Southern Visions, LLP v. Red Diamond, Inc.
Plaintiff: Southern Visions, LLP
Defendant: Red Diamond, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04566
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Southern Visions' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman)
November 26, 2018 Filing 45 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman)
November 21, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Robert Gresham on behalf of Southern Visions, LLP (Gresham, Dan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by Red Diamond, Inc. re #32 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Consideration, #40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Southern Visions' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #37 Reply to Response to Motion, #38 Notice of Filing, #10 Notice of Filing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Prosecution history of '222 patent, #2 Exhibit Prosecution history of '232 patent, #3 Exhibit Prosecution history of '852 patent)(South, Clinton)
November 19, 2018 Submission of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venueor, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
November 16, 2018 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael P. Taunton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8277388)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 41 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8277332)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
November 15, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Southern Visions' #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Red Diamond Sur-Reply, #2 Ex. B - Stewart Decl ('222 Pat), #3 Ex. C - Examiner Interview Summary, #4 Ex. D - '222 Pat Notice of Allowance, #5 Ex. E - Stewart Decl ('232 Pat), #6 Ex. F - Stewart Decl ('852 Pat), #7 Ex. G - Response to Office Action, #8 Ex. H - '232 Pat Notice of Allowance, #9 Ex. I - '852 Pat Notice of Allowance)(South, Clinton) Modified on 11/16/2018 to edit text and add document link (rlb).
November 15, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney James MacDonald Robertson as to Red Diamond, Inc. regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by James MacDonald Robertson and GRANTING #34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Harlan Irby Prater, IV.. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/15/18. (mlb)
November 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Harlan Irby Prater, IV added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb)
November 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of James MacDonald Robertson Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James MacDonald Robertson added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #38 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman)
November 9, 2018 Filing 38 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Its #9 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Southern Visions, LLP re #37 Reply to Response to Motion, (Crain, Norman) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text and create document link (rlb).
November 9, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Expedite Consideration filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Office Action, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Allowance)(Crain, Norman) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text (rlb).
November 7, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Alabama (within the #35 Reply Brief). by Red Diamond, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Thomas A. Ruszkowski, #2 Exhibit B - Verint Br. in Support of Mot. to Trans. and Supp. Dec.)(rlb)
November 7, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Thomas A. Ruszkowski, #2 Exhibit B - Verint Br. in Support of Mot. to Trans. and Supp. Dec.)(Archer, T.) Modified on 11/8/2018 to edit text (rlb).
November 6, 2018 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of James MacDonald Robertson Pro Hac Vice by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
November 5, 2018 Submission of #14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
November 2, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Consideration filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Ruszkowski Decl, #2 Appendix B - Stewart Decl 9_13_16, #3 Appendix C - 222 pat allowance, #4 Appendix D - Stewart Decl 2_4_16, #5 Appendix E - Aita Report and CV, #6 Appendix F - USPTO Interview Summary, #7 Appendix G - Moses Letter, #8 Appendix H - Goggi Part 1, #9 Appendix H - Goggi Part 2, #10 Appendix H - Goggi Part 3, #11 Appendix H - Goggi Part 4, #12 Appendix I - AU Patent, #13 Appendix J - McLeod Decl)(South, Clinton)
November 1, 2018 Submission of #11 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #10 Notice of Filing to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
October 30, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Stewart, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael L. Marable, #3 Exhibit A - Georgia Secretary of State Filing, #4 Exhibit B - Property Tax Information, #5 Exhibit C - Flight Schedules)(Crain, Norman) Modified on 10/31/2018 to edit text. (cmd)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to file its Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #9 ] is extended through and including November 2, 2018 and the deadline for Plaintiff to file its Reply Brief is extended through and including November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/30/2018. (cmd)
October 30, 2018 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant to File Response re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Consideration by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Archer, T.)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING #24 Emergency Motion to Vacate Order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/29/2018. (cmd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (South, Clinton)
October 26, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman)
October 25, 2018 Submission of #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #25 Proposed Order to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
October 24, 2018 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER re: #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, . (Archer, T.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 3, 2018 - December 7, 2018, January 2, 2019 - January 4, 2019, February 4, 2019 - February 8, 2019, by Norman Andrew Crain. (Crain, Norman)
October 24, 2018 Clerks Notation re #23 Leave of Absence. Attorney Norman Andrew Crain is relieved from personally having to attend any proceedings or trials in this matter on the following dates: December 3-7, 2018; January 2-4, 2019 and February 4-8, 2019. This leave of absence will not affect the processing of this case including the scheduling of motions, hearings, trials or other events before this Court. (mlb)
October 24, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Alan Taylor Rogers and Marcus R. Chatterton as to Red Diamond, Inc. regarding [15, 16] Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (mlb)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Alan Taylor Rogers and GRANTING #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Marcus R. Chatterton. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/24/18. (mlb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Ray South on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (South, Clinton)
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Ruszkowski)(Archer, T.)
October 23, 2018 RETURN of #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213975) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
October 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Alan Taylor Rogers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213949). Attorney Alan Taylor Rogers added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb)
October 23, 2018 RETURN of #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Jim M. Robertson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8214000) to attorney for correction re: name. (pmb)
October 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcus R. Chatterton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213967). Attorney Marcus R. Chatterton added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman)
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, filed by Southern Visions, LLP (Crain, Norman)
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Jim M. Robertson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8214000)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213975)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcus R. Chatterton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213967)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Alan Taylor Rogers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213949)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama by Red Diamond, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas A. Ruszkowski, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Robert Feyerabend)(Archer, T.) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case and edited text on 10/18/2018. (cmd)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. If Defendant intends to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Defendant must file a response within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order. Plaintiff will then have seven (7) days to file a reply brief. The Court DIRECTS counsel for Plaintiff to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and, if known, Defendant's counsel. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/17/2018. (cmd)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Ruled on by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/17/2018 within the #12 Order. (cmd)
October 15, 2018 Submission of #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Expedite Consideration to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
October 15, 2018 NEF regenerated RE: #10 Notice of Filing. (aaq)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #10 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Southern Visions, LLP re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Expedited Consideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam Stewart, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sandy Lamb)(Crain, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2018 to edit text. (cmd)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Expedited Consideration with Brief In Support by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Consideration (Redacted), #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam Stewart (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sandy Lamb (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C - '222 Patent, #5 Exhibit D - '330 Patent, #6 Exhibit E - '634 Patent, #7 Exhibit F - '232 Patent, #8 Exhibit G - '852 Patent)(Crain, Norman) . Added MOTION to Expedite and edited text on 10/15/2018. (cmd)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Southern Visions, LLP. Red Diamond, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Crain, Norman)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmd)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Crain, Norman)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
October 2, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (btql)
October 2, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Southern Visions, LLP. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Diamond, Inc. (btql)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8178455) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- '222 Patent, #2 Exhibit B- Claim Chart for the '222 Patent, #3 Exhibit C- '330 Patent, #4 Exhibit D- Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #5 Exhibit E- '634 Patent, #6 Exhibit F- Claim Chart for the '634 Patent, #7 Exhibit G- '232 Patent, #8 Exhibit H- Claim Chart for the '232 Patent, #9 Exhibit I- '852 Patent, #10 Exhibit J- Claim Chart for the '852 Patent, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Visions, LLP v. Red Diamond, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Diamond, Inc.
Represented By: James MacDonald Robertson
Represented By: Clinton Ray South
Represented By: Alan Taylor Rogers
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Marcus R. Chatterton
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Visions, LLP
Represented By: Norman Andrew Crain
Represented By: Wesley Austin Roberts
Represented By: Dan Robert Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?