Pawlowski v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Pawlowski
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Transunion L.L.C., Equifax Inc, Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Betsy Devos, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC and U.S. Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2018cv04611
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00626. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2018 Filing 28 Certified Copy of CTO 28 Entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Georgia. (rban, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 27 Affidavit of Service Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to Transunion, LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018 (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 26 Affidavit of Service Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to Navient Solutions, Inc. served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018 (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018 (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to US Department of Education (klau, ) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (klau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 23 Affidavit of Service Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to U.S. Department of Education served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018 (klau, ) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (klau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 Affidavit of Service Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to Navient Corporation. (klau, ) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (klau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to Equifax, Inc. (klau, ) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (klau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Transunion, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Transunion, LLC.(Wright, Gibson) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Elgie, Tara) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date Friday, December 8, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. re #16 Brief in Support, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Elgie, Tara) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 Brief in Support to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Elgie, Tara) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Elgie, Tara) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Henry, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax, Inc.. (Henry, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. Oral Argument by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Henry, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. Oral Argument by Equifax, Inc. (Henry, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Equifax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Henry, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Equifax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Henry, Jonathan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint served on June Canada, Administrative Assistant on 9/7/2018, filed by U.S. Department of Education. (aott) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Equifax, Inc. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Navient Corporation served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(aott) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Betsy Devos, Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC, U.S. Department of Education (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Betsy Devos, Does 1-10, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC, U.S. Department of Education, filed by Daniel J. Pawlowski.(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Daniel J. Pawlowski as to Betsy Devos, , Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC, U.S. Department of Education. (acha, ) Modified text on 9/26/2018 to remove party Equifax Information Services, LLC (klau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued and given to pro se plaintiff for service as to Betsy Devos, Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC, U.S. Department of Education. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Betsy Devos, Does 1-10, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC, U.S. Department of Education ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683072805.), filed by Daniel J. Pawlowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B&C, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/3/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pawlowski v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion L.L.C.
Represented By: Gibson S. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Corporation
Represented By: Tara Leigh Elgie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Leigh Elgie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Devos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?