Kimberly-Clark Corporation et al v. Extrusion Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly-Clark Corporation and Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC
Defendant: Extrusion Group, LLC, EG Global, LLC, Michael Houston, EG Ventures, LLC, Michael Cook and Extrusion Group Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04754
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 12/13/2018 re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited). The Court DENIED the Motion. (Court Reporter Susan Baker) (sap)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING the Parties' #40 Joint Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on December 13, 2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/12/2018. (sap)
December 11, 2018 Filing 40 Joint Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Petitioner Juanita DeLoach. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/10/18. (bnw)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Petitioner Mark c. Nelson. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/10/18. (bnw)
December 10, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #39 Order on Application for Admission PHV, #38 Order on Application for Admission PHV as to Petitioners DeLoach and Nelson. (bnw)
December 7, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Juanita DeLoach Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8294335). Attorney Juanita DeLoach added appearing on behalf of Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston (pmb)
December 7, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark C. Nelson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8294302). Attorney Mark C. Nelson added appearing on behalf of Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston (pmb)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited). Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., each side allowed 30 minutes. (ss)
November 29, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Discovery ends on 8/26/2019) and COUNTERCLAIM against Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC by Michael Houston, Extrusion Group, LLC, EG Global, LLC, Michael Cook, Extrusion Group Services LLC, EG Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Morgan, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 29, 2018 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Reiter, Mark)
November 28, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) filed by Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Morgan, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2018 Submission of #32 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
November 27, 2018 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Admission of Juanita DeLoach Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8294335)by Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Morgan, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2018 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark C. Nelson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8294302)by Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Morgan, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2018 Filing 32 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) with Brief In Support by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Lamberth, James)
November 27, 2018 Submission of #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
November 26, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Hugh M. Sexton, #2 Affidavit /Declaration of R. Scott Roe, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit W, #5 Exhibit X, #6 Exhibit Y)(Reiter, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Clerks Notation re #30 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
November 15, 2018 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC. (Morgan, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) filed by Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Cook, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Kimberly-Clark to Cook, #3 Affidavit of Michael Houston, #4 Exhibit 2 - 2013 GenA Meltblown Handout, #5 Affidavit of Kurtis Brown, #6 Exhibit 3 - Emails, #7 Exhibit 4 - Email, #8 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Origin, #9 Affidavit of Jeffrey C Morgan, #10 Exhibit 6 - US 4820572, #11 Exhibit 7 - US 5632938, #12 Exhibit 8 - US 5196207, #13 Exhibit 9 - US 5508102)(Morgan, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING the Defendants' #27 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint and #5 Motion for Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' response to #1 Complaint is due on November 29, 2018, and their response to #5 Motion for Discovery is due on November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/14/2018. (sap)
November 13, 2018 Filing 27 Second Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint and #5 MOTION for Discovery by Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, Jeffrey) Event Modified on 11/14/2018 (sap).
November 8, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robert Scott Roe re #23 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
November 8, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Philip J. Spear re #24 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
November 8, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark N. Reiter re #25 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/7/18. (jpa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark N. Reiter. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/7/18. (jpa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip J. Spear. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/7/18. (jpa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Scott Roe. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/7/18. (jpa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/7/2018. (ss)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to #1 Complaint, #5 MOTION for Discovery. Defendants' responses are due 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/6/18. (jkl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to #1 Complaint, #5 MOTION for Discovery by Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Morgan, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2018 Submission of #6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #8 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #7 Notice of Filing to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkl)
October 30, 2018 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. EG Global, LLC served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Lea, Puja)
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. EG Ventures, LLC served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Lea, Puja)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. Extrusion Group, LLC served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Lea, Puja)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. Extrusion Group Services LLC served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Lea, Puja)
October 24, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Scott Roe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213485). Attorney Robert Scott Roe added appearing on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC (pmb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. Michael Houston served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Lea, Puja)
October 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark N. Reiter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213219). Attorney Mark N. Reiter added appearing on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC (pmb)
October 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Phillip J. Spear Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213266). Attorney Philip J. Spear added appearing on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC (pmb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. Michael Cook served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Lea, Puja)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Electronically Reissued as to Michael Cook. (ddm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC for Defendant Michael Cook (Lamberth, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Scott Roe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213485) with Brief In Support by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Lamberth, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Phillip J. Spear Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213266) with Brief In Support by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Lamberth, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark N. Reiter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213219) with Brief In Support by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Lamberth, James)
October 16, 2018 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #7 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Supporting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Affidavit Bryan David Haynes, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamberth, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC re #5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Allen Frederic Vater, #2 Affidavit Bryan David Haynes, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit Q)(Lamberth, James) Modified on 11/8/2018 (jpa).
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Supporting Motion to Exceed Page Limitation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamberth, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited) with Brief In Support by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Supporting Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery, #2 Affidavit R. Scott Roe Declaration, #3 Affidavit Bryan David Haynes Declaration, #4 Affidavit Allen Frederic Vater, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamberth, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Michael Cook, EG Global, LLC, EG Ventures, LLC, Extrusion Group Services LLC, Extrusion Group, LLC, Michael Houston. (Attachments: #1 Extrusion Group Services LLC, #2 EG Global LLC, #3 EG Ventures LLC, #4 Michael Houston, #5 Michael Cook)(bdb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. for Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (bdb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8205699) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly-Clark Corporation et al v. Extrusion Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Represented By: James Andrew Lamberth
Represented By: Puja Patel Lea
Represented By: Philip J. Spear
Represented By: Robert Scott Roe
Represented By: Mark N. Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC
Represented By: James Andrew Lamberth
Represented By: Puja Patel Lea
Represented By: Philip J. Spear
Represented By: Robert Scott Roe
Represented By: Mark N. Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extrusion Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Morgan
Represented By: Mark C. Nelson
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EG Global, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Morgan
Represented By: Mark C. Nelson
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Houston
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Morgan
Represented By: Mark C. Nelson
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EG Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Morgan
Represented By: Mark C. Nelson
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cook
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Morgan
Represented By: Mark C. Nelson
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extrusion Group Services LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Morgan
Represented By: Mark C. Nelson
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?