daniel) Modified on 10/24/2018 to remove all cap (btql).
October 19, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/18/2019.(Godsey, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 4, 2018 4 Return of Service Executed by Raymond Sanders. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Barks, Daniel)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/28/2018. (btql)
September 27, 2018 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (eop)
September 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Raymond Sanders. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8174714) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Sanders
Represented By: Daniel Douglass Barks
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: John Gregory Godsey
Represented By: Brendan Sean Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?