Brock v. City of Atlanta Dept. of Aviation et al
Plaintiff: Maurice F. Brock
Defendant: City of Atlanta Dept. of Aviation, Michael Smith, Robert Palmer, James Beam and Kenyatta McCaden
Case Number: 1:2018cv04680
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by James Beam, City of Atlanta Dept. of Aviation, Kenyatta McCaden, Robert Palmer, Michael Smith. (Floyd, Anissa)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Maurice F. Brock. City of Atlanta Dept. of Aviation served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (rjs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Maurice F. Brock. Michael Smith served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (rjs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Maurice F. Brock. James Beam served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (rjs)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Atlanta Dept. of Aviation. (rjs)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Smith. (rjs)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James Beam. (rjs)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Maurice F. Brock. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 106758) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brock v. City of Atlanta Dept. of Aviation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Atlanta Dept. of Aviation
Represented By: Anissa DeAnne Floyd
Represented By: Staci J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smith
Represented By: Anissa DeAnne Floyd
Represented By: Staci J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Palmer
Represented By: Anissa DeAnne Floyd
Represented By: Staci J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Beam
Represented By: Anissa DeAnne Floyd
Represented By: Staci J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenyatta McCaden
Represented By: Anissa DeAnne Floyd
Represented By: Staci J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice F. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?