CoStar Group, Inc. et al v. Great Atlanta Realty, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CoStar Realty Information, Inc. and CoStar Group, Inc.
Defendant: Peter Wan, Great Atlanta Realty, Inc., Dennis Cheon, Eun Young Kim and Kathy Yoo
Case Number: 1:2018cv04626
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge William M Ray, II. Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-4626-WMR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rsh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (adg)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Great Atlanta Realty, Inc.. (adg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C attached to Complaint)(Khayat, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CoStar Group, Inc. for CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Khayat, Robert)
October 8, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc. to Great Atlanta Realty, Inc. (Khayat, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kathy Yoo. (eop)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dennis Cheon. (eop)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Eun Young Kim. (eop)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Peter Wan. (eop)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by CoStar Group, Inc. and CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8187213) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons - Great Atlanta Realty)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CoStar Group, Inc. et al v. Great Atlanta Realty, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Atlanta Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eun Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CoStar Realty Information, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Khayat, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CoStar Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Khayat, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?