Kiss Nail Products, Inc. v. Revnes Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kiss Nail Products, Inc.
Defendant: Kara Revnes and Revnes Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv04633
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpa)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION, CONSENT JUDGMENT, and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Judgment is hereby ordered in favor of Plaintiff on all counts of the complaint. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/8/18. (jpa)
November 8, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION , Consent Judgment, and Permanent Injunction (Proposed) by Kiss Nail Products, Inc.. (Kalb, Joshua)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul D. Ackerman. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/17/18. (jpa)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary Abelev. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/17/18. (jpa)
October 17, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gary Abelev re #7 Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa)
October 17, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Paul D. Ackerman re #8 Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa)
October 17, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary Abelev Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8197271). Attorney Gary Abelev added appearing on behalf of Kiss Nail Products, Inc. (pmb)
October 17, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul D. Ackerman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8197252). Attorney Paul D. Ackerman added appearing on behalf of Kiss Nail Products, Inc. (pmb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary Abelev Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8197271)by Kiss Nail Products, Inc.. (Kalb, Joshua)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul D. Ackerman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8197252)by Kiss Nail Products, Inc.. (Kalb, Joshua)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kara Revnes. (eop)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Revnes Corporation. (eop)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kiss Nail Products, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8188954) (Attachments: #1 Ex -A - Patent -US9179754, #2 Ex -B - US8662305 -Patent, #3 Ex -C- USD662830 -Patent, #4 Ex -D - SuperDX Website Excerpt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiss Nail Products, Inc. v. Revnes Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Revnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revnes Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiss Nail Products, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Kalb
Represented By: Gary Abelev
Represented By: Paul D. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?