Patel et al v. Vinson et al

Plaintiff: Kuntal Patel and Anup Patel
Defendant: Channell Sherrod and Andre Vinson
Case Number: 1:2018cv04833
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Amy Totenberg
1 Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 CORRECTED USCA Acknowledgment of #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Andre Vinson. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 18-14821-K. (kac)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 USCA Acknowledgment of #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Andre Vinson. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 18-14821-K. (kac)
November 20, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Andre Vinson re #10 Order. (jtj)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #8 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Further requests to proceed in forma pauperis should be directed by motion to the circuit court within 30 days pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.24. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/20/2018. (jtj)
November 19, 2018 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Orders, Report and Recommendation, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #7 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Andre Vinson. (kac)
November 19, 2018 Submission of #8 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (kac)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Andre Vinson. (kac)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation by Andre Vinson. (kac)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by Andre Vinson. (jtj)
October 26, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (jtj)
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anup Patel, Kuntal Patel, Channell Sherrod, Andre Vinson re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. Magistrate Court of Dekalb County sent a certified copy of the remand order electronically. (jtj)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 Magistrate's Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this case to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/26/2018. (jtj)
October 25, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anup Patel, Kuntal Patel, Channell Sherrod, Andre Vinson re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 Final Report and Recommendation. (jtj)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/25/2018. (jtj)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Court GRANTS #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis for the purpose of remand only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/25/2018. (jtj)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Dispossessory filed by Andre Vinson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 19, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (sap)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Vinson. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Vinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channell Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuntal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anup Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?