Simmons et al v. Griffin

Plaintiff: David Simmons and Georjean Simmons
Defendant: Kashuada Griffin
Case Number: 1:2018cv04845
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
0 Judge: John K Larkins
1 Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to the Magistrate Court ofClayton County re Certified Copies of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, and #6 Remand Letter. (sap)
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kashuada Griffin, David Simmons, and Georjean Simmons re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #6 Remand Letter. (sap)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Remand Letter to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. (sap)
October 26, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (sap)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is DIRECTED to REMAND this case to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/26/2018. (sap)
October 25, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kashuada Griffin, David Simmons, Georjean Simmons re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (btql)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/25/2018. (btql)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #2 Notice of Removal be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County, Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/25/2018. (btql)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Kashuada Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/25/2018 in the Final R&R. (btql)
October 19, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (tcc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kashuada Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons et al v. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georjean Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashuada Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?