Georgia Muslim Voter Project et al v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project and Betty J. Jones
Defendant: Brian Kemp and Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections
Case Number: 1:2018cv04789
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 50 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by Brian Kemp.(Monyak, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 13, 2018 Filing 49 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections. Discovery ends on 5/13/2019.(Tyson, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 11, 2018 Filing 48 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal: Pursuant to Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), #35 Notice of Appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14502-GG. (pjm)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #41 Amended Complaint.Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections' Answer due 12/13/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/9/2018. (btql)
November 9, 2018 Filing 46 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #41 Amended Complaint, by Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #41 Amended Complaint. Secretary of State's Answer due 12/13/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/9/2018. (btql)
November 9, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #41 Amended Complaint, by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina)
November 2, 2018 Filing 43 USCA Order DENYING Motion to stay pending appeal re: #35 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Kemp. In 18-14502, Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Brian Kemp is DENIED. In 18-14503, Appellant's alternative requests to expedite the appeal is DENIED; The Court sua sponte CONSOLIDATES the appeals in case nos. 18-14502 and 18-14503. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14502-GG. (pjm)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING #33 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/30/2018. (btql)
October 29, 2018 Filing 41 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections, Brian Kemp filed by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta.(Young, Sean) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 29, 2018 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #35 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14502-GG. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 40 USCA Acknowledgment of #35 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Kemp. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14502-GG. (pjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 39 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #35 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #35 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
October 28, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief - Short Supplemental Brief filed by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Colin McRae, #2 Exhibit A - Secretary of State's Guidance)(Young, Sean)
October 27, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 10th Circuit stay denial)(Young, Sean)
October 26, 2018 Payment of Appeal Fees re #35 Notice of Appeal by Brian Kemp. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-8234644. (Correia, Cristina)
October 26, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #32 Temporary Restraining Order, #28 Order on Motion for TRO, by Brian Kemp. Transcript Order Form due on 11/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order (Doc. 28), #2 Exhibit Order (Doc. 32))(Correia, Cristina)
October 26, 2018 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/23/2018, before Judge Leigh Martin May. Court Reporter Montrell Vann, Telephone number 404-215-1549. Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) (mv)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a response by noon on Monday, October 29, 2018 to the #33 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/26/2018. (rvb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Correia, Cristina)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/25/2018. (btql)
October 25, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE re #28 Order on Motion for TRO, Objections Related to Form of Relief filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina)
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE re #28 Order on Motion for TRO, Objections to Form of Proposed Injunction filed by Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Tyson, Bryan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #28 Order on Motion for TRO, Plaintiffs' Suggested Changes to Court's 10/24/18 Proposed Order filed by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Young, Sean)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Sophia Lin Lakin. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/24/2018. (rvb)
October 24, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8214228). Attorney Sophia Lin Lakin added appearing on behalf of Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project (pmb)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court proposes entering the proposed injunction as detailed within the order. As the parties have not had an opportunity to be heard on the exact terms of the Court's proposal, the parties have until noon on Thursday, October 25, 2018, to provide the Court with any objections to the form. See Order for further detail. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/24/2018. (rvb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2018. Oral argument was held on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . The Court heard from Plaintiffs' and Defendants' counsel. The motion was taken under advisement. A written order will follow. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(btql)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Dale E. Ho. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2018. (rvb)
October 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Dale E. Ho Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8224560). Attorney Dale E. Ho added appearing on behalf of Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project (pmb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Dale E. Ho Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8224560)by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Ho, Dale)
October 22, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. E - Rupani Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. F - Ramachandran Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. G - Goitia Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. H - Brown v. Kobach Decision)(Young, Sean)
October 22, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina)
October 22, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Tyson, Bryan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Ware Lewis on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Lewis, Anne)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages up to 35 pages. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/22/2018. (btql)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Willard on behalf of Brian Kemp (Willard, Russell)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages up to and including 35 pages. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/19/2018. (btql)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina)
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for TRO papers, Order dated 10/17/18, Summons, Complaint , as to Brian Kemp. (Young, Sean)
October 19, 2018 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. Brian Kemp served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Young, Sean)
October 19, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for TRO papers, Order dated 10/17/18, Summons, Complaint , as to Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration & Elections. (Young, Sean)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Young, Sean)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Strickland, Frank)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Brian Kemp (Correia, Cristina)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Dempsey on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Dempsey, Brian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Tyson, Bryan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Carothers on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Carothers, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8214228)by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Young, Sean)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. A Motion Hearing is set for 10/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2107 before Judge Leigh Martin May. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order, the Complaint, and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by close of business on Thursday, October 18, 2018. Plaintiffs should file proof of service on the docket once Defendants have been served with this Order and the pleadings. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Response Brief on Monday, October 22, 2018 by 12:00 p.m. If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, its reply shall be due by 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, October 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/17/2018. (rvb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Ali Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Cho Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Iowa decision, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - California decision, #6 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Sean)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/16/2018. (rvb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections. (btql)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (btql)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8209899) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia Muslim Voter Project et al v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Monyak
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Anne Ware Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Muslim Voter Project
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J. Jones
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?